This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 13:58:25 (UTC).

Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd. et al v. UBS AG et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2015 Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against UBS AG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge George B. Daniels and Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-05844

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge George B. Daniels

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P.

Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P.

Defendants

The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC

Citibank NA

Barclays Capital, Inc.

The Shoko Chukin Bank

Citigroup Inc

Societe Generale S.A.

HSBC Holdings plc

Lloyds Banking Group plc

COOPERATIEVE CENTRALE RAIFFEISEN- BOERENLEENBANK B.A.

Barclays PLC

Mizuho Trust and Banking Co., Ltd.

UBS AG

Bank Of America Corporation

HBOS PLC

ICAP plc

Deutsche Bank AG

RBS Securities Japan Limited

The Bank of Yokohama, Ltd.

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Fraser Lee Hunter, Jr

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP (NYC)

7 World Trade Center

New York, NY 10007

Yvonne Susan Quinn

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP(NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

David Harold Braff

Attorney at Sullivan and Cromwell, LLP(NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Matthew Joseph Porpora

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP(NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Melissa Brooke Felder Zappala

Attorney at Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP (D.C.)

5301 Wisconsin Avenue, Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20015

Michael Brille

Attorney at Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP (D.C.)

5301 Wisconsin Avenue, Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20015

Roger Brian Cowie

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2200

Dallas, TX 75201

Julia C Webb

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

111 S Wacker Dr

Chicago, IL 60606

Lisa Jean Fried

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP (nyc)

875 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Sean Miles Murphy

Attorney at Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

Joel Steven Sanders

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Orton E. Ndau

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Hallie Suzanne Goldblatt

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Other Attorneys

Harry Simeon Davis

Attorney at Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP (NY)

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Cyrus E. Ansari

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Catherine Fairley Spillman

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

1333 New Hampshire Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Andrew C. Smith

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman, LLP (NY)

1540 Broadway

New York, NY 10036

Paul Buck Hewitt

Attorney at Akin, Gump, Strauss, Hauer & Feld, LLP (DC)

1333 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Steven Wolowitz

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP (NY)

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020-1001

Brian Theodore Kohn

Attorney at Schulte, Roth & Zabel LLP

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

68 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BARCLAYS BANK PLC, Bank Of America Corporation, Bank Of Tokyo Mitsubishi UFJ LTD, Bank of America N.A., Barclays Capital, Inc., Barclays PLC, COOPERATIEVE CENTRALE RAIFFEISEN- BOERENLEENBANK B.A., Citibank Japan LTD, Citibank NA, Citigroup Global Markets Japan, Inc., Citigroup Inc, DB Group Services UK Limited, Deutsche Bank AG, HBOS PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings plc, ICAP Europe Limited, ICAP plc, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., John Doe Nos. 1-50, LLoyds Bank PLC, Lloyds Banking Group plc, Martin Brokers (UK) Ltd., Merrill Lynch International, Inc., Mitsubishi UFJ Trust and Banking Corporation, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Mizuho Corporate Bank Ltd., Mizuho Trust and Banking Co., Ltd., Norinchukin Bank, The, R.P. Martin Holdings Limited, RBS Securities Japan Limited, Resona Bank, Ltd., Shinkin Central Bank, Societe Generale S.A., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd., The Bank of Yokohama, Ltd., The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, The Shoko Chukin Bank, Tullett Prebon PLC, UBS AG, UBS Securities Japan Co., Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11197809)Document filed by Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., Hayman Capital Management L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2_Part 1, # 4 Exhibit A-2_Part 2, # 5 Exhibit A-3, # 6 Exhibit A-4, # 7 Exhibit A-5_Part 1, # 8 Exhibit A-5_Part 2, # 9 Exhibit A-6, # 10 Exhibit B-1, # 11 Exhibit B-2, # 12 Exhibit B-3, # 13 Exhibit B-4, # 14 Exhibit B-5, # 15 Exhibit C-1, # 16 Exhibit C-2, # 17 Exhibit C-3, # 18 Exhibit D-1, # 19 Exhibit D-2, # 20 Exhibit D-3, # 21 Exhibit D-4, # 22 Exhibit D-5, # 23 Exhibit D-6, # 24 Exhibit E-1, # 25 Exhibit E-2, # 26 Exhibit F-1, # 27 Exhibit G-1, # 28 Exhibit G-2, # 29 Exhibit G-3, # 30 Exhibit I-1, # 31 Exhibit I-2, # 32 Exhibit I-3, # 33 Exhibit I-4, # 34 Exhibit I-5, # 35 Exhibit I-6, # 36 Exhibit I-7)(Briganti, Vincent) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Briganti, Vincent) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 12-cv-3419. Document filed by Hayman Capital Management L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd..(Briganti, Vincent) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UBS AG, UBS SECURITIES JAPAN CO. LTD., MIZUHO BANK, LTD., THE BANK OF TOKYO-MITSUBISHI UFJ, LTD., THE SUMITOMO TRUST AND BANKING CO., LTD., THE NORINCHUKIN BANK, MITSUBISHI UFJ TRUST AND BANKING CORPORATION, SUMITOMO MITSUI BANKING CORPORATION, RESONA BANK, LTD., J.P. MORGAN CHASE & CO., JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES PLC, MIZUHO CORPORATE BANK, LTD., DEUTSCHE BANK AG, DB GROUP SERVICES UK LIMITED, MIZUHO TRUST AND BANKING CO., LTD., THE SHOKO CHUKIN BANK, LTD., SHINKIN CENTRAL BANK, THE BANK OF YOKOHAMA, LTD., SOCIT GNRALE SA, THE ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND GROUP PLC, THE ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND PLC, RBS SECURITIES JAPAN LIMITED, BARCLAYS BANK PLC, BARCLAYS PLC, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., CITIBANK, NA, CITIGROUP, INC., CITIBANK, JAPAN LTD., CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS JAPAN, INC., COPERATIEVE CENTRALE RAIFFEISEN-BOERENLEENBANK B.A., HSBC HOLDINGS PLC, HSBC BANK PLC, LLOYDS BANKING GROUP PLC, HBOS PLC, LLOYDS BANK PLC, ICAP PLC, ICAP EUROPE LIMITED, R.P. MARTIN HOLDINGS LIMITED, MARTIN BROKERS (UK) LTD., TULLETT PREBON PLC, BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., MERRILL LYNCH INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED, AND JOHN DOE NOS. 1-50, re: 1 Complaint,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Hayman Capital Management L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (Briganti, Vincent) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UBS AG, UBS SECURITIES JAPAN CO. LTD., MIZUHO BANK, LTD., THE BANK OF TOKYO-MITSUBISHI UFJ, LTD., THE SUMITOMO TRUST AND BANKING CO., LTD., THE NORINCHUKIN BANK, MITSUBISHI UFJ TRUST AND BANKING CORPORATION, SUMITOMO MITSUI BANKING CORPORATION, RESONA BANK, LTD., J.P. MORGAN CHASE & CO., JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES PLC, MIZUHO CORPORATE BANK, LTD., DEUTSCHE BANK AG, DB GROUP SERVICES UK LIMITED, MIZUHO TRUST AND BANKING CO., LTD., THE SHOKO CHUKIN BANK, LTD., SHINKIN CENTRAL BANK, THE BANK OF YOKOHAMA, LTD., SOCIETE GENERALE SA, THE ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND GROUP PLC, THE ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND PLC, RBS SECURITIES JAPAN LIMITED, BARCLAYS BANK PLC, BARCLAYS PLC, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., CITIBANK, NA, CITIGROUP, INC., CITIBANK, JAPAN LTD., CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS JAPAN, INC., COOPERATIEVE CENTRALE RAIFFEISEN-BOERENLEENBANK B.A., HSBC HOLDINGS PLC, HSBC BANK PLC, LLOYDS BANKING GROUP PLC, HBOS PLC, LLOYDS BANK PLC, ICAP PLC, ICAP EUROPE LIMITED, R.P. MARTIN HOLDINGS LIMITED, MARTIN BROKERS (UK) LTD., TULLETT PREBON PLC, BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., MERRILL LYNCH INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED, re: 1 Complaint,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Hayman Capital Management L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Schedule A)(Briganti, Vincent) (Entered: 07/27/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Geoffrey Milbank Horn on behalf of Hayman Capital Management L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (Horn, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Dexter St. Phillip, Jr on behalf of Hayman Capital Management L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (St. Phillip, Peter) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Raymond Peter Girnys on behalf of Hayman Capital Management L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (Girnys, Raymond) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christian Levis on behalf of Hayman Capital Management L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (Levis, Christian) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#222

(#222) DECLARATION of Geoffrey M. Horn in Support re: 187 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlements.. Document filed by California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Horn, Geoffrey) (Entered: 04/06/2016)

#221

(#221) SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 187 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlements. . Document filed by California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Briganti, Vincent) (Entered: 04/06/2016)

#220

(#220) ADMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE: granting 43 Motion for J. MATTHEW GOODIN to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/01/2016) (ama) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

#219

(#219) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley on behalf of J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Sparks Bradley, Rachel) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

#218

(#218) LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Vincent Briganti dated March 30, 2016 re: Supplemental Authority. Document filed by California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Briganti, Vincent) (Entered: 03/30/2016)

#217

(#217) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS HAYMAN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT L.P.'S AND SONTERRA CAPITAL MASTER FUND, LTD.'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION granting 212 Motion to Substitute Party. Upon consideration of Plaintiffs Hayman Capital Management L.P.'s and Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.'s Motion for Substitution, Memorandum of Law in Support thereof, and upon all pleadings and proceedings heretofore had herein, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs Hayman Capital Management L.P's and Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.'s motion is GRANTED. Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P. and Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. are hereby substituted as the named party plaintiffs in place of Hayman Capital Management L.P. pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 17(a)(3). The claims of Plaintiff Hayman Capital Management L.P. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. SO ORDERED. Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P. and Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. added. Hayman Capital Management L.P. terminated. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/29/2016) (kko) (Entered: 03/29/2016)

#216

(#216) LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Gregory T. Casamento dated 3/28/2016 re: 212 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Hayman Capital Management L.P., New Party: Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P. and Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. . . Document filed by HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings plc. (Casamento, Gregory) (Entered: 03/28/2016)

#215

(#215) SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz) (Entered: 03/21/2016)

#214

(#214) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Arthur R. Miller on behalf of Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. New Address: 40 Washington Sq, South, 430F, New York, New York, USA 10012, (212) 992-8147. (Miller, Arthur) (Entered: 03/21/2016)

285 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#222) DECLARATION of Geoffrey M. Horn in Support re: 187 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlements.. Document filed by California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Horn, Geoffrey) (Entered: 04/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#221) SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 187 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlements. . Document filed by California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Briganti, Vincent) (Entered: 04/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#220) ADMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE: granting 43 Motion for J. MATTHEW GOODIN to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/01/2016) (ama) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#219) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley on behalf of J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Sparks Bradley, Rachel) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#218) LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Vincent Briganti dated March 30, 2016 re: Supplemental Authority. Document filed by California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Briganti, Vincent) (Entered: 03/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#217) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS HAYMAN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT L.P.'S AND SONTERRA CAPITAL MASTER FUND, LTD.'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION granting 212 Motion to Substitute Party. Upon consideration of Plaintiffs Hayman Capital Management L.P.'s and Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.'s Motion for Substitution, Memorandum of Law in Support thereof, and upon all pleadings and proceedings heretofore had herein, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs Hayman Capital Management L.P's and Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.'s motion is GRANTED. Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P. and Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. are hereby substituted as the named party plaintiffs in place of Hayman Capital Management L.P. pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 17(a)(3). The claims of Plaintiff Hayman Capital Management L.P. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. SO ORDERED. Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P. and Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. added. Hayman Capital Management L.P. terminated. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/29/2016) (kko) (Entered: 03/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#216) LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Gregory T. Casamento dated 3/28/2016 re: 212 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Hayman Capital Management L.P., New Party: Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P. and Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. . . Document filed by HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings plc. (Casamento, Gregory) (Entered: 03/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#215) SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz) (Entered: 03/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#214) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Arthur R. Miller on behalf of Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. New Address: 40 Washington Sq, South, 430F, New York, New York, USA 10012, (212) 992-8147. (Miller, Arthur) (Entered: 03/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#213) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 212 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Hayman Capital Management L.P., New Party: Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P. and Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. . . Document filed by Hayman Capital Management L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (Briganti, Vincent) (Entered: 03/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
202 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sitso W. Bediako on behalf of Hayman Capital Management L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (Bediako, Sitso) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christian Levis on behalf of Hayman Capital Management L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (Levis, Christian) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Raymond Peter Girnys on behalf of Hayman Capital Management L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (Girnys, Raymond) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Dexter St. Phillip, Jr on behalf of Hayman Capital Management L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (St. Phillip, Peter) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Geoffrey Milbank Horn on behalf of Hayman Capital Management L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (Horn, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UBS AG, UBS SECURITIES JAPAN CO. LTD., MIZUHO BANK, LTD., THE BANK OF TOKYO-MITSUBISHI UFJ, LTD., THE SUMITOMO TRUST AND BANKING CO., LTD., THE NORINCHUKIN BANK, MITSUBISHI UFJ TRUST AND BANKING CORPORATION, SUMITOMO MITSUI BANKING CORPORATION, RESONA BANK, LTD., J.P. MORGAN CHASE & CO., JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES PLC, MIZUHO CORPORATE BANK, LTD., DEUTSCHE BANK AG, DB GROUP SERVICES UK LIMITED, MIZUHO TRUST AND BANKING CO., LTD., THE SHOKO CHUKIN BANK, LTD., SHINKIN CENTRAL BANK, THE BANK OF YOKOHAMA, LTD., SOCIETE GENERALE SA, THE ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND GROUP PLC, THE ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND PLC, RBS SECURITIES JAPAN LIMITED, BARCLAYS BANK PLC, BARCLAYS PLC, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., CITIBANK, NA, CITIGROUP, INC., CITIBANK, JAPAN LTD., CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS JAPAN, INC., COOPERATIEVE CENTRALE RAIFFEISEN-BOERENLEENBANK B.A., HSBC HOLDINGS PLC, HSBC BANK PLC, LLOYDS BANKING GROUP PLC, HBOS PLC, LLOYDS BANK PLC, ICAP PLC, ICAP EUROPE LIMITED, R.P. MARTIN HOLDINGS LIMITED, MARTIN BROKERS (UK) LTD., TULLETT PREBON PLC, BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., MERRILL LYNCH INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED, re: 1 Complaint,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Hayman Capital Management L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Schedule A)(Briganti, Vincent) (Entered: 07/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UBS AG, UBS SECURITIES JAPAN CO. LTD., MIZUHO BANK, LTD., THE BANK OF TOKYO-MITSUBISHI UFJ, LTD., THE SUMITOMO TRUST AND BANKING CO., LTD., THE NORINCHUKIN BANK, MITSUBISHI UFJ TRUST AND BANKING CORPORATION, SUMITOMO MITSUI BANKING CORPORATION, RESONA BANK, LTD., J.P. MORGAN CHASE & CO., JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES PLC, MIZUHO CORPORATE BANK, LTD., DEUTSCHE BANK AG, DB GROUP SERVICES UK LIMITED, MIZUHO TRUST AND BANKING CO., LTD., THE SHOKO CHUKIN BANK, LTD., SHINKIN CENTRAL BANK, THE BANK OF YOKOHAMA, LTD., SOCIT GNRALE SA, THE ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND GROUP PLC, THE ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND PLC, RBS SECURITIES JAPAN LIMITED, BARCLAYS BANK PLC, BARCLAYS PLC, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., CITIBANK, NA, CITIGROUP, INC., CITIBANK, JAPAN LTD., CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS JAPAN, INC., COPERATIEVE CENTRALE RAIFFEISEN-BOERENLEENBANK B.A., HSBC HOLDINGS PLC, HSBC BANK PLC, LLOYDS BANKING GROUP PLC, HBOS PLC, LLOYDS BANK PLC, ICAP PLC, ICAP EUROPE LIMITED, R.P. MARTIN HOLDINGS LIMITED, MARTIN BROKERS (UK) LTD., TULLETT PREBON PLC, BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., MERRILL LYNCH INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED, AND JOHN DOE NOS. 1-50, re: 1 Complaint,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Hayman Capital Management L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (Briganti, Vincent) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 12-cv-3419. Document filed by Hayman Capital Management L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd..(Briganti, Vincent) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Briganti, Vincent) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BARCLAYS BANK PLC, Bank Of America Corporation, Bank Of Tokyo Mitsubishi UFJ LTD, Bank of America N.A., Barclays Capital, Inc., Barclays PLC, COOPERATIEVE CENTRALE RAIFFEISEN- BOERENLEENBANK B.A., Citibank Japan LTD, Citibank NA, Citigroup Global Markets Japan, Inc., Citigroup Inc, DB Group Services UK Limited, Deutsche Bank AG, HBOS PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings plc, ICAP Europe Limited, ICAP plc, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., John Doe Nos. 1-50, LLoyds Bank PLC, Lloyds Banking Group plc, Martin Brokers (UK) Ltd., Merrill Lynch International, Inc., Mitsubishi UFJ Trust and Banking Corporation, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Mizuho Corporate Bank Ltd., Mizuho Trust and Banking Co., Ltd., Norinchukin Bank, The, R.P. Martin Holdings Limited, RBS Securities Japan Limited, Resona Bank, Ltd., Shinkin Central Bank, Societe Generale S.A., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd., The Bank of Yokohama, Ltd., The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, The Shoko Chukin Bank, Tullett Prebon PLC, UBS AG, UBS Securities Japan Co., Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11197809)Document filed by Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., Hayman Capital Management L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2_Part 1, # 4 Exhibit A-2_Part 2, # 5 Exhibit A-3, # 6 Exhibit A-4, # 7 Exhibit A-5_Part 1, # 8 Exhibit A-5_Part 2, # 9 Exhibit A-6, # 10 Exhibit B-1, # 11 Exhibit B-2, # 12 Exhibit B-3, # 13 Exhibit B-4, # 14 Exhibit B-5, # 15 Exhibit C-1, # 16 Exhibit C-2, # 17 Exhibit C-3, # 18 Exhibit D-1, # 19 Exhibit D-2, # 20 Exhibit D-3, # 21 Exhibit D-4, # 22 Exhibit D-5, # 23 Exhibit D-6, # 24 Exhibit E-1, # 25 Exhibit E-2, # 26 Exhibit F-1, # 27 Exhibit G-1, # 28 Exhibit G-2, # 29 Exhibit G-3, # 30 Exhibit I-1, # 31 Exhibit I-2, # 32 Exhibit I-3, # 33 Exhibit I-4, # 34 Exhibit I-5, # 35 Exhibit I-6, # 36 Exhibit I-7)(Briganti, Vincent) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.