This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2016 at 01:11:08 (UTC).

Stromberg v. OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2015 Stromberg filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins and Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-04719

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins

Judge

Hon. Ronald M. Whyte

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bonnie Lynne Stromberg

Defendants

RBS Citizens, N.A.

OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC

Morgan Stanley Private Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark T. Johnson

Attorney at Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky Wotkyns LLP

2000 Powell Street, Suite 1400

Emeryville, CA 94608

Seth Richard Lesser

Attorney at Klafter Olsen & Lesser LLP

Two International Drive, Suite 350, Suite 350

Rye Brook, NY 10573

Stuart Rossman

Attorney at National Consumer Law Center

7 Winthrop Square, 4Th Fl.

Boston, MA 02110

Charles Delbaum

Attorney at National Consumer Law Center

7 Winthrop Square

Boston, MA 02110

Todd Stowe Collins

Attorney at Berger Montague, P.C.

1622 Locust Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Eric Lechtzin

Attorney at Berger Montague

1622 Locust Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Todd Michael Schneider

Attorney at Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky Wotkyns LLP

2000 Powell Street, Suite 1400

Emeryville, CA 94608

Defendant Attorneys

Charles Kenzie LaPlante

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1840 Century Park East, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jennifer Lee Gray

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

1840 Century Park East, 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Cathleen Donohue

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1900 University Avenue, 5Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Jordan David Grotzinger

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1840 Century Park East, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jason R Scherr

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis and Bockius LLP

2020 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1806

Patrick A Harvey

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis and Bockius LLP

2020 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1806

Lucy Han Wang

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL By Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1332(d)(2) from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 1-15-CV-285321. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-9908776). Filed by OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit A part 2 of 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Declaration of Gina Feezer In Support Of Removal By Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1332(d)(2)) (Grotzinger, Jordan) (Filed on 10/13/2015) Modified on 1/6/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/13/2015)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC re 1 Notice of Removal,, Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3-15 Disclosure Statement of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Grotzinger, Jordan) (Filed on 10/13/2015) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

#3

(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/6/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/13/2016 10:00 AM at the US District Court, 280 S. First St., San Jose, CA 95113 in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/13/15. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC (Grotzinger, Jordan) (Filed on 10/14/2015) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC.. (Grotzinger, Jordan) (Filed on 10/27/2015) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

#7

(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bonnie Lynne Stromberg.. (Schneider, Todd) (Filed on 10/27/2015) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Commttee on 10/28/2215. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

#53

(#53) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Defendant RBS Citizens, N.A. (Gray, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/2/2016) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

#52

(#52) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Gray, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/2/2016) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

#51

(#51) ORDER Granting 49 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Permit Plaintiff's Out of State Counsel to Appear Telephonically for Case Management Conference on 2/5/2016. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at (866) 882-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/2/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

#50

(#50) CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Scherr, Jason) (Filed on 1/29/2016) Modified on 2/1/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/29/2016)

#49

(#49) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO PERMIT PLAINTIFFS OUT OF STATE COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY; and (PROPOSED) ORDER; filed by Bonnie Lynne Stromberg. (Johnson, Mark) (Filed on 1/29/2016) Modified on 2/1/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/29/2016)

#48

(#48) JOINT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC, RBS Citizens, N.A.. (Gray, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/29/2016) Modified on 2/1/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/29/2016)

#47

(#47) ORDER Granting 42 Stipulation Re Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Pending Motions to Dismiss. It is hereby ordered that the dates are reset as follows: Plaintiff's Opposition to the Motions due 2/26/2016; Defendants' reply due 3/18/2016; and the hearing date for Defendants' Motions 33 35 36 37 is set for 4/15/2016 at 9:00 am in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/29/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

#46

(#46) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 by RBS Citizens, N.A.. (Gray, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/28/2016) Modified on 1/28/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/28/2016)

#45

(#45) ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on February 2, 2016 at 1:30 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Defendant RBS Citizens, N.A. (Gray, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/2/2016) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Gray, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/2/2016) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) ORDER Granting 49 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Permit Plaintiff's Out of State Counsel to Appear Telephonically for Case Management Conference on 2/5/2016. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at (866) 882-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/2/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Scherr, Jason) (Filed on 1/29/2016) Modified on 2/1/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO PERMIT PLAINTIFFS OUT OF STATE COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY; and (PROPOSED) ORDER; filed by Bonnie Lynne Stromberg. (Johnson, Mark) (Filed on 1/29/2016) Modified on 2/1/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) JOINT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC, RBS Citizens, N.A.. (Gray, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/29/2016) Modified on 2/1/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) ORDER Granting 42 Stipulation Re Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Pending Motions to Dismiss. It is hereby ordered that the dates are reset as follows: Plaintiff's Opposition to the Motions due 2/26/2016; Defendants' reply due 3/18/2016; and the hearing date for Defendants' Motions 33 35 36 37 is set for 4/15/2016 at 9:00 am in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/29/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 by RBS Citizens, N.A.. (Gray, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/28/2016) Modified on 1/28/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on February 2, 2016 at 1:30 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Johnson, Mark) (Filed on 1/27/2016) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION TO SET TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re 1 -Notice of Removal filed by OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC. (Grotzinger, Jordan) (Filed on 11/2/2015) Modified on 1/6/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Commttee on 10/28/2215. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bonnie Lynne Stromberg.. (Schneider, Todd) (Filed on 10/27/2015) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC.. (Grotzinger, Jordan) (Filed on 10/27/2015) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC (Grotzinger, Jordan) (Filed on 10/14/2015) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/6/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/13/2016 10:00 AM at the US District Court, 280 S. First St., San Jose, CA 95113 in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/13/15. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC re 1 Notice of Removal,, Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3-15 Disclosure Statement of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Grotzinger, Jordan) (Filed on 10/13/2015) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL By Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1332(d)(2) from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 1-15-CV-285321. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-9908776). Filed by OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit A part 2 of 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Declaration of Gina Feezer In Support Of Removal By Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1332(d)(2)) (Grotzinger, Jordan) (Filed on 10/13/2015) Modified on 1/6/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.