This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2017 at 11:46:12 (UTC).

Stanford University v. The Chinese Univ. of Hong Kong

Case Summary

On 09/11/2015 Stanford University filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against The Chinese Univ of Hong Kong. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    15-2011

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stanford University

Defendant

The Chinese Univ. of Hong Kong

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 09/09/2015. [271250]Fee/IFP due on 09/25/2015. Entry of Appearance due 09/25/2015. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/25/2015. Docketing Statement due 09/25/2015. Appellant's brief is due 11/10/2015.

#4

(#4) Entry of appearance for Charles E. Lipsey as principal counsel for Appellee Chinese University Hong Kong. Service: 09/25/2015 by email. [275290]

#5

(#5) Entry of appearance for Howard W. Levine as of counsel for Appellee Chinese University Hong Kong. Service: 09/25/2015 by email. [275292]

#6

(#6) Entry of appearance for Robert F. McCauley as of counsel for Appellee Chinese University Hong Kong. Service: 09/25/2015 by email. [275293]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Steven P. O'Connor as of counsel for Appellee Chinese University Hong Kong. Service: 09/25/2015 by email. [275297]

#8

(#8) Entry of appearance for Lily Lim as of counsel for Appellee Chinese University Hong Kong. Service: 09/25/2015 by email. [275301]

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Chinese University Hong Kong. Service: 09/25/2015 by email. [275303]

#10

(#10) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Chinese University Hong Kong. Service: 09/25/2015 by email, US mail. [275330]

#11

(#11) Entry of appearance for Edward R. Reines as principal counsel for Appellant The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. Service: 09/25/2015 by email, US mail. [275456]

#25

(#25) MOTION of Appellee The Chinese University of Hong Kong to clarify the contents of the record on appeal. Response/Opposition is due 12/14/2015 [Consent: opposed]. Service: 11/30/2015 by email. [292386]

#26

(#26) Notice of Rejection to Appellee The Chinese University of Hong Kong, the following document(s): motion to clarify [25] is REJECTED for filing. Reason(s): Additional reliefs required. Caption does not reflect the official caption. Service: 11/30/2015 by email. [292531]

#27

(#27) MOTION of to clarify the contents of the record on appeal. Response/Opposition is due 12/14/2015, or to strike items from Stanford's Joint Appendix designations. Response/Opposition is due 12/14/2015 [Consent: opposed]. Service: 12/01/2015 by email. [292636]

#28

(#28) RESPONSE of Appellant The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University to the motion to clarify [25] filed by Appellee The Chinese University of Hong Kong in 15-2011. Service: 12/14/2015 by email. [296085]

#29

(#29) REPLY of Appellee The Chinese University of Hong Kong to response filed by Appellant in 15-2011 , Doc. No [28]. Service: 12/21/2015 by email. [297970]

#30

(#30) ORDER filed denying [27] motion for other relief; denying [27] motion to clarify. Service: 12/31/2015 by clerk. [299616]

#31

(#31) TENDERED from Appellant The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 01/11/2016 by email. [301956]

#32

(#32) BRIEF FILED for Appellant The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University [31]. Number of Pages: 62. Service: 01/11/2016 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 01/19/2016. Appellee The Chinese University of Hong Kong brief is due 02/25/2016. [302398]

#0130715920

(#0130715920) TENDERED from Appellant The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 01/11/2016 by email. [301956]

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#0130715920) TENDERED from Appellant The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 01/11/2016 by email. [301956]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) BRIEF FILED for Appellant The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University [31]. Number of Pages: 62. Service: 01/11/2016 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 01/19/2016. Appellee The Chinese University of Hong Kong brief is due 02/25/2016. [302398]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) TENDERED from Appellant The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 01/11/2016 by email. [301956]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER filed denying [27] motion for other relief; denying [27] motion to clarify. Service: 12/31/2015 by clerk. [299616]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) REPLY of Appellee The Chinese University of Hong Kong to response filed by Appellant in 15-2011 , Doc. No [28]. Service: 12/21/2015 by email. [297970]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) RESPONSE of Appellant The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University to the motion to clarify [25] filed by Appellee The Chinese University of Hong Kong in 15-2011. Service: 12/14/2015 by email. [296085]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MOTION of to clarify the contents of the record on appeal. Response/Opposition is due 12/14/2015, or to strike items from Stanford's Joint Appendix designations. Response/Opposition is due 12/14/2015 [Consent: opposed]. Service: 12/01/2015 by email. [292636]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Notice of Rejection to Appellee The Chinese University of Hong Kong, the following document(s): motion to clarify [25] is REJECTED for filing. Reason(s): Additional reliefs required. Caption does not reflect the official caption. Service: 11/30/2015 by email. [292531]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MOTION of Appellee The Chinese University of Hong Kong to clarify the contents of the record on appeal. Response/Opposition is due 12/14/2015 [Consent: opposed]. Service: 11/30/2015 by email. [292386]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Objection to the official caption pursuant to Rule 12 Practice Note by Appellee Chinese University Hong Kong. Service: 11/09/2015 by email. [287218]

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Entry of appearance for Derek C. Walter as of counsel for Appellant The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. Service: 09/25/2015 by email, US mail. [275458]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Entry of appearance for Edward R. Reines as principal counsel for Appellant The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. Service: 09/25/2015 by email, US mail. [275456]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Chinese University Hong Kong. Service: 09/25/2015 by email, US mail. [275330]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Chinese University Hong Kong. Service: 09/25/2015 by email. [275303]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Entry of appearance for Lily Lim as of counsel for Appellee Chinese University Hong Kong. Service: 09/25/2015 by email. [275301]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for Steven P. O'Connor as of counsel for Appellee Chinese University Hong Kong. Service: 09/25/2015 by email. [275297]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Entry of appearance for Robert F. McCauley as of counsel for Appellee Chinese University Hong Kong. Service: 09/25/2015 by email. [275293]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Entry of appearance for Howard W. Levine as of counsel for Appellee Chinese University Hong Kong. Service: 09/25/2015 by email. [275292]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Entry of appearance for Charles E. Lipsey as principal counsel for Appellee Chinese University Hong Kong. Service: 09/25/2015 by email. [275290]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 09/09/2015. [271250]Fee/IFP due on 09/25/2015. Entry of Appearance due 09/25/2015. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/25/2015. Docketing Statement due 09/25/2015. Appellant's brief is due 11/10/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.