This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2018 at 13:35:10 (UTC).

Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Ben Venue Laboratories, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Ben Venue Laboratories, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Peggy A. Leen and Gloria M. Navarro. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-00980

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Peggy A. Leen

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

University of Strathclyde

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Ben Venue Laboratories, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Kevin M Flowers

Attorney at Marshall, Gerstein & Borun LLP

233 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Cullen N Pendleton

Attorney at Marshall, Gerstein & Borun LLP

233 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Jonathan W Fountain

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber LLP

3993 Howard Hughes Pkwy. Suite 600

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Mark H Izraelewicz

233 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Thomas Ross

Attorney at Marshall, Gerstein & Borun LLP

233 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael J. McCue

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber LLP

Amanda K Antons

Attorney at Marshall, Gerstein & Borun LLP

233 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jacob A. Reynolds

Attorney at Hutchison & Steffen

10080 West Alta Drive

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Philip A. Kantor

1781 Village Center Circle, Ste. 120

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Kenyon & Kenyon LLP

 

Court Documents

#55

(#55) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

#57

(#57) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

#48

(#48) ORDER granting 45 Joint Motion to Substitute Party and Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to file First Amended Complaint. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(c), West-Ward and Eurohealth are substituted as defendants in this case in place of Ben Venue. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file their First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

#69

(#69) JUDGMENT in favor of West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp. against Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

#64

(#64) ORDER Granting 62 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) JUDGMENT in favor of West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp. against Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) ORDER Granting 62 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) ORDER granting 45 Joint Motion to Substitute Party and Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to file First Amended Complaint. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(c), West-Ward and Eurohealth are substituted as defendants in this case in place of Ben Venue. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file their First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.