This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 20:37:26 (UTC).

Spilsbury et al v. United States Specialty Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2014 Spilsbury filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against United States Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr and Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-00820

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr

Judge

Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro

 

Party Details

3Rd Party Defendants and Plaintiffs

Anthonette Spilsbury

Joint Forces, LLC

Kevin Spilsbury

Premier Mechanical, LLC

Crest Ridge, LLC

Brian Spilsbury

Dee Ann Spilsbury

R. Glen Woods

CAM Consulting, Inc.

Angelo Carvalho

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

American Constractors Indemnity Company

Texas Bonding Company

United States Surety Company

MTC Financial, Inc.

United States Specialty Insurance Company

HCC Surety Group

Counter Defendants

Brian E. Spilsbury 2000 Trust

R. Glenn Woods

Kevin J. Spilsbury 2000 Trust

Counter Claimant, Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

United States Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

3Rd Party Defendant, Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jared B. Kahn

Po Box 60512

Las Vegas, NV 89160

Erika P Turner

Attorney at Garman Turner Gordon LLP

650 White Drive, Suite 101

Las Vegas, NV 89119

Dylan T. Ciciliano

Attorney at Garman Turner Gordon LLP

650 White Drive, Suite 101

Las Vegas, NV 89119

Defendant, Counter Claimant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Colin R. Chipman

Attorney at ICW Group

11455 El Camino Real

San Diego, CA 92130

Kurt C Faux

Attorney at The Faux Law Group

1540 West Warm Springs Road, Suite 100

Henderson, NV 89014

Jordan Ford Faux

Attorney at The Faux Law Group

1540 West Warm Springs Rd., Ste. 100

Henderson, NV 89014

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-14-700448-B, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-3251096), filed by United States Specialty Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/1/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3) (Notice: There are unresolved motions or issues that require the court's immediate attention.) (Chipman, Colin) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

#2

(#2) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (MAJ) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 5/22/2014. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/9/2014. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 5/23/2014. By Deputy Clerk: Michael Zadina. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: www.nvd.uscourts.gov(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MJZ) (Entered: 05/23/2014)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant United States Surety Company to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendant United States Surety Company. (Chipman, Colin) (Entered: 06/04/2014)

#6

(#6) ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant United States Surety Company to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. United States Surety Company answer due 6/6/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/5/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 06/05/2014)

#7

(#7) ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants shall have until 6/16/2014 in which to fully comply with the provisions of Local Rule 7.1-1. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/16/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 06/05/2014)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Crest Ridge, LLC, Joint Forces, LLC, Premier Mechanical, LLC, Anthonette Spilsbury, Brian Spilsbury, Dee Ann Spilsbury, Kevin Spilsbury, R. Glen Woods. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Turner, Erika) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Crest Ridge, LLC, Joint Forces, LLC, Premier Mechanical, LLC, Anthonette Spilsbury, Brian Spilsbury, Dee Ann Spilsbury, Kevin Spilsbury, R. Glen Woods. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Turner, Erika) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

#98

(#98) ORDER Granting 97 Stipulation to Stay the Decision on 38 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and 44 Counter MOTION for Summary Judgment Pending Settlement Discussions. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#99

(#99) ORDER finding as moot 95 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/31/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RH) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

#100

(#100) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States Specialty Insurance Company re 91 Summons Issued. Angelo Carvalho served on 8/2/2015, answer due 8/23/2015. (Faux, Kurt) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

#101

(#101) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States Specialty Insurance Company re 91 Summons Issued. CAM Consulting, Inc. served on 8/2/2015, answer due 8/23/2015. (Faux, Kurt) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

#102

(#102) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 10/6/2015. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties attend a status check hearing on 10/20/15 at 10am in LV Courtroom 7D regarding 98 Stay of Decision on 38 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and 44 Counter MOTION for Summary Judgment Pending Settlement Discussions. The parties may file a joint status report indicating the status of settlement discussions and whether the parties wish to continue the stay or return this case to the normal litigation track. Upon receipt of such report, the Court will vacate the hearing.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SP) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

#103

(#103) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 10/15/2015. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Status Conference currently set for 10/20/2015 at 10:00 AM is ADVANCED to 10/19/2015 at 3:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7D before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#104

(#104) MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 10/19/2015 before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Crtrm Administrator: Aaron Blazevich; Pla Counsel: Jared Kahn; Def Counsel: Jordan Faux; Court Reporter/FTR #: Araceli Bareng; Time of Hearing: 2:57 p.m. - 3:06 p.m.; Courtroom: 7D; The Court makes preliminary statements and hears representations from counsel. The Court extends the stay in this matter until 12:00 noon on Friday, November 13, 2015. Further, the parties shall file a joint status report/stipulation, as appropriate, no later than 12:00 noon on Friday, November 13, 2015. The Court stands at recess. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

#105

(#105) SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to Stay re 104 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS; filed by Defendants American Constractors Indemnity Company, United States Specialty Insurance Company. (Faux, Kurt) (Entered: 11/12/2015)

#106

(#106) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 11/13/2015. By Deputy Clerk: S. Plaksin. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Second Stipulation for Extension of Time to Stay 105 is DENIED. Plaintiff Brian Spilsbury's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 59 and Motion for Declaratory Judgment 60 , and Defendant United States Specialty Insurance Company's Counter Motion for Summary Judgment 66 are DENIED without prejudice. If the current settlement fails to resolve the issues, then the Parties may refile these motions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties will file a joint stipulation for dismissal or a joint status update by 2/12/2016.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SP) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#106) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 11/13/2015. By Deputy Clerk: S. Plaksin. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Second Stipulation for Extension of Time to Stay 105 is DENIED. Plaintiff Brian Spilsbury's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 59 and Motion for Declaratory Judgment 60 , and Defendant United States Specialty Insurance Company's Counter Motion for Summary Judgment 66 are DENIED without prejudice. If the current settlement fails to resolve the issues, then the Parties may refile these motions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties will file a joint stipulation for dismissal or a joint status update by 2/12/2016.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SP) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#105) SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to Stay re 104 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS; filed by Defendants American Constractors Indemnity Company, United States Specialty Insurance Company. (Faux, Kurt) (Entered: 11/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#104) MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 10/19/2015 before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Crtrm Administrator: Aaron Blazevich; Pla Counsel: Jared Kahn; Def Counsel: Jordan Faux; Court Reporter/FTR #: Araceli Bareng; Time of Hearing: 2:57 p.m. - 3:06 p.m.; Courtroom: 7D; The Court makes preliminary statements and hears representations from counsel. The Court extends the stay in this matter until 12:00 noon on Friday, November 13, 2015. Further, the parties shall file a joint status report/stipulation, as appropriate, no later than 12:00 noon on Friday, November 13, 2015. The Court stands at recess. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 10/15/2015. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Status Conference currently set for 10/20/2015 at 10:00 AM is ADVANCED to 10/19/2015 at 3:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7D before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 10/6/2015. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties attend a status check hearing on 10/20/15 at 10am in LV Courtroom 7D regarding 98 Stay of Decision on 38 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and 44 Counter MOTION for Summary Judgment Pending Settlement Discussions. The parties may file a joint status report indicating the status of settlement discussions and whether the parties wish to continue the stay or return this case to the normal litigation track. Upon receipt of such report, the Court will vacate the hearing.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SP) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States Specialty Insurance Company re 91 Summons Issued. CAM Consulting, Inc. served on 8/2/2015, answer due 8/23/2015. (Faux, Kurt) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States Specialty Insurance Company re 91 Summons Issued. Angelo Carvalho served on 8/2/2015, answer due 8/23/2015. (Faux, Kurt) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) ORDER finding as moot 95 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/31/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RH) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) ORDER Granting 97 Stipulation to Stay the Decision on 38 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and 44 Counter MOTION for Summary Judgment Pending Settlement Discussions. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) STIPULATION to Stay Decision re 38 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 44 Countermotion for Summary Judgment ; filed by Defendant United States Specialty Insurance Company. (Faux, Kurt) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiffs Crest Ridge, LLC, Joint Forces, LLC, Premier Mechanical, LLC, Anthonette Spilsbury, Brian Spilsbury, Dee Ann Spilsbury, Kevin Spilsbury, R. Glen Woods . (Turner, Erika) (Entered: 06/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Crest Ridge, LLC, Joint Forces, LLC, Premier Mechanical, LLC, Anthonette Spilsbury, Brian Spilsbury, Dee Ann Spilsbury, Kevin Spilsbury, R. Glen Woods. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Turner, Erika) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Crest Ridge, LLC, Joint Forces, LLC, Premier Mechanical, LLC, Anthonette Spilsbury, Brian Spilsbury, Dee Ann Spilsbury, Kevin Spilsbury, R. Glen Woods. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Turner, Erika) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants shall have until 6/16/2014 in which to fully comply with the provisions of Local Rule 7.1-1. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/16/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 06/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant United States Surety Company to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. United States Surety Company answer due 6/6/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/5/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 06/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant United States Surety Company to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendant United States Surety Company. (Chipman, Colin) (Entered: 06/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 5/23/2014. By Deputy Clerk: Michael Zadina. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: www.nvd.uscourts.gov(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MJZ) (Entered: 05/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 5/22/2014. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/9/2014. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (MAJ) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-14-700448-B, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-3251096), filed by United States Specialty Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/1/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3) (Notice: There are unresolved motions or issues that require the court's immediate attention.) (Chipman, Colin) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Texas Bonding Company is a litigant

Latest cases where HCC Surety Group is a litigant

Latest cases where MTC FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant