This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/24/2016 at 09:10:00 (UTC).

Sterling Bank v. Herrod et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2015 Sterling Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Herrod. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer and Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00540

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer

Judge

Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sterling Bank

Defendants

Susan M. Wooldridge

A. Chandler Muller, II

Chandler & Alecia, Inc.

Charles D. Wooldridge

Donald P. Brobst

Joseph L. Herrod

Brobst Medical, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Davidson Sparks

Attorney at Christian & Small, LLP

505 North 20Th Street, 1800 Financial Center

Birmingham, AL 35203

Bradley Richard Hightower

Attorney at Christian & Small LLP

1800 Financial Center, 505 North 20Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorney

Lee Rimes Benton

Attorney at Benton & Centeno, LLP

2019 Third Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#2

#6

#1

2 #17

Receipt

2 #16

Exhibit O

2 #15

Exhibit N

2 #14

Exhibit M

2 #13

Exhibit L

2 #12

Exhibit K

2 #11

Exhibit J

2 #10

Exhibit I-2

2 #9

Exhibit I-1

2 #8

Exhibit H

2 #7

Exhibit G

2 #6

Exhibit F

2 #5

Exhibit E

2 #4

Exhibit D

2 #3

Exhibit C

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Charles D. Wooldridge, Susan M. Wooldridge re 15 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Benton, Lee) Modified on 9/17/2015 to add the link to the 15 notice (wcl, ). (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Charles D. Wooldridge, Susan M. Wooldridge; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/21/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, ) (Entered: 09/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Donald P. Brobst, Brobst Medical, Inc., Chandler & Alecia, Inc., A. Chandler Muller, II. (Benton, Lee) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record (Notice of Bankruptcy) by Donald P. Brobst, A. Chandler Muller, II. (Benton, Lee) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Susan M. Wooldridge. (Benton, Lee) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles D. Wooldridge. (Benton, Lee) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by A. Chandler Muller, II. (Benton, Lee) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chandler & Alecia, Inc.. (Benton, Lee) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brobst Medical, Inc.. (Benton, Lee) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donald P. Brobst. (Benton, Lee) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT - First Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Sterling Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, B, and C, # 2 Exhibit D, E, F, and G, # 3 Exhibit H and I, # 4 Exhibit J, K, and L)(Hightower, Bradley) (Entered: 08/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that the plaintiff has until 8/28/2015 to amend the complaint to allege jurisdiction sufficiently; otherwise this lawsuit shall be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/19/2015. (wcl, ) (Entered: 08/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (wcl, ) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Donald P. Brobst, Brobst Medical, Inc., Chandler & Alecia, Inc., Joseph L. Herrod, A. Chandler Muller, II, Charles D. Wooldridge, Susan M. Wooldridge and returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (wcl, ) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Donald P. Brobst, Brobst Medical, Inc., Chandler & Alecia, Inc., Joseph L. Herrod, A. Chandler Muller, II, Charles D. Wooldridge, Susan M. Wooldridge (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602037734.), filed by Sterling Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I-1, # 10 Exhibit I-2, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Receipt) (wcl, ) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sterling Bank. (Sparks, Daniel) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sterling Bank and Trust FSB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel D Sparks(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradley R Hightower