This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 22:56:00 (UTC).

Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc. v. Stryker Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/08/2015 Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Stryker Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:15-CV-01623

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Andrew J. Guilford

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc.

Counter Claimant

Stryker Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Victor M Felix

Brett M Pinkus

Jonathan T Suder

Glenn S Orman

Brian James Kennedy

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Richard T McCaulley, Jr

Dalila Argaez Wendlandt

Ralph A Campillo

Caroline H Mankey

Lauren N Robinson

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16587931 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Victor M Felix added to party Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc.(pty:pla))(Felix, Victor) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc.. (Felix, Victor) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 filed by Plaintiff Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc.. (Felix, Victor) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc., identifying Wi-LAN Technologies Inc., Wi-LAN Inc.. (Felix, Victor) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc.. (Felix, Victor) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants Stryker Corporation. (jtil) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Jonathan T. Suder Plaintiff Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc. Re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (jtil) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#37

(#37) ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Having considered the Stipulated Motion of Dismissal 36 , and finding that good cause has been shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The Stipulated Motion of Dismissal is GRANTED. Plaintiffs complaint in this matter is dismissed with prejudice. Defendants counterclaims in this matter are dismissed without prejudice. It is furthered ordered that each party will be responsible for their respective attorneys fees and costs. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mu) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

#36

(#36) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41 filed by Plaintiff Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Orman, Glenn) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

#35

(#35) ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by plaintiff Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc..(Suder, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/28/2016)

#34

(#34) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting 31 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dalila Wendlandt on behalf of Defendant, designating Ralph A. Campillo as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

#33

(#33) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting 30 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard T. McCaulley, Jr. on behalf of Defendant, designating Ralph A. Campillo as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

#32

(#32) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended APPLICATION for attorney Dalila Argaez Wendlandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) 31 , Amended APPLICATION for attorney Richard T. McCaulley, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) 30 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Fee not paid. See LR 83-2.1.3.3 (c); Submitted Good Standing Certificate that are over 30 days old. Certificate from IL was issued on 12/14/15, applications were filed on 1/14/16 See Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

#31

(#31) Amended APPLICATION for attorney Dalila Argaez Wendlandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant Stryker Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Campillo, Ralph) (Entered: 01/14/2016)

#30

(#30) Amended APPLICATION for attorney Richard T. McCaulley, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant Stryker Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Campillo, Ralph) (Entered: 01/14/2016)

#29

(#29) APPLICATION for attorney Dalila A. Wendlandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant Stryker Corporation. (Campillo, Ralph) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Having considered the Stipulated Motion of Dismissal 36 , and finding that good cause has been shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The Stipulated Motion of Dismissal is GRANTED. Plaintiffs complaint in this matter is dismissed with prejudice. Defendants counterclaims in this matter are dismissed without prejudice. It is furthered ordered that each party will be responsible for their respective attorneys fees and costs. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mu) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41 filed by Plaintiff Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Orman, Glenn) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by plaintiff Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc..(Suder, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting 31 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dalila Wendlandt on behalf of Defendant, designating Ralph A. Campillo as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting 30 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard T. McCaulley, Jr. on behalf of Defendant, designating Ralph A. Campillo as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended APPLICATION for attorney Dalila Argaez Wendlandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) 31 , Amended APPLICATION for attorney Richard T. McCaulley, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) 30 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Fee not paid. See LR 83-2.1.3.3 (c); Submitted Good Standing Certificate that are over 30 days old. Certificate from IL was issued on 12/14/15, applications were filed on 1/14/16 See Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Amended APPLICATION for attorney Dalila Argaez Wendlandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant Stryker Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Campillo, Ralph) (Entered: 01/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Amended APPLICATION for attorney Richard T. McCaulley, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant Stryker Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Campillo, Ralph) (Entered: 01/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) APPLICATION for attorney Dalila A. Wendlandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant Stryker Corporation. (Campillo, Ralph) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) APPLICATION for attorney Richard T. McCaulley, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant Stryker Corporation. (Campillo, Ralph) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Brett M. Pinkus for Plaintiff Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc., Re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (jtil) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Jonathan T. Suder Plaintiff Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc. Re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (jtil) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants Stryker Corporation. (jtil) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc.. (Felix, Victor) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc., identifying Wi-LAN Technologies Inc., Wi-LAN Inc.. (Felix, Victor) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 filed by Plaintiff Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc.. (Felix, Victor) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc.. (Felix, Victor) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16587931 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Victor M Felix added to party Surgical Irrigation Technologies Inc.(pty:pla))(Felix, Victor) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less