This case was last updated from PACER on 12/13/2018 at 09:39:10 (UTC).

Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. et al v. Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2014 Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00989

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc.

Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.

Univ. of Tennessee Research Foundation

Panda Pharmaceuticals, LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd.

Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Dominick T. Gattuso

Attorney at Proctor Heyman Enerio LLP

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Stephanie Hartmann

Kevin E. Warner

Donald H. Mahoney, III

John K. Hsu

Christopher M. Bruno

Neema A. Kumar

Charles B. Klein

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jeffrey B. Burgan

Kenneth P. Spina

John C. Phillips, Jr.

Attorney at Phillips, Goldman & Spence, P.A.

1200 North Broom Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

Bruce M. Gagala

David A. Bilson

Attorney at Phillips, Goldman & Spence, P.A.

1200 North Broom Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

Steven H. Sklar

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND filed with Jury Demand against Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1561627.) - filed by Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(els) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (els) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 6/17/14 and 7/2/14. Date of Expiration of Patent: 9/1/28 and 5/26/26.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 12/17/2016. (els) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,277,780; 8,715,624;. (els) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Taro Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Other Affiliate Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. filed by Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (els) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James F. Hurst, Charles B. Klein, John K. Hsu, Neema A. Kumar, and Christopher M. Bruno - filed by Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/31/2014) (nms). Modified on 7/31/2014 (nms). (Entered: 07/31/2014)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc.: For Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd. waiver sent on 8/11/2014, answer due 10/10/2014. (Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 08/13/2014)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Panda Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Univ. of Tennessee Research Foundation by Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Phillips, John) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

#9

(#9) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,990,100; . (Phillips, John) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

#123

(#123) ORAL ORDER: A teleconference has been scheduled for 2/10/16 at 10:30 AM Eastern Time with Judge Thynge. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the teleconference call. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/29/16. (cak) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

#124

(#124) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Taros Response to Defendants Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd. and Perrigo UK Finco Limited Partnerships Second Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc, and Taro Pharmaceuticals North America, Inc. filed by Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

#125

(#125) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Proposed Terms for Claim Construction filed by Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

#126

(#126) ORAL ORDER: A teleconference is scheduled for 6/2/16 at 10:30 A.M. Eastern to be initiated by defense counsel. The purpose is to discuss the status of parties' discussions and the contents of the mediation statements which are due on Friday June 17, 2016 for the mediation tentatively scheduled for Wednesday June 29, 2016 beginning at 10:00 A.M. Issued by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/11/16. (kjk) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

#127

(#127) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd. and Perrigo UK Finco Limited Partnership's Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs filed by Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#128

(#128) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Initial Proposed Claim Constructions filed by Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

#129

(#129) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Preliminary Construction Claim Terms filed by Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

#130

(#130) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Rebuttal Proposed Claim Constructions filed by Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

#131

(#131) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s Rebuttal Proposed Construction of Claim Terms filed by Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

119 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#131) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s Rebuttal Proposed Construction of Claim Terms filed by Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#130) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Rebuttal Proposed Claim Constructions filed by Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#129) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Preliminary Construction Claim Terms filed by Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#128) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Initial Proposed Claim Constructions filed by Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#127) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd. and Perrigo UK Finco Limited Partnership's Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs filed by Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#126) ORAL ORDER: A teleconference is scheduled for 6/2/16 at 10:30 A.M. Eastern to be initiated by defense counsel. The purpose is to discuss the status of parties' discussions and the contents of the mediation statements which are due on Friday June 17, 2016 for the mediation tentatively scheduled for Wednesday June 29, 2016 beginning at 10:00 A.M. Issued by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/11/16. (kjk) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#125) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Proposed Terms for Claim Construction filed by Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#124) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Taros Response to Defendants Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd. and Perrigo UK Finco Limited Partnerships Second Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc, and Taro Pharmaceuticals North America, Inc. filed by Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#123) ORAL ORDER: A teleconference has been scheduled for 2/10/16 at 10:30 AM Eastern Time with Judge Thynge. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the teleconference call. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/29/16. (cak) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#122) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Invalidity Contentions of Defendants Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals, Ltd and Perrigo U.K. Finco Limited Partnership filed by Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Perrigo Company plc for Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd. filed by Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,990,100; . (Phillips, John) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Panda Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Univ. of Tennessee Research Foundation by Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Phillips, John) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc.: For Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd. waiver sent on 8/11/2014, answer due 10/10/2014. (Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 08/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James F. Hurst, Charles B. Klein, John K. Hsu, Neema A. Kumar, and Christopher M. Bruno - filed by Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/31/2014) (nms). Modified on 7/31/2014 (nms). (Entered: 07/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Taro Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Other Affiliate Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. filed by Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (els) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,277,780; 8,715,624;. (els) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 6/17/14 and 7/2/14. Date of Expiration of Patent: 9/1/28 and 5/26/26.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 12/17/2016. (els) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (els) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND filed with Jury Demand against Perrigo Israel Pharmaceuticals Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1561627.) - filed by Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals North America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(els) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less