This case was last updated from PACER on 05/29/2016 at 14:28:58 (UTC).

Stewart v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2015 Stewart filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Hon. Beth Labson Freeman and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-04620

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. Beth Labson Freeman

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Todd Stewart

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Co-Operative Adjustment Bureau, Inc.

Capital One, National Association

Wilshire Credit Corporation

Westlake Financial Services, LLC

Enhanced Recovery Company, Inc.

TransUnion, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott Joseph Sagaria

Attorney at Sagaria Law, P.C.

2033 Gateway Place, 5Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95110

Joseph Brian Angelo

Attorney at Sagaria Law

2033 Gateway Place, 5Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95110

Scott Matthew Johnson

Attorney at Sagaria Law, PC

2033 Gateway Place, 5Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95110

Elliot Wayne Gale

Attorney at Sagaria Law, P.C.

2033 Gateway Place, 5Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95110

Defendant Attorneys

Alyssa Marie Staudinger

Attorney at Jones Day

3161 Michelson Drive, Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92612-4408

Ralph L. Pollard

Attorney at Attorney at Law

5098 St. Celestine Ct., 5098 St. Celestine Ct.

Concord, CA 94521

Chelsea Lynn Diaz

Attorney at Doll Amir and Eley LLP

1888 Century Park East, Ste 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Lauren E. Tate

Attorney at Tate & Associates

1321 Eighth St., Suite 4

Berkeley, CA 94710

Andrew S. Meyers

Attorney at Schuckit Associates PC

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Capital One, National Association, Co-Operative Adjustment Bureau, Inc., ENHANCED RECOVERY COMPANY, INC., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, Wilshire Credit Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9894061). Filed by TODD STEWART. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 10/6/2015) Modified text on 10/8/2015 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/06/2015)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 10/6/2015) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet by TODD STEWART . (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 10/7/2015) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

#4

(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2015. Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Capital One, National Association, Co-Operative Adjustment Bureau, Inc., Enhanced Recovery Company, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Westlake Financial Services, LLC, Wilshire Credit Corporation. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren E. Tate (Tate, Lauren) (Filed on 10/14/2015) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by TransUnion, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate GS Capital Partners, Other Affiliate Advent International Corp., Other Affiliate Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC. (Tate, Lauren) (Filed on 10/14/2015) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

#9

(#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9914290.) filed by TransUnion, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Meyers, Andrew) (Filed on 10/14/2015) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

#33

(#33) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Diaz, Chelsea) (Filed on 1/14/2016) (Entered: 01/14/2016)

#32

(#32) ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES; AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT A JOINT STIPULATED CASE SCHEDULE. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2016 11:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 11/13/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/13/2016. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

#31

(#31) ORDER GRANTING 18 DEFENDANT CAPITAL ONE'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/13/2016. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

#30

(#30) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 1/7/2016 re 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and 8(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Capital One, National Association. The Court to issue written order.Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Elliot Gale. Defendant Attorney: Connie Tcheng, Debbie P. Kirkpatrick, Raagini R. Shah, Alyssa M. Staudinger. This is a text only Minute Entry (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/7/2016) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

#29

(#29) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Staudinger, Alyssa) (Filed on 1/5/2016) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

#28

(#28) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Stewart (Complaint; on Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.) (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 12/28/2015) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

#27

(#27) Certificate of Interested Entities by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc., Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantage Score Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Staudinger, Alyssa) (Filed on 12/24/2015) (Entered: 12/24/2015)

#26

(#26) DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.'S ANSWER to Complaint byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Staudinger, Alyssa) (Filed on 12/24/2015) (Entered: 12/24/2015)

#25

(#25) Joint) Notice Of Settlement by TransUnion, LLC (Meyers, Andrew) (Filed on 12/14/2015) Modified on 12/15/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/14/2015)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Diaz, Chelsea) (Filed on 1/14/2016) (Entered: 01/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES; AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT A JOINT STIPULATED CASE SCHEDULE. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2016 11:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 11/13/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/13/2016. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ORDER GRANTING 18 DEFENDANT CAPITAL ONE'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/13/2016. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 1/7/2016 re 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and 8(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Capital One, National Association. The Court to issue written order.Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Elliot Gale. Defendant Attorney: Connie Tcheng, Debbie P. Kirkpatrick, Raagini R. Shah, Alyssa M. Staudinger. This is a text only Minute Entry (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/7/2016) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Staudinger, Alyssa) (Filed on 1/5/2016) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Stewart (Complaint; on Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.) (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 12/28/2015) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Certificate of Interested Entities by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc., Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantage Score Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Staudinger, Alyssa) (Filed on 12/24/2015) (Entered: 12/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.'S ANSWER to Complaint byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Staudinger, Alyssa) (Filed on 12/24/2015) (Entered: 12/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Joint) Notice Of Settlement by TransUnion, LLC (Meyers, Andrew) (Filed on 12/14/2015) Modified on 12/15/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER RESETTING 18 HEARING DATE. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/11/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew S. Meyers. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9914290.) filed by TransUnion, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Meyers, Andrew) (Filed on 10/14/2015) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by TransUnion, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate GS Capital Partners, Other Affiliate Advent International Corp., Other Affiliate Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC. (Tate, Lauren) (Filed on 10/14/2015) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren E. Tate (Tate, Lauren) (Filed on 10/14/2015) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Capital One, National Association, Co-Operative Adjustment Bureau, Inc., Enhanced Recovery Company, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Westlake Financial Services, LLC, Wilshire Credit Corporation. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2015. Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Civil Cover Sheet by TODD STEWART . (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 10/7/2015) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 10/6/2015) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Capital One, National Association, Co-Operative Adjustment Bureau, Inc., ENHANCED RECOVERY COMPANY, INC., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, Wilshire Credit Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9894061). Filed by TODD STEWART. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 10/6/2015) Modified text on 10/8/2015 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.