This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2018 at 13:34:21 (UTC).

The Biltmore Company v. NU U, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2015 The Biltmore Company filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against NU U, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dennis Howell and Martin Reidinger. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00288

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dennis Howell

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

The Biltmore Company

Defendants and Counter Claimants

top10, LLC

Top 10 Prom, LLC

Nu U, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Wyatt S. Stevens(Designation Retained)

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Rebecca Elizabeth Crandall

Joseph Pinckney McGuire

 

Court Documents

#147

(#147) ORDER denying 125 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant's Objection to 141 Plaintiff's Bill of Costs is SUSTAINED IN PART and OVERRULED IN PART, and 134 Plaintiff's Bill of Costs is GRANTED to the extent that the Plaintiff is hereby awarded $9,502.25 in costs. FURTHER ORDERED that 132 Defendant's Motion for Clarification of Judgment and Order is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/22/2018. (khm)

#131

(#131) ORDER granting 130 Motion to Seal Document, and Exhibit A to the Haas Affidavit shall be filed permanently under seal. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/11/2017. (kby)

#124

(#124) JUDGMENT in favor of The Biltmore Company against Nu U, Inc. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/25/2017. (khm)

#74

(#74) ORDER denying Pltf's 67 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/30/17. (ejb)

#53

(#53) ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Specifically, the Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with respect to the Defendant's Chapter 75 counterclaim. In all other respects, the Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/20/2016. (khm)

#51

(#51) ORDER granting 45 Defendant's Motion to Amend, and the deadline for the completion of depositions is hereby extended for a period of 30 days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendants Request for Ruling 50 is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the mediation deadline having passed, parties shall file a Mediation Report with the Court within 7 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/28/2016. (thh)

#33

(#33) CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER re 31 Joint Motion for Entry of Consent Protective Order. See Order for further details. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/22/2016. (kby)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#147) ORDER denying 125 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant's Objection to 141 Plaintiff's Bill of Costs is SUSTAINED IN PART and OVERRULED IN PART, and 134 Plaintiff's Bill of Costs is GRANTED to the extent that the Plaintiff is hereby awarded $9,502.25 in costs. FURTHER ORDERED that 132 Defendant's Motion for Clarification of Judgment and Order is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/22/2018. (khm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#131) ORDER granting 130 Motion to Seal Document, and Exhibit A to the Haas Affidavit shall be filed permanently under seal. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/11/2017. (kby)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#124) JUDGMENT in favor of The Biltmore Company against Nu U, Inc. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/25/2017. (khm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) ORDER denying Pltf's 67 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/30/17. (ejb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Specifically, the Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with respect to the Defendant's Chapter 75 counterclaim. In all other respects, the Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/20/2016. (khm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) ORDER granting 45 Defendant's Motion to Amend, and the deadline for the completion of depositions is hereby extended for a period of 30 days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendants Request for Ruling 50 is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the mediation deadline having passed, parties shall file a Mediation Report with the Court within 7 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/28/2016. (thh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER re 31 Joint Motion for Entry of Consent Protective Order. See Order for further details. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/22/2016. (kby)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Biltmore is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Pinckney McGuire