This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2016 at 11:33:20 (UTC).

Standard Fabrics International, Inc. v. Rainbow USA, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2015 Standard Fabrics International, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Rainbow USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson and Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-08218

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson

Judge

Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Standard Fabrics International, Inc.

Defendants

Rainbow USA, Inc

Mangel Stores,Corp

Does

Intervenor Defendant

Louise Paris, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen M Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs APC

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Trevor William Barrett

Attorney at Doninger Burroughs APC

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Scott A Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs APC

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Intervenor Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Eric D Mason

Attorney at Arnold and Porter LLP

777 South Figueroa Street 44Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5844

Louis S Ederer

Attorney at Arnold and Porter LLP

399 Park Avenue

New York, NY 90022

Laura W Tejeda

Attorney at Arnold and Porter LLP

399 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10022-4699

Matthew T Salzmann

Attorney at Arnold and Porter LLP

399 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10022-4690

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16647241 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Standard Fabrics International, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint 1 as to defendants Mangel Stores,Corp, Rainbow USA, Inc. (esa) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc., upon Defendant Rainbow USA, Inc served on 10/26/2015, answer due 11/16/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Seltzer Sussman & Habermann LLP, Registered agent by leaving with Joann Hans- Authorized to accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

#38

(#38) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint 37 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

#37

(#37) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Intervenor-Defendant Louise Paris, Ltd..(Mason, Eric) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

#36

(#36) MINUTES (In Chambers): ORDER GRANTING Louise Paris, Ltd's MOTION to Intervene 28 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Motion is GRANTED. Louise Paris shall file its Answer in Intervention and Affirmative Defenses on or before 2/10/2016. The parties shall meet and confer regarding whether a stay should be entered in this case in light of the New York litigation. Plaintiff shall file a joint report (no more than 10 pages) by 2/16/2016, notifying the Court of the parties positions. If the parties are unable to reach agreement, each party shall state its proposal for how this case should proceed. The Court will consider the joint report in determining whether a stay is appropriate. (jp) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

#35

(#35) MINUTES OF NON PARTY LOUISE PARIS, LTD.'S MOTION TO INTERVENE 28 before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Courtroom Deputy Clerk distributes the Court's tentative ruling prior to the case being called. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. The Court hears oral argument from counsel and takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Sandra MacNeil. (jp) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

#34

(#34) MINUTE (In Chambers): ORDER RE STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: On the Court's own motion, the Court schedules a Status Conference to be heldon 2/5/2016 at 10:00 AM., in conjunction with the hearing scheduled forThird-Party Louise Paris, Ltd.'s Motion to Intervene. (jp) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#33

(#33) REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene 28 filed by Intervenor Defendant Louise Paris, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Mason, Eric) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

#32

(#32) Opposition in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene 28 ; Declaration of Trevor W. Barrett in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

#31

(#31) SCHEDULING NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's own motion, NonParty Louise Paris, LTD.'s Motion to Intervene 28 is ADVANCED to Friday, February 5, 2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/15/2016)

#30

(#30) DECLARATION of Laura W. Tejeda in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene 28 filed by Intervenor Defendant Louise Paris, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Declaration)(Mason, Eric) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint 37 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Intervenor-Defendant Louise Paris, Ltd..(Mason, Eric) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) MINUTES (In Chambers): ORDER GRANTING Louise Paris, Ltd's MOTION to Intervene 28 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Motion is GRANTED. Louise Paris shall file its Answer in Intervention and Affirmative Defenses on or before 2/10/2016. The parties shall meet and confer regarding whether a stay should be entered in this case in light of the New York litigation. Plaintiff shall file a joint report (no more than 10 pages) by 2/16/2016, notifying the Court of the parties positions. If the parties are unable to reach agreement, each party shall state its proposal for how this case should proceed. The Court will consider the joint report in determining whether a stay is appropriate. (jp) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) MINUTES OF NON PARTY LOUISE PARIS, LTD.'S MOTION TO INTERVENE 28 before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Courtroom Deputy Clerk distributes the Court's tentative ruling prior to the case being called. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. The Court hears oral argument from counsel and takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Sandra MacNeil. (jp) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) MINUTE (In Chambers): ORDER RE STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: On the Court's own motion, the Court schedules a Status Conference to be heldon 2/5/2016 at 10:00 AM., in conjunction with the hearing scheduled forThird-Party Louise Paris, Ltd.'s Motion to Intervene. (jp) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene 28 filed by Intervenor Defendant Louise Paris, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Mason, Eric) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Opposition in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene 28 ; Declaration of Trevor W. Barrett in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) SCHEDULING NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's own motion, NonParty Louise Paris, LTD.'s Motion to Intervene 28 is ADVANCED to Friday, February 5, 2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) DECLARATION of Laura W. Tejeda in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene 28 filed by Intervenor Defendant Louise Paris, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Declaration)(Mason, Eric) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene 28 filed by Intervenor Defendant Louise Paris, Ltd.. (Mason, Eric) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS CHANGE IN MAGISTRATE JUDGE INITIALS by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Please be advised that the initials used to identify the Honorable Karen L. Stevenson, United States Magistrate Judge have been changed from (KLSx) to (KSx). (rrp) (Entered: 11/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc., upon Defendant Rainbow USA, Inc served on 10/26/2015, answer due 11/16/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Seltzer Sussman & Habermann LLP, Registered agent by leaving with Joann Hans- Authorized to accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint 1 as to defendants Mangel Stores,Corp, Rainbow USA, Inc. (esa) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16647241 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Standard Fabrics International, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.