This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 23:16:30 (UTC).

Stace Cheverez v. Plains All American Pipeline, LP

Case Summary

On 06/01/2015 Stace Cheverez filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Plains All American Pipeline, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott and Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-04113

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott

Judge

Judge Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Santa Barbara Uni, Inc.

Baciu Family, LLC

Robert Boydston

Gary Harden

Alelia Parenteau

Jim Guelker

Weihai Zhuang

Stace Cheverez

Jamie Klein

Morgan Castagnola

Captain Jack's Santa Barbara Tours, LLC

Mary Kirkhart

Southern Cal Seafood, Inc.

Stephen Wilson

Crab Cowboys, LLC

Tiffani Andrews

Jacques Habra

Arnold Baez

Sarah Rathbone

Devon Grace

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

A Barry Cappello

Attorney at Cappello and Noel LLP

831 State Street

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Leila J Noel

Attorney at Cappello and Noel LLP

831 State St

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Juli E Farris

Attorney at Keller Rohrback LLP

1129 State Street Suite 8

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Gretchen Freeman Cappio

Attorney at Keller Rohrback LLP

1201 Third Avenue Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101

Matthew J Preusch

Attorney at Keller Rohrback LLP

1129 State Street Suite 8

Santa Barbara, CA 92101

Alexander H Lim

Attorney at Hyde and Swigart APC

7121 Magnolia Avenue Suite J

Riverside, CA 92504

Jonas Palmer Mann

Attorney at Audet & Partners LLP

221 Main Street, Suite 1460

San Francisco, CA 94105

Seyed Abbas Kazerounian

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group APC

245 Fischer Avenue Suite D1

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Theodore H Chase

Attorney at Audet and Partners LLP

221 Main Street Suite 1460

San Francisco, CA 94105

Matthew M Loker

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group APC

245 Fischer Avenue Suite D1

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Sean Clinton Woods

Attorney at Audet and Partners LLP

711 Van Ness Avenue Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94102

Other Attorneys

Susan C Yu

Attorney at Susan Yu Law Group APC

10390 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 220

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Elizabeth Pannill Fletcher

Attorney at Ahmad Zavitsanos Anaipakos Alavi and Mensing PC

1221 Mckinney Street Suite 3460

Houston, TX 77010

Laura Wirth

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP

355 South Grand Avenue 35Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Brad D Brian

Attorney at Munger Tolles and Olson LLP

355 South Grand Avenue 35Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

Meghan Marie Baker

Attorney at Downey Brand LLP

621 Capitol Mall 18Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

Daniel Benjamin Levin

Attorney at Munger Tolles and Olson LLP

355 South Grand Avenue 35Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Olivia M Wright

Attorney at Downey Brand LLP

621 Capitol Mall 18Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

William R Warne

Attorney at Downey Brand LLP

621 Capitol Mall 18Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814-4731

RoseMarie Maliekel

Attorney at Lief Cabraser Heimann and Bernstein LLP

275 Battery Street 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-15820622 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Stace Cheverez. (Attorney Matthew J Preusch added to party Stace Cheverez(pty:pla))(Preusch, Matthew) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Stace Cheverez. (Preusch, Matthew) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Stace Cheverez. (Preusch, Matthew) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Stace Cheverez, (Preusch, Matthew) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

#6

(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant Plains All American Pipeline, LP. (ghap) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Gretchen Freeman Cappio for Plaintiff Stace Cheverez. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (ghap) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Daniel P Mensher for Plaintiff Stace Cheverez. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (ghap) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 14-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV15-04113 PSG (JEMx). (mg) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

#87

(#87) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Thomas P Clancy on behalf of Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, LP, Plains Pipeline, LP (Attorney Thomas P Clancy added to party Plains All American Pipeline, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas P Clancy added to party Plains Pipeline, LP(pty:dft))(Clancy, Thomas) (Entered: 04/06/2016)

#88

(#88) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Plains All American Pipeline, LP, Plains Pipeline, LP amending Amended Complaint/Petition, 50 , filed by plaintiff Ocean Angel IV, LLC, Hwa Hong Muh, Eagle Fleet LLC, Pacific Rim Fisheries, Inc, Tiffani Andrews, Robert Boydston, Southern Cal Seafood, Inc., Alexandra B Geremia, Jamie Klein, Richard Lilygren, Baciu Family, LLC, Mike Gandall, Keith Andrews, Jacques Habra, Sarah Rathbone, Zachary Frazier, Community Seafood LLC, Jim Guelker, Captain Jack's Santa Barbara Tours, LLC, Morgan Castagnola, Wei International Trading Inc., Crab Cowboys, LLC, iSurf, LLC, Tractide Marine Corp., Santa Barbara Uni, Inc., Stephen Wilson, Mary Kirkhart, Mark Kirkhart(Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Eagle Fleet LLC(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Mike Gandall(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Hwa Hong Muh(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Captain Jack's Santa Barbara Tours, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Morgan Castagnola(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Crab Cowboys, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Zachary Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Jim Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party iSurf, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Mark Kirkhart(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Mary Kirkhart(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Community Seafood LLC(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Santa Barbara Uni, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Tractide Marine Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Wei International Trading Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Stephen Wilson(pty:pla))(Cappello, A) (Entered: 04/06/2016)

#89

(#89) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Joseph Viens pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to All Defendants. (Farris, Juli) (Entered: 04/06/2016)

#90

(#90) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Henry Weissmann on behalf of Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, LP, Plains Pipeline, LP (Attorney Henry Weissmann added to party Plains All American Pipeline, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Henry Weissmann added to party Plains Pipeline, LP(pty:dft))(Weissmann, Henry) (Entered: 04/08/2016)

#91

(#91) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Plains All American Pipeline, LP answer now due 5/2/2016; Plains Pipeline, LP answer now due 5/2/2016, re Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,, 88 filed by Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, LP; Plains Pipeline, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wirth, Laura) (Entered: 04/19/2016)

#92

(#92) REQUEST of Downey Brand LLP - William R. Warne, et al. to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, LP, Plains Pipeline, LP. (Warne, William) (Entered: 04/20/2016)

#93

(#93) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request to Withdraw Attorney 92 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Proposed G-01 order was not attached to the Request. A stand-alone proposed order can be e-filed by submitting a Notice of Lodging, with the separate, additional attachment of the proposed order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 04/21/2016)

#94

(#94) NOTICE OF LODGING filed RE Proposed Order re REQUEST of Downey Brand LLP - William R. Warne, et al. to Withdraw as Attorney 92 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Warne, William) (Entered: 04/21/2016)

#95

(#95) ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' CORRECTED CONSOLIDATED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Defendants PLAINS ALL AMERICAN PIPELINE, L.P. AND PLAINS PIPELINE, L.P. may have until and including May 2, 2016 to respond to Plaintiffs' Corrected Consolidated Second Amended Complaint. (bm) (Entered: 04/21/2016)

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#95) ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' CORRECTED CONSOLIDATED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Defendants PLAINS ALL AMERICAN PIPELINE, L.P. AND PLAINS PIPELINE, L.P. may have until and including May 2, 2016 to respond to Plaintiffs' Corrected Consolidated Second Amended Complaint. (bm) (Entered: 04/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#94) NOTICE OF LODGING filed RE Proposed Order re REQUEST of Downey Brand LLP - William R. Warne, et al. to Withdraw as Attorney 92 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Warne, William) (Entered: 04/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#93) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request to Withdraw Attorney 92 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Proposed G-01 order was not attached to the Request. A stand-alone proposed order can be e-filed by submitting a Notice of Lodging, with the separate, additional attachment of the proposed order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 04/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#92) REQUEST of Downey Brand LLP - William R. Warne, et al. to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, LP, Plains Pipeline, LP. (Warne, William) (Entered: 04/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#91) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Plains All American Pipeline, LP answer now due 5/2/2016; Plains Pipeline, LP answer now due 5/2/2016, re Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,, 88 filed by Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, LP; Plains Pipeline, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wirth, Laura) (Entered: 04/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#90) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Henry Weissmann on behalf of Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, LP, Plains Pipeline, LP (Attorney Henry Weissmann added to party Plains All American Pipeline, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Henry Weissmann added to party Plains Pipeline, LP(pty:dft))(Weissmann, Henry) (Entered: 04/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#89) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Joseph Viens pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to All Defendants. (Farris, Juli) (Entered: 04/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#88) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Plains All American Pipeline, LP, Plains Pipeline, LP amending Amended Complaint/Petition, 50 , filed by plaintiff Ocean Angel IV, LLC, Hwa Hong Muh, Eagle Fleet LLC, Pacific Rim Fisheries, Inc, Tiffani Andrews, Robert Boydston, Southern Cal Seafood, Inc., Alexandra B Geremia, Jamie Klein, Richard Lilygren, Baciu Family, LLC, Mike Gandall, Keith Andrews, Jacques Habra, Sarah Rathbone, Zachary Frazier, Community Seafood LLC, Jim Guelker, Captain Jack's Santa Barbara Tours, LLC, Morgan Castagnola, Wei International Trading Inc., Crab Cowboys, LLC, iSurf, LLC, Tractide Marine Corp., Santa Barbara Uni, Inc., Stephen Wilson, Mary Kirkhart, Mark Kirkhart(Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Eagle Fleet LLC(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Mike Gandall(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Hwa Hong Muh(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Captain Jack's Santa Barbara Tours, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Morgan Castagnola(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Crab Cowboys, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Zachary Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Jim Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party iSurf, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Mark Kirkhart(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Mary Kirkhart(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Community Seafood LLC(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Santa Barbara Uni, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Tractide Marine Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Wei International Trading Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney A Barry Cappello added to party Stephen Wilson(pty:pla))(Cappello, A) (Entered: 04/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#87) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Thomas P Clancy on behalf of Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, LP, Plains Pipeline, LP (Attorney Thomas P Clancy added to party Plains All American Pipeline, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas P Clancy added to party Plains Pipeline, LP(pty:dft))(Clancy, Thomas) (Entered: 04/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#86) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel Benjamin Levin on behalf of Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, LP, Plains Pipeline, LP (Attorney Daniel Benjamin Levin added to party Plains All American Pipeline, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Benjamin Levin added to party Plains Pipeline, LP(pty:dft))(Levin, Daniel) (Entered: 04/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (dgon) (Entered: 06/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 14-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV15-04113 PSG (JEMx). (mg) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Daniel P Mensher for Plaintiff Stace Cheverez. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (ghap) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Gretchen Freeman Cappio for Plaintiff Stace Cheverez. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (ghap) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant Plains All American Pipeline, LP. (ghap) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Stace Cheverez, (Preusch, Matthew) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Stace Cheverez. (Preusch, Matthew) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Stace Cheverez. (Preusch, Matthew) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-15820622 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Stace Cheverez. (Attorney Matthew J Preusch added to party Stace Cheverez(pty:pla))(Preusch, Matthew) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura Wirth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RoseMarie Maliekel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Ross Warne

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brad Dennis Brian