Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 10:25:54 (UTC).

Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation v. Backstage Bar and Grill et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2011 Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Backstage Bar and Grill. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams and Judge Otis D Wright, II. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:11-CV-08305

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams

Judge

Judge Otis D Wright, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation

Defendants

Jen Goldstein

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

Eight Ball Enterprises Inc

Good Nite Bar

Mainstage Karaoke and DJ Service

Seamus Furlong

Barneys Beanery

Ocean Avenue Restaurant

Bar and Grill Inc

James Wilson

Alvira Suavillo

Heather Biel

Cassidy and Razor

Caffe Brass Monkey

No 1 Betta

Kelly C Sugano

Witches Brew

Dukes Bar and Grill

Gators 2

James Gonzalez

54 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Rodney T Lewin

Attorney at Rodney T Lewin Law Offices

8665 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 210

Beverly Hills, CA 90211-2931

Alan C Chen

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

1055 W 7Th Street Suite 1880

Los Angeles, CA 90017-0159

Donna M Boris

Attorney at Boris & Associates

9107 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 450

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

James E Doroshow

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

1800 Century Park East Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1506

R Stephen Duke

Attorney at Rodney T Lewin Law Offices

8665 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 210

Beverly Hills, CA 90211-2931

Brooks P Marshall

Attorney at Brooks P Marshall Law Offices

1500 Rosecrans Avenue Suite 500

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Reginald Keith Brown

Attorney at Reginald K Brown Law Offices

6080 Center Drive 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90045

J Marie Gray

Attorney at J Marie Gray Law Office

1851 E First Street, Suite 900

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Craig McLaughlin

Attorney at Law Office of Craig McLaughlin

650 Town Center Drive Suite 1300

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Other Attorneys

R M Anthony Cosio

Attorney at R M Anthony Cosio Law Offices

520 Redondo Ave

Long Beach, CA 90814-1572

Lester Winograde

Attorney at Lester Winograde Law Offices

139 Hollister Ave, Ste 5

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Robert A Levinson

Attorney at Levinson Arshonsky and Kurtz LLP

15303 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 1650

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Defendants All Stars Entertainment, Backstage Bar and Grill, Bar and Grill Inc, Barneys Beanery, Heather Biel, Earl Bomar, Bucky, Burbank Bar and Grill, Rodney Burgess, Caffe Brass Monkey, Ron Canzano, Suzie Canzano, Tony Carillo, Cassidy and Razor, Cherry Sound Entertainment, Cliff Room, Tom Corcoran, Craig Sports LLC, Daily Pint, Dan, David Footman, Debbie DeZego, Dukes Bar and Grill, Eight Ball Enterprises Inc, Encore Entertainment, Jeanette Erman, Yvonne Erman, Don Etheridge, Fox Belmont Corporation, Seamus Furlong, Gaslight Claire Ragge, Gators 2, Jen Goldstein, James Gonzalez, Good Nite Bar, Bobby Hardy, Ben Myron Haskell, Identities Unknown, John Does, Mike LeClaire, David Leverton, MLM Entertainment Group LLC, Mainstage Karaoke and DJ Service, Maxs of Manila, Phillip R McGovern, Mike and Linda, No 1 Betta, Ocean Avenue Restaurant, Party Hardy Karaoke, Partytime Karaoke, Q-It-Up, Fabio Quintal, Raging Karaoke, Walter Rodrigues, Christel Santo, Seize The Mic Entertainment, Taryn Seraphine, Tom Shaman, Silver Fox, Fay Simmons, Adam Spear, Alvira Suavillo, Kelly C Sugano, Taka-O, Tartan Room, Robert Thang, Donna Thomas, Angela V., James Wilson, Witches Brew, Y Karaoke Co, Don Young, Melena Young. Case assigned to Judge Otis D Wright, II for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Filing fee $ 350 Paid.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation.(et) (mg). (Entered: 10/07/2011)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation, identifying Other Affiliate Kurt Slep for Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation. (et) (mg). (Entered: 10/07/2011)

#3

(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation. (et) (Entered: 10/07/2011)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D Wright II. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filling the motion. The Court hears motions on Mondays, Criminal at 10:00 a.m. and Civil at 1:30 p.m. The Court requires delivery of one non-blue backed Mandatory Chambers Copies of only the following manual and electronically filed documents: (1) All noticed motion and related documents; (2) All ex parte applications and related documents; and (3) All exhibits and attachments must be separately tabbed. [Refer to the Courts General Order No. 10-07 regarding ECF Courtesy paper Copies.] (sch) (Entered: 10/14/2011)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Nov. 18, 2011 filed by Defendant Barneys Beanery.(Lewin, Rodney) (Entered: 11/07/2011)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Gaslight Claire Ragge answer now due 11/28/2011, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendants Gaslight Claire Ragge. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Levinson, Robert) (Entered: 11/08/2011)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting Stipulation Extending defendants the Gaslite and Claire Ragge Time to Answer complaint to 11/28/11 6 by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 11/10/2011)

#8

(#8) ANSWER filed by Defendant Caffe Brass Monkey.(Brown, Reginald) (Entered: 11/17/2011)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Caffe Brass Monkey, identifying The Brass Monkey, Inc. and Alan Spear. (Brown, Reginald) (Entered: 11/17/2011)

#97

(#97) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Sanctions filed by defendants Kelly C Sugano, Taka-O. Motion set for hearing on 1/7/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order)(McLaughlin, Craig) (Entered: 11/27/2012)

#98

(#98) SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Attorney Fees and Sanctions 97 filed by Defendants Kelly C Sugano, Taka-O. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Table of Contents of Evidence)(McLaughlin, Craig) (Entered: 11/28/2012)

#99

(#99) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alan C Chen on behalf of Plaintiff Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation (Chen, Alan) (Entered: 12/18/2012)

#100

(#100) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D Wright, II: Hearing on MOTION for Attorney Fees and Sanctions 97 , scheduled for January 7, 2013 at 1:30 p.m., is herebyVACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue. (lc) (Entered: 12/19/2012)

#101

(#101) EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition Papers filed by Plaintiff Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order Extending Time to Respond to Motion)(Chen, Alan) (Entered: 12/20/2012)

#102

(#102) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition Papers 101 filed by Defendants Kelly C Sugano, Taka-O. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(McLaughlin, Craig) (Entered: 12/21/2012)

#103

(#103) ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: DENHING 101 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to respond to moiton for attorney fees and sanctions. (lc) (Entered: 12/21/2012)

#104

(#104) ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: granting 97 defendants Motion for Attorney Fees. Fees awarded in favor of defendants Taka-O, Kelly C Sugano against Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation in the amount of 18,105.00. The Court declines to additionally sanction Slep-Tone at this time. (lc) (Entered: 01/16/2013)

#118

(#118) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR CONTEMPT 105 , 108 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff Slep-Tones Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED and Sugano and Taka-Os Motion for Contempt is also DENIED. Slep-Tone is hereby ORDERED to comply with the Courts January 15, 2013 Order by paying the $18,105 attorneys-fee award within 14 days of this Order. (lc). Modified on 3/25/2013. (lc).

93 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#118) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR CONTEMPT 105 , 108 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff Slep-Tones Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED and Sugano and Taka-Os Motion for Contempt is also DENIED. Slep-Tone is hereby ORDERED to comply with the Courts January 15, 2013 Order by paying the $18,105 attorneys-fee award within 14 days of this Order. (lc). Modified on 3/25/2013. (lc).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#104) ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: granting 97 defendants Motion for Attorney Fees. Fees awarded in favor of defendants Taka-O, Kelly C Sugano against Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation in the amount of 18,105.00. The Court declines to additionally sanction Slep-Tone at this time. (lc) (Entered: 01/16/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: DENHING 101 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to respond to moiton for attorney fees and sanctions. (lc) (Entered: 12/21/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition Papers 101 filed by Defendants Kelly C Sugano, Taka-O. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(McLaughlin, Craig) (Entered: 12/21/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition Papers filed by Plaintiff Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order Extending Time to Respond to Motion)(Chen, Alan) (Entered: 12/20/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D Wright, II: Hearing on MOTION for Attorney Fees and Sanctions 97 , scheduled for January 7, 2013 at 1:30 p.m., is herebyVACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue. (lc) (Entered: 12/19/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alan C Chen on behalf of Plaintiff Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation (Chen, Alan) (Entered: 12/18/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Attorney Fees and Sanctions 97 filed by Defendants Kelly C Sugano, Taka-O. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Table of Contents of Evidence)(McLaughlin, Craig) (Entered: 11/28/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Sanctions filed by defendants Kelly C Sugano, Taka-O. Motion set for hearing on 1/7/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order)(McLaughlin, Craig) (Entered: 11/27/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error incorrect pdf with incorrect date of signature line as 10/2/12 was replaced with pdf with correct date line, a copy of which is also attached to this notice for reference. Re: Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106), 95 (Attachments: # 1 G106) (lc) (Entered: 11/27/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER setting Scheduling Conference set for 1/30/2012 at 01:30 PM; compliance with FRCP 26(f) and filing of report and other instructions. Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch) (Entered: 11/18/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Caffe Brass Monkey, identifying The Brass Monkey, Inc. and Alan Spear. (Brown, Reginald) (Entered: 11/17/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER filed by Defendant Caffe Brass Monkey.(Brown, Reginald) (Entered: 11/17/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting Stipulation Extending defendants the Gaslite and Claire Ragge Time to Answer complaint to 11/28/11 6 by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 11/10/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Gaslight Claire Ragge answer now due 11/28/2011, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendants Gaslight Claire Ragge. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Levinson, Robert) (Entered: 11/08/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Nov. 18, 2011 filed by Defendant Barneys Beanery.(Lewin, Rodney) (Entered: 11/07/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D Wright II. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filling the motion. The Court hears motions on Mondays, Criminal at 10:00 a.m. and Civil at 1:30 p.m. The Court requires delivery of one non-blue backed Mandatory Chambers Copies of only the following manual and electronically filed documents: (1) All noticed motion and related documents; (2) All ex parte applications and related documents; and (3) All exhibits and attachments must be separately tabbed. [Refer to the Courts General Order No. 10-07 regarding ECF Courtesy paper Copies.] (sch) (Entered: 10/14/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation. (et) (Entered: 10/07/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation, identifying Other Affiliate Kurt Slep for Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation. (et) (mg). (Entered: 10/07/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Defendants All Stars Entertainment, Backstage Bar and Grill, Bar and Grill Inc, Barneys Beanery, Heather Biel, Earl Bomar, Bucky, Burbank Bar and Grill, Rodney Burgess, Caffe Brass Monkey, Ron Canzano, Suzie Canzano, Tony Carillo, Cassidy and Razor, Cherry Sound Entertainment, Cliff Room, Tom Corcoran, Craig Sports LLC, Daily Pint, Dan, David Footman, Debbie DeZego, Dukes Bar and Grill, Eight Ball Enterprises Inc, Encore Entertainment, Jeanette Erman, Yvonne Erman, Don Etheridge, Fox Belmont Corporation, Seamus Furlong, Gaslight Claire Ragge, Gators 2, Jen Goldstein, James Gonzalez, Good Nite Bar, Bobby Hardy, Ben Myron Haskell, Identities Unknown, John Does, Mike LeClaire, David Leverton, MLM Entertainment Group LLC, Mainstage Karaoke and DJ Service, Maxs of Manila, Phillip R McGovern, Mike and Linda, No 1 Betta, Ocean Avenue Restaurant, Party Hardy Karaoke, Partytime Karaoke, Q-It-Up, Fabio Quintal, Raging Karaoke, Walter Rodrigues, Christel Santo, Seize The Mic Entertainment, Taryn Seraphine, Tom Shaman, Silver Fox, Fay Simmons, Adam Spear, Alvira Suavillo, Kelly C Sugano, Taka-O, Tartan Room, Robert Thang, Donna Thomas, Angela V., James Wilson, Witches Brew, Y Karaoke Co, Don Young, Melena Young. Case assigned to Judge Otis D Wright, II for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Filing fee $ 350 Paid.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation.(et) (mg). (Entered: 10/07/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SLEP-TONE ENTERTAINMENT CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert A. Levinson