This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/27/2016 at 07:27:47 (UTC).

Stambler v. MasterCard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2014 Stambler filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against MasterCard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley and Judge K. Michael Moore. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:14-CV-60830

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley

Judge

Judge K. Michael Moore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leon Stambler

Counter Claimants and Counter Defendants

MasterCard Incorporated

MasterCard International Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua B. Spector

Attorney at Perlman, Bajandas, Yevoli & Albright, P.L.

1000 Brickell Avenue, Suite 600

Miami, FL 33131

Edward R. Nelson, III

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Casto

3131 W. 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Barry J. Bumgardner

Attorney at Nelson, Bumgardner, Casto, P.C.

3131 W. 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Counter Claimant and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Eliot D. Williams

Robert C. Scheinfeld

Christopher R. Patrick

Janet T. Munn

Joshua B. Spector

Attorney at Perlman, Bajandas, Yevoli & Albright, P.L.

1000 Brickell Avenue, Suite 600

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-6634599, filed by Leon Stambler. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Summon(s), # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark)(Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 04/08/2014)

#2

(#2) Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard (ar2) (Entered: 04/08/2014)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to MasterCard Incorporated and MasterCard International Incorporated. (ar2) (Entered: 04/08/2014)

#4

(#4) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (ar2) (Entered: 04/08/2014)

#5

(#5) Order Transferring Case Pursuant to Administrative Order 2011-53. This matter is hereby reassigned to the calendar of United States District Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks for all further proceedings, Judge Joan A. Lenard no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 4/8/2014. (tpe) (Entered: 04/09/2014)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Edward R. Nelson, III. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 5056. (ksa) (Entered: 04/11/2014)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Barry J. Bumgardner. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 5056. (ksa) (Entered: 04/11/2014)

#8

(#8) Notice of Pendency of Other Action by Leon Stambler (Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 04/11/2014)

#9

(#9) Defendants' MasterCard Incorporated and MasterCard International Incorporated ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , Defendant's COUNTERCLAIM against MasterCard International Incorporated, MasterCard Incorporated by MasterCard International Incorporated, MasterCard Incorporated. Attorney Janet T. Munn added to party MasterCard Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Janet T. Munn added to party MasterCard International Incorporated(pty:dft). (Munn, Janet) (Entered: 05/02/2014)

#48

(#48) NOTICE by Leon Stambler re 47 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,,,, RE Pending Petition for Covered Business Method Review of U.S. Patent No. 5.793.302 (Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 04/07/2015)

#49

(#49) NOTICE by MasterCard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated Regarding Covered Business Method Review and Motion to Extend Stay of all Proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Munn, Janet) (Entered: 04/23/2015)

#50

(#50) PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon the Parties Joint Motion to Extend Stay of All Proceedings 49 . The Parties ask that this civil action remain stayed until the United States Patent Trial and Appeal Board ("PTAB") issues a decision on Defendant MasterCard's covered business method ("CBM") review of U.S. Patent 5,793,302. UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion 49 . the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Stay of All Proceedings 49 is GRANTED. This case remains stayed until further order of this Court. The Parties are jointly ORDERED to (1) notify this Court within seven (7) days of the PTAB's decision on whether to initiate CBM review of the subject patent; (2) file a monthly status update in this Court beginning July 10, 2015, for as long as the application for CBM review remains pending before the PTAB; and (3) notify this Court within seven (7) days of the completed review of the patent, should the PTAB initiate CBM review. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/24/2015. (mg00) (Entered: 04/24/2015)

#51

(#51) NOTICE by Leon Stambler re 50 Order,,,, and Mastercard Incorporated and Mastercard International Incorporated (Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 07/10/2015)

#52

(#52) NOTICE by MasterCard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated, Leon Stambler re 50 Order,,,, . Attorney Joshua B. Spector added to party MasterCard Incorporated(pty:cd), Attorney Joshua B. Spector added to party MasterCard International Incorporated(pty:cd). (Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

#53

(#53) NOTICE by MasterCard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated, Leon Stambler re 50 Order,,,, Joint Notice Regarding Pending Petition for Covered Business Method Review (Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

#54

(#54) NOTICE by MasterCard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated, Leon Stambler re 50 Order,,,, Joint Notice Regarding Pending Petition for Covered Business Method Review of U.S. Patent No. 5.793.302 (Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

#55

(#55) NOTICE by MasterCard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated, Leon Stambler re 50 Order,,,, Joint Notice Regarding Pending Petition for Covered Business Method Review of U.S. Patent No. 5.793.302 (Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#56

(#56) NOTICE by MasterCard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated, Leon Stambler re 50 Order,,,, (Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 12/10/2015)

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) NOTICE by MasterCard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated, Leon Stambler re 50 Order,,,, (Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 12/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) NOTICE by MasterCard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated, Leon Stambler re 50 Order,,,, Joint Notice Regarding Pending Petition for Covered Business Method Review of U.S. Patent No. 5.793.302 (Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) NOTICE by MasterCard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated, Leon Stambler re 50 Order,,,, Joint Notice Regarding Pending Petition for Covered Business Method Review of U.S. Patent No. 5.793.302 (Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) NOTICE by MasterCard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated, Leon Stambler re 50 Order,,,, Joint Notice Regarding Pending Petition for Covered Business Method Review (Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) NOTICE by MasterCard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated, Leon Stambler re 50 Order,,,, . Attorney Joshua B. Spector added to party MasterCard Incorporated(pty:cd), Attorney Joshua B. Spector added to party MasterCard International Incorporated(pty:cd). (Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) NOTICE by Leon Stambler re 50 Order,,,, and Mastercard Incorporated and Mastercard International Incorporated (Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 07/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon the Parties Joint Motion to Extend Stay of All Proceedings 49 . The Parties ask that this civil action remain stayed until the United States Patent Trial and Appeal Board ("PTAB") issues a decision on Defendant MasterCard's covered business method ("CBM") review of U.S. Patent 5,793,302. UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion 49 . the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Stay of All Proceedings 49 is GRANTED. This case remains stayed until further order of this Court. The Parties are jointly ORDERED to (1) notify this Court within seven (7) days of the PTAB's decision on whether to initiate CBM review of the subject patent; (2) file a monthly status update in this Court beginning July 10, 2015, for as long as the application for CBM review remains pending before the PTAB; and (3) notify this Court within seven (7) days of the completed review of the patent, should the PTAB initiate CBM review. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/24/2015. (mg00) (Entered: 04/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) NOTICE by MasterCard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated Regarding Covered Business Method Review and Motion to Extend Stay of all Proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Munn, Janet) (Entered: 04/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) NOTICE by Leon Stambler re 47 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,,,, RE Pending Petition for Covered Business Method Review of U.S. Patent No. 5.793.302 (Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 04/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon the Parties' Joint Motion Regarding Inter Partes Review and Motion to Extend Stay of All Proceedings 45 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Joint Motion 45 , the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Joint Motion 45 is GRANTED. This case remains STAYED until the United States Patent Trial and Appeal Board ("PTAB") issues a decision on the pending petition for Covered Business Method Review of U.S. Patent 5,793,302 (CBM2015-00013). The Parties are ORDERED: (1) to notify this Court within seven (7) days of the PTAB's decision on whether to initiate Covered Business Method Review; (2) to file a monthly status update in this Court beginning April 8, 2015 for as long as the petition remains pending before the PTAB; and (3) to notify this Court within seven (7) days of the completed review of the patent, should the PTAB initiate Covered Business Method Review. This case remains administratively CLOSED. If the Parties subsequently move to lift the stay, they shall concurrently indicate which motions they wish to reinstate. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 11/12/2014. (dht) (Entered: 11/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed MOTION of Christopher R. Patrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Defendants, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 78696. (ksa) (Entered: 05/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Defendants' MasterCard Incorporated and MasterCard International Incorporated ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , Defendant's COUNTERCLAIM against MasterCard International Incorporated, MasterCard Incorporated by MasterCard International Incorporated, MasterCard Incorporated. Attorney Janet T. Munn added to party MasterCard Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Janet T. Munn added to party MasterCard International Incorporated(pty:dft). (Munn, Janet) (Entered: 05/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Pendency of Other Action by Leon Stambler (Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 04/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Barry J. Bumgardner. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 5056. (ksa) (Entered: 04/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Edward R. Nelson, III. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 5056. (ksa) (Entered: 04/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Transferring Case Pursuant to Administrative Order 2011-53. This matter is hereby reassigned to the calendar of United States District Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks for all further proceedings, Judge Joan A. Lenard no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 4/8/2014. (tpe) (Entered: 04/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (ar2) (Entered: 04/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to MasterCard Incorporated and MasterCard International Incorporated. (ar2) (Entered: 04/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard (ar2) (Entered: 04/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-6634599, filed by Leon Stambler. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Summon(s), # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark)(Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 04/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mastercard International Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Mastercard Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barry Bumgardner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Byrne Spector