This case was last updated from PACER on 04/06/2018 at 00:59:19 (UTC).

Software Research, Inc. v. InfoGenius.com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2015 Software Research, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against InfoGenius com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward M. Chen. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-02059

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Software Research, Inc.

Defendant

InfoGenius.com, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Carlyle Gabaeff(Designation Retained)

Benjamin Laban Singer(Designation Retained)

Douglas Stephen Tilley(Designation Retained)

Defendant Attorneys

James Jeffrey Kozuch(Designation Retained)

Pei-Ru Wey

Lynn M. Terrebonne

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re 19 Stipulation filed by InfoGenius.com, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/1/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015)

#7

(#7) ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/8/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re 19 Stipulation filed by InfoGenius.com, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/1/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/8/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.