This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:55:46 (UTC).

St. Isidore Research, LLC v. Comerica Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2015 St Isidore Research, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Comerica Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne and Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-01390

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant, Consolidated Plaintiff and Consolidated Counter Defendant

St. Isidore Research, LLC

Defendants

Comerica Incorporated

Comerica Bank

Counter Claimants and Consolidated Defendants

Legacy Texas Group, Inc.

ViewPoint Bank

ViewPoint Financial Group, Inc.

LegacyTexas Bank

Frost Bank

Amegy Bank, N.A

United Services Automobile Association

Texas Capital Bancshares, Inc.

Ally Financial Inc.

Ally Bank

Texas Capital Bank, N.A.

Cullen/Frost Bankers, Inc.

Southside Bank

Southside Bancshare, Inc.

Consolidated Defendants, Consolidated Counter Defendants and Consolidated Plaintiffs

Amegy Bank, N.A

St. Isidore Research, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Jeff Kaplan

Dallas, TX 75225

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Consolidated Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin T Wang

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kyunghoon John Woo

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas E Bejin

Attorney at Bejin Bieneman PLC

300 River Place, Suite 1650

Detroit, MI 48207

Charles A Bieneman

Attorney at Bejin Bieneman PLC

300 River Place, Suite 1650

Detroit, MI 48207

Eric Hugh Findlay

Attorney at Findlay Craft PC

102 N College Avenue, Suite 900

Tyler, TX 75702

Nick E Williamson

Attorney at Bryan Cave LLP - St Louis

One Metropolitan Square, 211 North Broadway, Suite 3600

St Louis, MO 63102-2750

David A Roodman

Attorney at Bryan Cave LLP - St Louis

One Metropolitan Square, 211 North Broadway, Suite 3600

St Louis, MO 63102-2750

Counter Claimant and Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

Russell Scarritt Jones, Jr

Attorney at Polsinelli PC - Kansas City

900 W. 48Th Place, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112

Kevin Lowell Daffer

Attorney at Matheson Keys Daffer & Kordzik PLLC

7004 Bee Cave Road, Bldg. 1, Suite 110

Austin, TX 78746

Stephen E Baskin

Attorney at Mayer Brown, LLP - DC

1999 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1101

Michael Lindinger

Attorney at Mayer Brown, LLP - DC

1999 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1101

Dara M Kurlancheek

Attorney at Mayer Brown, LLP - DC

1999 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1101

Michael T Zoppo

Attorney at Fish & Richardson - New York

601 Lexington Ave, 52Nd Fl

New York, NY 10022

Matthew C Berntsen

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC - Boston

One Marina Park Drive

Boston, MA 02210

Jeffrey Lance Johnson

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP - Houston

1301 Mckinney, Suite 4100

Houston, TX 77010-3096

Aaron Gabriel Fountain

Attorney at DLA Piper USA LLP-Houston

1000 Louisiana, Suite 2800

Houston, TX 77002-5005

John M Guaragna

Attorney at DLA Piper US LLP - Austin

401 Congress Ave, Suite 2500

Austin, TX 78701-3799

J Stephen Ravel

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman - Austin

301 Congress Ave., Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Consolidated Counter Defendant Attorney

Marc A Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

12 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5325038.), filed by St. Isidore Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by St. Isidore Research, LLC (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian D Ledahl on behalf of St. Isidore Research, LLC (Ledahl, Brian) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin T Wang on behalf of St. Isidore Research, LLC (Wang, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyunghoon John Woo on behalf of St. Isidore Research, LLC (Woo, Kyunghoon) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

#7

(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/4/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of St. Isidore Research, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Issued as to Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es))(nkl, ) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

#117

(#117) NOTICE by United Services Automobile Association Joinder (Zoppo, Michael) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#116

(#116) Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending CBM Review by Amegy Bank, N.A, Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated, Cullen/Frost Bankers, Inc., Frost Bank, Southside Bancshare, Inc., Southside Bank, Texas Capital Bancshares, Inc., Texas Capital Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - CBM Petition 7,904,360 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B - CBM Petition 8,589,271 Patent, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Tonya) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

#115

(#115) ORDER granting 114 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Defendants LegacyTexas Group, Inc., ViewPoint Financial Group, Inc. and ViewPoint Bank filed by St. Isidore Research, LLC., LegacyTexas Bank (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv1392), LegacyTexas Bank (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv1392), ViewPoint Bank (Member case # 2:15cv1392), ViewPoint Bank (Member case # 2:15cv1392), ViewPoint Financial Group, Inc. (Member case # 2:15cv1392), ViewPoint Financial Group, Inc. (Member case # 2:15cv1392), Legacy Texas Group, Inc. (Member case # 2:15cv1392) and Legacy Texas Group, Inc. (Member case # 2:15cv1392) terminated., Attorney Russell Scarritt Jones, Jr; Dara M Kurlancheek; Michael Lindinger; Jason Dwain Mazingo; Richard Paul Stitt; Stephen E Baskin and Jay E Heidrick terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/25/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

#114

(#114) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Defendants LegacyTexas Group, Inc., ViewPoint Financial Group, Inc. and ViewPoint Bank by St. Isidore Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#113

(#113) NOTICE by Legacy Texas Group, Inc., LegacyTexas Bank, ViewPoint Bank, ViewPoint Financial Group, Inc. Notice of Service of Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Baskin, Stephen) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

#112

(#112) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Gabriel Fountain on behalf of Southside Bancshare, Inc., Southside Bank, Texas Capital Bancshares, Inc., Texas Capital Bank, N.A. (Fountain, Aaron) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

#111

(#111) REPLY to Response to Motion re 54 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 2015-12-30 St. Isidore - 1st Set of Common Interrogatories)(Zoppo, Michael) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

#110

(#110) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/16/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/17/2016)

#109

(#109) NOTICE by Southside Bancshare, Inc., Southside Bank, Texas Capital Bancshares, Inc., Texas Capital Bank, N.A. of Compliance With PR 3-4(a) (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

105 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#117) NOTICE by United Services Automobile Association Joinder (Zoppo, Michael) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#116) Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending CBM Review by Amegy Bank, N.A, Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated, Cullen/Frost Bankers, Inc., Frost Bank, Southside Bancshare, Inc., Southside Bank, Texas Capital Bancshares, Inc., Texas Capital Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - CBM Petition 7,904,360 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B - CBM Petition 8,589,271 Patent, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Tonya) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#115) ORDER granting 114 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Defendants LegacyTexas Group, Inc., ViewPoint Financial Group, Inc. and ViewPoint Bank filed by St. Isidore Research, LLC., LegacyTexas Bank (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv1392), LegacyTexas Bank (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv1392), ViewPoint Bank (Member case # 2:15cv1392), ViewPoint Bank (Member case # 2:15cv1392), ViewPoint Financial Group, Inc. (Member case # 2:15cv1392), ViewPoint Financial Group, Inc. (Member case # 2:15cv1392), Legacy Texas Group, Inc. (Member case # 2:15cv1392) and Legacy Texas Group, Inc. (Member case # 2:15cv1392) terminated., Attorney Russell Scarritt Jones, Jr; Dara M Kurlancheek; Michael Lindinger; Jason Dwain Mazingo; Richard Paul Stitt; Stephen E Baskin and Jay E Heidrick terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/25/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#114) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Defendants LegacyTexas Group, Inc., ViewPoint Financial Group, Inc. and ViewPoint Bank by St. Isidore Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#113) NOTICE by Legacy Texas Group, Inc., LegacyTexas Bank, ViewPoint Bank, ViewPoint Financial Group, Inc. Notice of Service of Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Baskin, Stephen) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#112) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Gabriel Fountain on behalf of Southside Bancshare, Inc., Southside Bank, Texas Capital Bancshares, Inc., Texas Capital Bank, N.A. (Fountain, Aaron) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#111) REPLY to Response to Motion re 54 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 2015-12-30 St. Isidore - 1st Set of Common Interrogatories)(Zoppo, Michael) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#110) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/16/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#109) NOTICE by Southside Bancshare, Inc., Southside Bank, Texas Capital Bancshares, Inc., Texas Capital Bank, N.A. of Compliance With PR 3-4(a) (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#108) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by United Services Automobile Association Per LR 3-4(a) (Bonilla, Ricardo) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE by St. Isidore Research, LLC of Related Cases (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Issued as to Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es))(nkl, ) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of St. Isidore Research, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/4/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyunghoon John Woo on behalf of St. Isidore Research, LLC (Woo, Kyunghoon) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin T Wang on behalf of St. Isidore Research, LLC (Wang, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian D Ledahl on behalf of St. Isidore Research, LLC (Ledahl, Brian) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by St. Isidore Research, LLC (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5325038.), filed by St. Isidore Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.