This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2016 at 02:28:08 (UTC).

Standard Fabrics International Inc v. Apollo Apparel Group LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2015 Standard Fabrics International Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Apollo Apparel Group LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal and Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-05514

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal

Judge

Judge Consuelo B. Marshall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Standard Fabrics International Inc

Defendants

Ross Stores Inc

Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corp.

Apollo Apparel Group LLC

Bealls, Inc.

Macys Inc

Does

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Trevor William Barrett

Attorney at Doninger Burroughs APC

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Stephen M Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs APC

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Scott A Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs APC

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Justin M Gomes

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs APC

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Defendant Attorneys

Seth Reagan

Attorney at Manatt Phelps and Phillips LLP

11355 West Olympic Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Justin Jones Rodriguez

Attorney at Manatt Phelps and Phillips LLP

11355 West Olympic Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Andrew V Jablon

Attorney at Resch Polster and Berger LLP

1840 Century Park East 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16120158 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International Inc. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Standard Fabrics International Inc(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International Inc, (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix "Schedule A")(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Standard Fabrics International Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (ghap) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants Apollo Apparel Group LLC, Bealls, Inc., Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corp., Macys Inc, Ross Stores Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Honorable Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND MAY DIFFER IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (jp) (Entered: 07/28/2015)

#9

(#9) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International Inc (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#25

(#25) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corp., identifying Standard Fabrics International, Inc., Plaintiff; Apollo Apparel Group LLC, Defendant; Ross Stores, Inc., Defendant; Bealls, Inc., Defendant; Macys, Inc., Defendant; Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, a Delaware corporation, Defendant; Burlington Coat Factory Investments Holdings, Inc. (BCFIH), Parent entity to Defendant Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation; Burlington Coat Factory Holdings, Inc. (BCFH), Parent Entity to BCFIH Burlington Stores, Inc., Parent Entity to BCFH. (Reagan, Seth) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

#26

(#26) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition 9 ; Jury Demand filed by Defendant Bealls, Inc..(Reagan, Seth) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

#27

(#27) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bealls, Inc., identifying Standard Fabrics International, Inc., Plaintiff; Apollo Apparel Group LLC, Defendant; Ross Stores, Inc., Defendant; Bealls Department Stores, Inc., Defendant; Macys, Inc., Defendant; Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corp., Defendant. (Reagan, Seth) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

#28

(#28) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition 9 filed by Defendant Macys Inc.(Reagan, Seth) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

#29

(#29) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Macys Inc, identifying Standard Fabrics International, Inc,Apollo Apparel Group LLC, Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corp, Bealls, Inc., Ross Stores, Inc., Macys Retail Holdings, Inc.. (Reagan, Seth) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

#30

(#30) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Justin Jones Rodriguez counsel for Defendants Apollo Apparel Group LLC, Bealls, Inc., Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corp., Macys Inc, Ross Stores Inc. Adding Justin Jones Rodriguez as counsel of record for APOLLO APPAREL GROUP, LLC; ROSS STORES, INC.; BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY DIRECT CORPORATION; BEALLS, INC.; and MACYS RETAIL HOLDINGS, INC. (erroneously sued as Macys, Inc., individually and doing business as MACYS.COM and Bloomingdales) for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants APOLLO APPAREL GROUP, LLC; ROSS STORES, INC.; BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY DIRECT CORPORATION; BEALLS, INC.; and MACYS RETAIL HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attorney Justin Jones Rodriguez added to party Apollo Apparel Group LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Justin Jones Rodriguez added to party Bealls, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Justin Jones Rodriguez added to party Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Justin Jones Rodriguez added to party Macys Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Justin Jones Rodriguez added to party Ross Stores Inc(pty:dft))(Rodriguez, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

#31

(#31) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Justin Jones Rodriguez counsel for Defendants Apollo Apparel Group LLC, Bealls, Inc., Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corp., Macys Inc, Ross Stores Inc. Seth Reagan is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants APOLLO APPAREL GROUP, LLC; ROSS STORES, INC.; BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY DIRECT CORPORATION; BEALLS, INC.; and MACYS RETAIL HOLDINGS, INC.. (Rodriguez, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

#32

(#32) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#33

(#33) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - OFF THE RECORD by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS ORDERED as follows: The Scheduling Conference, currently set for November 17, 2015, is hereby taken off calendar.; Initial disclosures shall be completed by December 1, 2015.; ADR-1 Form shall be filed on or before November 24, 2015.; Fact discovery shall be completed on or before April 15, 2016.; Expert discovery shall be completed on or before May 16, 2016.; Settlement conference shall be held on or before May 31, 2016.; Motions shall be set for oral argument on or before June 14, 2016 at 10:00 a.m.; Pre Trial Conference is set on July 11, 2016 at 2:30 p.m.; Jury Trial is set on August 9, 2016 at 10:00 a.m.(est. 4-5 days). (shb) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - OFF THE RECORD by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS ORDERED as follows: The Scheduling Conference, currently set for November 17, 2015, is hereby taken off calendar.; Initial disclosures shall be completed by December 1, 2015.; ADR-1 Form shall be filed on or before November 24, 2015.; Fact discovery shall be completed on or before April 15, 2016.; Expert discovery shall be completed on or before May 16, 2016.; Settlement conference shall be held on or before May 31, 2016.; Motions shall be set for oral argument on or before June 14, 2016 at 10:00 a.m.; Pre Trial Conference is set on July 11, 2016 at 2:30 p.m.; Jury Trial is set on August 9, 2016 at 10:00 a.m.(est. 4-5 days). (shb) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Justin Jones Rodriguez counsel for Defendants Apollo Apparel Group LLC, Bealls, Inc., Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corp., Macys Inc, Ross Stores Inc. Seth Reagan is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants APOLLO APPAREL GROUP, LLC; ROSS STORES, INC.; BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY DIRECT CORPORATION; BEALLS, INC.; and MACYS RETAIL HOLDINGS, INC.. (Rodriguez, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Justin Jones Rodriguez counsel for Defendants Apollo Apparel Group LLC, Bealls, Inc., Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corp., Macys Inc, Ross Stores Inc. Adding Justin Jones Rodriguez as counsel of record for APOLLO APPAREL GROUP, LLC; ROSS STORES, INC.; BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY DIRECT CORPORATION; BEALLS, INC.; and MACYS RETAIL HOLDINGS, INC. (erroneously sued as Macys, Inc., individually and doing business as MACYS.COM and Bloomingdales) for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants APOLLO APPAREL GROUP, LLC; ROSS STORES, INC.; BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY DIRECT CORPORATION; BEALLS, INC.; and MACYS RETAIL HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attorney Justin Jones Rodriguez added to party Apollo Apparel Group LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Justin Jones Rodriguez added to party Bealls, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Justin Jones Rodriguez added to party Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Justin Jones Rodriguez added to party Macys Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Justin Jones Rodriguez added to party Ross Stores Inc(pty:dft))(Rodriguez, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Macys Inc, identifying Standard Fabrics International, Inc,Apollo Apparel Group LLC, Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corp, Bealls, Inc., Ross Stores, Inc., Macys Retail Holdings, Inc.. (Reagan, Seth) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition 9 filed by Defendant Macys Inc.(Reagan, Seth) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bealls, Inc., identifying Standard Fabrics International, Inc., Plaintiff; Apollo Apparel Group LLC, Defendant; Ross Stores, Inc., Defendant; Bealls Department Stores, Inc., Defendant; Macys, Inc., Defendant; Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corp., Defendant. (Reagan, Seth) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition 9 ; Jury Demand filed by Defendant Bealls, Inc..(Reagan, Seth) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corp., identifying Standard Fabrics International, Inc., Plaintiff; Apollo Apparel Group LLC, Defendant; Ross Stores, Inc., Defendant; Bealls, Inc., Defendant; Macys, Inc., Defendant; Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, a Delaware corporation, Defendant; Burlington Coat Factory Investments Holdings, Inc. (BCFIH), Parent entity to Defendant Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation; Burlington Coat Factory Holdings, Inc. (BCFH), Parent Entity to BCFIH Burlington Stores, Inc., Parent Entity to BCFH. (Reagan, Seth) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition 9 ; Jury Demand filed by Defendant Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corp..(Reagan, Seth) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International Inc, upon Defendant Ross Stores Inc served on 7/24/2015, answer due 8/14/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System- Registered agent by leaving with Amanda Garcia- Person authorized to accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International Inc (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Honorable Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND MAY DIFFER IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (jp) (Entered: 07/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants Apollo Apparel Group LLC, Bealls, Inc., Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corp., Macys Inc, Ross Stores Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (ghap) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Standard Fabrics International Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix "Schedule A")(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International Inc, (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16120158 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International Inc. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Standard Fabrics International Inc(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less