This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 01:43:37 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Warren Chiropractic & Rehab Clinic P.C. et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2014 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Warren Chiropractic Rehab Clinic P C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:14-CV-11521

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Petitioners

Edward White

Dr. Steve Geiringer

Sandra White

E White & Son Professional Services, LLC

Defendants

John Mousa Mufarreh

Keith Gover

Warren Chiropractic & Rehab Clinic P.C.

George Mousa Mufarreh

Priority Patient Transport LLC

Sharon Michele Smith

Respondents

Bio-Magnetic Resonance, Inc.

Michigan Biotech Partners, LLC

MRI Consultants, LLC

Interested Parties

Applebaum & Stone, PLC

Dependable Transportation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David D. O'Brien

Attorney at Miller, Canfield,

101 N. Main Street, 7Th Floor

Ann Arbor, MI 48104-1400

Patrick C. Harrigan

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

525 West Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60661

Amelia M. Chapple

Attorney at Katten Muching & Rosenman LLP

525 West Moroe Street, Suite 19

Chicago, IL 60661

Michael Rosensaft

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

575 Madison Ave

New York, NY 10022

Matthew P. Allen

Attorney at Miller, Canfield, Paddock and Stone, PLC

840 West Long Lake Road, Suite 200

Troy, MI 48098-6358

Jeffrey Alan Crapko

Attorney at Miller Canfield

840 W. Long Lake Road, Suite 200

Troy, MI 48098

Thomas W. Cranmer

Attorney at Miller Canfield Paddock and Stone PLC

840 W. Long Lake Road, Suite 200

Troy, MI 48098-6358

Ross O. Silverman

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

525 W. Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60661

Petitioner Attorneys

Peter W. Joelson

Attorney at Joelson, Rosenberg,

30665 Northwestern Highway, Suite 200

Farmington Hills, MI 48334

James F. Hewson

Attorney at Hewson & Van Hellemont

25900 Greenfield Road, Suite 326

Oak Park, MI 48237

Stacey L. Heinonen

25900 Greenfield Rd, Suite 326

Oak Park, MI 48237

Defendant Attorneys

Ben M. Gonek

Attorney at Law Offices of Ben M. Gonek, PLLC

615 Griswold Street, Suite 1116

Detroit, MI 48226

Troy C. Otto

Attorney at Fischer, Franklin,

500 Griswold, Suite 3500

Detroit, MI 48226-3808

Respondent Attorney

Matthew D. Smith

Attorney at Mazzara Law Firm, PLLC

19251 Mack Ave., Suite 500

Grosse Pointe Woods, MI 48230

Interested Party Attorneys

Joseph A. Ahern

Attorney at Ahern & Kill, PC

430 North Old Woodward, Second Floor

Birmingham, MI 48009

Gary R. Blumberg

15011 Michigan Avenue

Dearborn, MI 48126

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-4596951 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Appendix of Warren Chiropractic & Rehab Clinic, P.C. Claims, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Appendix of Priority Patient Transport, LLC Bills, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Sample Chiropractic Exam form, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Sample Chiropractic Case History Form, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Sample Disability Certificate, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Sample Priority Patient Transport Bills, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Sample Warren Chiropractic Bills) (Cranmer, Thomas) (Entered: 04/15/2014)

#2

(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Cranmer, Thomas) (Entered: 04/15/2014)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick C. Harrigan on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Harrigan, Patrick) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Ross O. Silverman on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Silverman, Ross) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Allen on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Allen, Matthew) (Entered: 04/21/2014)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Sharon Michele Smith served on 4/22/2014, answer due 5/13/2014. (Cranmer, Thomas) (Entered: 04/28/2014)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. George Mousa Mufarreh served on 4/22/2014, answer due 5/13/2014. (Cranmer, Thomas) (Entered: 04/28/2014)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Priority Patient Transport LLC served on 4/22/2014, answer due 5/13/2014. (Cranmer, Thomas) (Entered: 04/28/2014)

#92

(#92) RESPONSE to 88 MOTION to Quash Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Subpoena and For a Protective Order filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Certificate of Amendment to the Articles of Organization of Cy Weiner & Associates, PLLC, filed August 7, 2008, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Certificate of Amendment to the Articles of Organization changing name of Weiner & Associates, PLLC to Applebaum & Stone, PLC, filed February 15, 2013, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 3-1 - Plaintiffs Supplemental Brief in Response to Summary Disposition Motion of Defendants Weiner, Applebaum, Stone & Marchenia, filed in Stephanie Reese v. Weiner & Associates, PLLC, et al., Case No. 12-003531-NO (Wayne Co. Circ. Ct), # 5 Exhibit Ex. 3-2 - Plaintiffs Supplemental Brief in Response to Summary Disposition Motion of Defendants Weiner, Applebaum, Stone & Marchenia, filed in Stephanie Reese v. Weiner & Associates, PLLC, et al., Case No. 12-003531-NO (Wayne Co. Circ. Ct), # 6 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Excerpts from March 24, 2016 Deposition Transcript of R.C. - Redacted, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Excerpts from Jan. 5, 2016 Deposition Transcript of Edward White - Redacted, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Subpoena duces tecum issued to Applebaum & Stone, PLC, dated August 21, 2015 Redacted, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 7 - Patient W.B. Settlement Statements Redacted, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 8 - Applebaum & Stone client questionnaire completed by E. White and October 10, 2013 invoice from E. White & Sons, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 9 - Contingency Fee Agreement between K.B. and Applebaum & Stone, dated October 10, 2013 Redacted, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 10 - Examples of Applebaum & Stone settlement distribution payments Redacted, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 11 - Excerpts from February 5, 2016 Deposition Transcript of John Mufarreh, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 12 - Edward White/John Mufarreh Text Messages Redacted, # 15 Exhibit Ex.13 - Excerpts from February 17, 2016 Deposition Transcript of Joseph Lobb, # 16 Exhibit Ex. 14 - 2014 and 2015 Annual Reports for Motor City Accident Attorneys, PLLC, # 17 Exhibit Ex. 15 - State Bar of Michigan admission information for attorney Todd Landau, # 18 Exhibit Ex. 16 - Excerpts from February 17, 2016 Deposition Transcript of Cherie Lobb, # 19 Exhibit Ex. 17 - Co-Counsel Agreement and Co-Counsel Agreement Banyan Financial between Motor City Accident Attorneys and The Lobb Law Firm, dated May 29, 2013 and July 18, 2013 - Redacted, # 20 Exhibit Ex. 18 - Applebaum & Stone, PLC website screenshot (http://applebaumstone.com), # 21 Exhibit Ex. 19 - White invoice to Applebaum & Stone and payments to Motor City Accident Attorneys - Redacted, # 22 Exhibit Ex. 20 - July 30, 2015 Order, Ivette Garcia v. Hayes Brothers Funeral Home, Inc., et al., Case No. 11-CA-08439-O (Circ. Ct. of the Ninth Judicial Circuit, Orange Co., Florida), # 23 Exhibit Ex. 21 - Notice of Rule 30(B)(6) Video Deposition of Applebaum & Stone, PLC, dated February 26, 2016, # 24 Exhibit Ex. 22 - February 26, 2016 email from P. Harrigan to J. Ahern) (Harrigan, Patrick) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

#91

(#91) Supplemental Lay WITNESS LIST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Chapple, Amelia) (Entered: 03/18/2016)

#90

(#90) Exhibit List by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Chapple, Amelia) (Entered: 03/18/2016)

#89

(#89) NOTICE OF HEARING on 88 MOTION to Quash . Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2016 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 03/17/2016)

#88

(#88) MOTION to Quash by Applebaum & Stone, PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5) (Ahern, Joseph) (Entered: 03/15/2016)

#87

(#87) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Ahern on behalf of Applebaum & Stone, PLC. (Ahern, Joseph) (Entered: 03/15/2016)

#86

(#86) RESPONSE to 81 MOTION to Quash State Farm's Subpoena and for Protective Order filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - 01/05/16 Deposition of Ed White (excerpts), # 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 - 03/30/12 Deposition of L.R. (excerpts) Redacted, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 3 - G.G. Forms (LOBB000375, 372, 349) Redacted, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Payments to White for D.M. (LOBB000001, 001775-76) Redacted, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 5 - S.T. Settlement Statement (LOBB0001406) Redacted, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 6 - 02/05/16 2/5/2016 J. Mufarreh Deposition excerpts, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 7 - Whites 10/26/2015 Objections and Responses to State Farms subpoena duces tecum, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 8 - Warren Responses to State Farms Second Set of Interrogatories, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 9 - 07/21/15 S. Abdullah deposition (excerpts), # 11 Exhibit Ex. 10 - 07/29/15 Deposition of C. Fuller (excerpts), # 12 Exhibit Ex. 11 - Check from Warren Chiropractic to Sandra White (COB0001248) Redacted, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 12 - 06/13/15 Ed White Subpoena Duces Tecum Redacted, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 13 - 10/09/15 Email from P. Harrigan to G. Blumberg, # 15 Exhibit Ex. 14 - 12/23/15 Deposition Subpoena to Ed White, # 16 Exhibit Ex. 15 - 1/11/16 Citizens Bank Subpoena Duces Tecum Redacted, # 17 Exhibit Ex. 16 - State Farms First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant John Mousa Mufarreh, # 18 Exhibit Ex. 17 -Defendant John Mousa Mufarrehs Supplemental Responses to State Farms First Set of Interrogatories Redacted) (Harrigan, Patrick) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#85

(#85) EXHIBIT Index and Exhibits A & B re 81 MOTION to Quash State Farm's Subpoena and for Protective Order by Edward White, Sandra White (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Supoenas to Citizens Bank, # 2 Exhibit B - Letters from Citizens Bank) (Joelson, Peter) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#84

(#84) STIPULATED ORDER Modifying Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#92) RESPONSE to 88 MOTION to Quash Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Subpoena and For a Protective Order filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Certificate of Amendment to the Articles of Organization of Cy Weiner & Associates, PLLC, filed August 7, 2008, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Certificate of Amendment to the Articles of Organization changing name of Weiner & Associates, PLLC to Applebaum & Stone, PLC, filed February 15, 2013, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 3-1 - Plaintiffs Supplemental Brief in Response to Summary Disposition Motion of Defendants Weiner, Applebaum, Stone & Marchenia, filed in Stephanie Reese v. Weiner & Associates, PLLC, et al., Case No. 12-003531-NO (Wayne Co. Circ. Ct), # 5 Exhibit Ex. 3-2 - Plaintiffs Supplemental Brief in Response to Summary Disposition Motion of Defendants Weiner, Applebaum, Stone & Marchenia, filed in Stephanie Reese v. Weiner & Associates, PLLC, et al., Case No. 12-003531-NO (Wayne Co. Circ. Ct), # 6 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Excerpts from March 24, 2016 Deposition Transcript of R.C. - Redacted, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Excerpts from Jan. 5, 2016 Deposition Transcript of Edward White - Redacted, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Subpoena duces tecum issued to Applebaum & Stone, PLC, dated August 21, 2015 Redacted, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 7 - Patient W.B. Settlement Statements Redacted, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 8 - Applebaum & Stone client questionnaire completed by E. White and October 10, 2013 invoice from E. White & Sons, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 9 - Contingency Fee Agreement between K.B. and Applebaum & Stone, dated October 10, 2013 Redacted, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 10 - Examples of Applebaum & Stone settlement distribution payments Redacted, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 11 - Excerpts from February 5, 2016 Deposition Transcript of John Mufarreh, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 12 - Edward White/John Mufarreh Text Messages Redacted, # 15 Exhibit Ex.13 - Excerpts from February 17, 2016 Deposition Transcript of Joseph Lobb, # 16 Exhibit Ex. 14 - 2014 and 2015 Annual Reports for Motor City Accident Attorneys, PLLC, # 17 Exhibit Ex. 15 - State Bar of Michigan admission information for attorney Todd Landau, # 18 Exhibit Ex. 16 - Excerpts from February 17, 2016 Deposition Transcript of Cherie Lobb, # 19 Exhibit Ex. 17 - Co-Counsel Agreement and Co-Counsel Agreement Banyan Financial between Motor City Accident Attorneys and The Lobb Law Firm, dated May 29, 2013 and July 18, 2013 - Redacted, # 20 Exhibit Ex. 18 - Applebaum & Stone, PLC website screenshot (http://applebaumstone.com), # 21 Exhibit Ex. 19 - White invoice to Applebaum & Stone and payments to Motor City Accident Attorneys - Redacted, # 22 Exhibit Ex. 20 - July 30, 2015 Order, Ivette Garcia v. Hayes Brothers Funeral Home, Inc., et al., Case No. 11-CA-08439-O (Circ. Ct. of the Ninth Judicial Circuit, Orange Co., Florida), # 23 Exhibit Ex. 21 - Notice of Rule 30(B)(6) Video Deposition of Applebaum & Stone, PLC, dated February 26, 2016, # 24 Exhibit Ex. 22 - February 26, 2016 email from P. Harrigan to J. Ahern) (Harrigan, Patrick) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#91) Supplemental Lay WITNESS LIST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Chapple, Amelia) (Entered: 03/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#90) Exhibit List by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Chapple, Amelia) (Entered: 03/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#89) NOTICE OF HEARING on 88 MOTION to Quash . Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2016 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 03/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#88) MOTION to Quash by Applebaum & Stone, PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5) (Ahern, Joseph) (Entered: 03/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#87) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Ahern on behalf of Applebaum & Stone, PLC. (Ahern, Joseph) (Entered: 03/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#86) RESPONSE to 81 MOTION to Quash State Farm's Subpoena and for Protective Order filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - 01/05/16 Deposition of Ed White (excerpts), # 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 - 03/30/12 Deposition of L.R. (excerpts) Redacted, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 3 - G.G. Forms (LOBB000375, 372, 349) Redacted, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Payments to White for D.M. (LOBB000001, 001775-76) Redacted, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 5 - S.T. Settlement Statement (LOBB0001406) Redacted, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 6 - 02/05/16 2/5/2016 J. Mufarreh Deposition excerpts, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 7 - Whites 10/26/2015 Objections and Responses to State Farms subpoena duces tecum, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 8 - Warren Responses to State Farms Second Set of Interrogatories, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 9 - 07/21/15 S. Abdullah deposition (excerpts), # 11 Exhibit Ex. 10 - 07/29/15 Deposition of C. Fuller (excerpts), # 12 Exhibit Ex. 11 - Check from Warren Chiropractic to Sandra White (COB0001248) Redacted, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 12 - 06/13/15 Ed White Subpoena Duces Tecum Redacted, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 13 - 10/09/15 Email from P. Harrigan to G. Blumberg, # 15 Exhibit Ex. 14 - 12/23/15 Deposition Subpoena to Ed White, # 16 Exhibit Ex. 15 - 1/11/16 Citizens Bank Subpoena Duces Tecum Redacted, # 17 Exhibit Ex. 16 - State Farms First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant John Mousa Mufarreh, # 18 Exhibit Ex. 17 -Defendant John Mousa Mufarrehs Supplemental Responses to State Farms First Set of Interrogatories Redacted) (Harrigan, Patrick) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#85) EXHIBIT Index and Exhibits A & B re 81 MOTION to Quash State Farm's Subpoena and for Protective Order by Edward White, Sandra White (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Supoenas to Citizens Bank, # 2 Exhibit B - Letters from Citizens Bank) (Joelson, Peter) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#84) STIPULATED ORDER Modifying Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#83) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 2/18/2016 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Keith Gover served on 4/22/2014, answer due 5/13/2014. (Cranmer, Thomas) (Entered: 04/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Priority Patient Transport LLC served on 4/22/2014, answer due 5/13/2014. (Cranmer, Thomas) (Entered: 04/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. George Mousa Mufarreh served on 4/22/2014, answer due 5/13/2014. (Cranmer, Thomas) (Entered: 04/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Sharon Michele Smith served on 4/22/2014, answer due 5/13/2014. (Cranmer, Thomas) (Entered: 04/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Allen on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Allen, Matthew) (Entered: 04/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Ross O. Silverman on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Silverman, Ross) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick C. Harrigan on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Harrigan, Patrick) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Cranmer, Thomas) (Entered: 04/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-4596951 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Appendix of Warren Chiropractic & Rehab Clinic, P.C. Claims, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Appendix of Priority Patient Transport, LLC Bills, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Sample Chiropractic Exam form, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Sample Chiropractic Case History Form, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Sample Disability Certificate, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Sample Priority Patient Transport Bills, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Sample Warren Chiropractic Bills) (Cranmer, Thomas) (Entered: 04/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.