This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2016 at 23:17:14 (UTC).

Sperber v. Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/20/2015 Sperber filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo and Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-06028

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo

Judge

Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Meyer Sperber

Defendant

Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Igor B Litvak

Attorney at The Law Office of Igor Litvak

1701 Ave P

Brooklyn, NY 11229

Maxim Maximov

Attorney at Maxim Maximov, LLP

1701 Avenue P

Brooklyn, NY 11229

Defendant Attorneys

Scott S. Gallagher

Attorney at Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP

50 North Laura Street, Suite 2600

Jacksonville, FL 32202

John Gerard McCarthy

Attorney at Smith Gambrell & Russell LLP

1301 Avenue Of The Americas, 21St Floor

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-8109057 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Meyer Sperber. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Summons) (Maximov, Maxim) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#13

(#13) Letter MOTION to Strike 12 MOTION to Stay re Initial Conference Hearing,,,, by Meyer Sperber. (Maximov, Maxim) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-8375893. by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Scott Gallagher, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Gallagher, Scott) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ERC Holdings, LLC for Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (McCarthy, John) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

#11

(#11) Letter by Meyer Sperber (Maximov, Maxim) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#14

(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 Letter MOTION to Strike 12 MOTION to Stay re Initial Conference Hearing,,,, filed by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (McCarthy, John) (Entered: 03/10/2016)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Meyer Sperber. Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC waiver sent on 10/21/2015, answer due 12/21/2015. (Maximov, Maxim) (Entered: 11/03/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Igor B Litvak on behalf of Meyer Sperber (aty to be noticed) (Litvak, Igor) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (McCarthy, John) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Stay re Initial Conference Hearing,,,, by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support ERC's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay, # 2 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Stay, # 3 Memorandum in Support ERC's Reply in Support of Motion to Stay) (Gallagher, Scott) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

#10

(#10) Letter by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC (Gallagher, Scott) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 Letter MOTION to Strike 12 MOTION to Stay re Initial Conference Hearing,,,, filed by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (McCarthy, John) (Entered: 03/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Letter MOTION to Strike 12 MOTION to Stay re Initial Conference Hearing,,,, by Meyer Sperber. (Maximov, Maxim) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Stay re Initial Conference Hearing,,,, by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support ERC's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay, # 2 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Stay, # 3 Memorandum in Support ERC's Reply in Support of Motion to Stay) (Gallagher, Scott) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Letter by Meyer Sperber (Maximov, Maxim) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Letter by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC (Gallagher, Scott) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-8375893. by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Scott Gallagher, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Gallagher, Scott) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Igor B Litvak on behalf of Meyer Sperber (aty to be noticed) (Litvak, Igor) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ERC Holdings, LLC for Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (McCarthy, John) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (McCarthy, John) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Meyer Sperber. Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC waiver sent on 10/21/2015, answer due 12/21/2015. (Maximov, Maxim) (Entered: 11/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-8109057 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Meyer Sperber. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Summons) (Maximov, Maxim) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.