This case was last updated from PACER on 06/28/2016 at 05:17:16 (UTC).

Skurkis et al v. Montelongo et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 Skurkis filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Montelongo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:16-CV-00972

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vicki Schacter

Monica Johnson

Jorie Scull

Joe Filippo

Linda Woods

Linda Van Orsdol

Randy Dean Johnson

Diane Ottelenghi

Ivan Rodriguez

Joshua Taylor

Janet Willison

Nichole Mollica

Sharon Louros

Cindy Morris

Robert Ritz

Mario Ramirez

Christina Headington

Defendants

Armando Montelongo, Jr.

Real Estate Training International, LLC

Performance Advantage Group, Inc.

151 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Allen Wimmer

Attorney at Emergent Legal

25 Taylor Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

Peter Roldan

Attorney at Emergent

535 Mission St., 14Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94015

Defendant Attorneys

Fletcher C. Alford

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Kimberly Diane Howatt

Attorney at Gordon and Rees LLP

101 W. Broadway, Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Jeffrey David Cawdrey

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani

101 West Broadway, Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Brittany Leigh McCarthy

Attorney at Gordon Rees LLP

101 W. Broadway, Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Nathan Christopher Corbett

Attorney at Education Management Services, LLC

2935 Thousand Oaks Drive, Suite 6-285

San Antonio, TX 78247

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-10247832). Filed by Trinadh Bylipudi, Michelle Skurkis. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Wimmer, Christopher) (Filed on 2/26/2016) Modified on 3/1/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/26/2016)

#2

(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 3/14/2016. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Trinadh Bylipudi, Michelle Skurkis (Wimmer, Christopher) (Filed on 2/29/2016) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2016. Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to 2015 License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo Seminars, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Performance Advantage Group, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Acker, Andrea Albright, Diana Alvardo-Harris, Rick Amato, Jacqueline Anteau, Kim Arendt, Frizzet Barnes, Bruce Bartelt, Devin Bates, Tim Bauer, Vi Becker, Kathy Bergami, Jessica Brower, Justin William Brown, Richard Buckley, Cecilia Bunnell, Tiffany Bunnell, Frances Burke, Trinadh Bylipudi, Daniel Callaway, Dena Castello, Kum-Lok Chia, Sam Claypeople, Shawnna Conner, Gregg Contreras, Roberto Correa, Sherilyn Correa, Joan Cover, Jory Cummings, Heather Damon, Pamela Denny, Pamela Duque, Genevieve Edwards, James Farardo, Jan Favorite, Ron Field, Joe Filippo, Agnes Florendo, Kelly Floyd, Karen Furlow, Rosalie Garcia, Cynthia Gebhardt, Joseph Gebhardt, Mary Gerhart, Susan Glass, Doug Glenn, Victor Gutierrez, Mark Harbolt, Susan Harbolt, Christina Headington, Chris Hepburn, Nicole Hepburn, Debe Hickman, Kim Holstein, Gregory Hunter, Judy Hunter, Robert Janesh, Jill Morrison Johnson, Krandall Johnson, Monica Johnson, Randy Dean Johnson, Cynthia Woods Jones, Gale Jones, Kelli Kaestler, Liana Katejova, Howard Kinsey, Sherrie Kinsey, Dawn Klapcuniak, Kenneth Klapcuniak, Shannon Knight, Tammy Knutson, Tamara Kurtz, Heather Le Vine, Anthony Ledesma, Elizabeth Ledesma, Baltzell Leota, Sharon Louros, Yasmine Lu, Harold Mahoney, Lucy Mahoney, Brian Martin, Wendy Martin, Ellen Menter, William Menter, Nichole Mollica, Andy Monson, Margaret Monson, Robert Moore, Cindy Morris, Donna Morris, Barbara Mowery, Sheila Mullins-Brill, Connie Musilek, Fred Navarro, Rizalina Navarro, Michael Neri, Bridgette Newsome, Charlotte Christine Noonan, Daryl Noonan, Jean Norton, Brian O'Neal, Claudia Ocoro, Karen Okerman, Cristine Osborne, Diane Ottelenghi, Johnnie Parker, Johnette Parmelee, Jen Pigg, Knicole Porter, Stacey Price-Brown, Linda Quelet, Mario Ramirez, Sandra Rheinecker, Cheryl Rich, Kristy Ritz, Robert Ritz, Barbara Rodriguez, Diego Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Susan Rogge, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Israel Rosales, Carlene Saelg, Jim Scearce, Liz Scearce, Vicki Schacter, Angie Schlecter, Shawn Schnoor, Randolph Scoville, Jorie Scull, Sherry Waters Setzer, Brooks Silva, Vicki Simmons, David Sisnetsky, Chad Skurkis, Michelle Skurkis, Suzan Starkey, Dale Starks, Carla Strand, Joe Strand, Karen Suing, Laurie Tatum, Joshua Taylor, Suzanne Terpak, Carol Thomas, Suzanne Tuskey, Duane Vadnais, Linda Van Orsdol, Susan Vesel, Michael Voronkov, Laura Voronkova, Jean Lynn Walker, Michelle Weststeyn, Philip White, Charles Willison, Janet Willison, Linda Wilson, Linda Woods, Kim Wozniak, Glenwood Young, Mark Zakrzewski, Sharon Zakrzewski, Lori Zuanich, Tony Zuanich.. (Wimmer, Christopher) (Filed on 3/14/2016) (Entered: 03/14/2016)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint [Local Rule 6-1(a)] filed by 2015 License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo Seminars, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Performance Advantage Group, Inc.. (Alford, Fletcher) (Filed on 3/24/2016) (Entered: 03/24/2016)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by 2015 License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo Seminars, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Performance Advantage Group, Inc... (Alford, Fletcher) (Filed on 3/24/2016) (Entered: 03/24/2016)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by 2015 License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo Seminars, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Performance Advantage Group, Inc. (Alford, Fletcher) (Filed on 3/24/2016) (Entered: 03/24/2016)

#36

(#36) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 34 Joint Stipulation. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016) (Entered: 05/26/2016)

#37

(#37) NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Cawdrey, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/27/2016) (Entered: 05/27/2016)

#38

(#38) ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on August 31, 2016 at 10:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016) (Entered: 05/27/2016)

#39

(#39) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 6/10/2016. Replies due by 6/17/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Armando Montelongo, Jr., # 2 Proposed Order)(Cawdrey, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/27/2016) (Entered: 05/27/2016)

#40

(#40) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wimmer, Christopher) (Filed on 6/3/2016) (Entered: 06/03/2016)

#41

(#41) RESPONSE (re 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) or Transfer] filed byJohn Acker, Andrea Albright, Diana Alvardo-Harris, Rick Amato, Jacqueline Anteau, Kim Arendt, Frizzet Barnes, Bruce Bartelt, Devin Bates, Tim Bauer, Vi Becker, Kathy Bergami, Jessica Brower, Justin William Brown, Richard Buckley, Cecilia Bunnell, Tiffany Bunnell, Frances Burke, Trinadh Bylipudi, Daniel Callaway, Dena Castello, Kum-Lok Chia, Sam Claypeople, Shawnna Conner, Gregg Contreras, Roberto Correa, Sherilyn Correa, Joan Cover, Jory Cummings, Heather Damon, Pamela Denny, Pamela Duque, Genevieve Edwards, James Farardo, Jan Favorite, Joe Filippo, Agnes Florendo, Kelly Floyd, Karen Furlow, Rosalie Garcia, Cynthia Gebhardt, Joseph Gebhardt, Mary Gerhart, Susan Glass, Doug Glenn, Victor Gutierrez, Mark Harbolt, Susan Harbolt, Christina Headington, Chris Hepburn, Nicole Hepburn, Debe Hickman, Kim Holstein, Gregory Hunter, Judy Hunter, Robert Janesh, Jill Morrison Johnson, Krandall Johnson, Monica Johnson, Randy Dean Johnson, Cynthia Woods Jones, Gale Jones, Kelli Kaestler, Liana Katejova, Howard Kinsey, Sherrie Kinsey, Dawn Klapcuniak, Kenneth Klapcuniak, Shannon Knight, Tammy Knutson, Tamara Kurtz, Heather Le Vine, Anthony Ledesma, Elizabeth Ledesma, Baltzell Leota, Sharon Louros, Yasmine Lu, Harold Mahoney, Lucy Mahoney, Brian Martin, Wendy Martin, Ellen Menter, William Menter, Nichole Mollica, Andy Monson, Margaret Monson, Robert Moore, Cindy Morris, Donna Morris, Barbara Mowery, Sheila Mullins-Brill, Connie Musilek, Fred Navarro, Rizalina Navarro, Michael Neri, Bridgette Newsome, Charlotte Christine Noonan, Daryl Noonan, Jean Norton, Brian O'Neal, Claudia Ocoro, Karen Okerman, Cristine Osborne, Diane Ottelenghi, Johnnie Parker, Johnette Parmelee, Jen Pigg, Knicole Porter, Stacey Price-Brown, Linda Quelet, Mario Ramirez, Sandra Rheinecker, Cheryl Rich, Kristy Ritz, Robert Ritz, Barbara Rodriguez, Diego Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Susan Rogge, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Israel Rosales, Carlene Saelg, Jim Scearce, Liz Scearce, Vicki Schacter, Angie Schlecter, Shawn Schnoor, Randolph Scoville, Jorie Scull, Sherry Waters Setzer, Brooks Silva, Vicki Simmons, David Sisnetsky, Chad Skurkis, Michelle Skurkis, Suzan Starkey, Dale Starks, Carla Strand, Joe Strand, Karen Suing, Laurie Tatum, Joshua Taylor, Suzanne Terpak, Carol Thomas, Suzanne Tuskey, Duane Vadnais, Linda Van Orsdol, Susan Vesel, Michael Voronkov, Laura Voronkova, Jean Lynn Walker, Michelle Weststeyn, Philip White, Charles Willison, Janet Willison, Linda Wilson, Linda Woods, Kim Wozniak, Glenwood Young, Mark Zakrzewski, Sharon Zakrzewski, Lori Zuanich, Tony Zuanich. (Roldan, Peter) (Filed on 6/10/2016) Modified on 6/13/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/10/2016)

#42

(#42) DECLARATION of Christopher Wimmer in Opposition to re 39 Motion to Dismiss filed byJohn Acker, Andrea Albright, Diana Alvardo-Harris, Rick Amato, Jacqueline Anteau, Kim Arendt, Frizzet Barnes, Bruce Bartelt, Devin Bates, Tim Bauer, Vi Becker, Kathy Bergami, Jessica Brower, Justin William Brown, Richard Buckley, Cecilia Bunnell, Tiffany Bunnell, Frances Burke, Trinadh Bylipudi, Daniel Callaway, Dena Castello, Kum-Lok Chia, Sam Claypeople, Shawnna Conner, Gregg Contreras, Roberto Correa, Sherilyn Correa, Joan Cover, Jory Cummings, Heather Damon, Pamela Denny, Pamela Duque, Genevieve Edwards, James Farardo, Jan Favorite, Joe Filippo, Agnes Florendo, Kelly Floyd, Karen Furlow, Rosalie Garcia, Cynthia Gebhardt, Joseph Gebhardt, Mary Gerhart, Susan Glass, Doug Glenn, Victor Gutierrez, Mark Harbolt, Susan Harbolt, Christina Headington, Chris Hepburn, Nicole Hepburn, Debe Hickman, Kim Holstein, Gregory Hunter, Judy Hunter, Robert Janesh, Jill Morrison Johnson, Krandall Johnson, Monica Johnson, Randy Dean Johnson, Cynthia Woods Jones, Gale Jones, Kelli Kaestler, Liana Katejova, Howard Kinsey, Sherrie Kinsey, Dawn Klapcuniak, Kenneth Klapcuniak, Shannon Knight, Tammy Knutson, Tamara Kurtz, Heather Le Vine, Anthony Ledesma, Elizabeth Ledesma, Baltzell Leota, Sharon Louros, Yasmine Lu, Harold Mahoney, Lucy Mahoney, Brian Martin, Wendy Martin, Ellen Menter, William Menter, Nichole Mollica, Andy Monson, Margaret Monson, Robert Moore, Cindy Morris, Donna Morris, Barbara Mowery, Sheila Mullins-Brill, Connie Musilek, Fred Navarro, Rizalina Navarro, Michael Neri, Bridgette Newsome, Charlotte Christine Noonan, Daryl Noonan, Jean Norton, Brian O'Neal, Claudia Ocoro, Karen Okerman, Cristine Osborne, Diane Ottelenghi, Johnnie Parker, Johnette Parmelee, Jen Pigg, Knicole Porter, Stacey Price-Brown, Linda Quelet, Mario Ramirez, Sandra Rheinecker, Cheryl Rich, Kristy Ritz, Robert Ritz, Barbara Rodriguez, Diego Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Susan Rogge, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Israel Rosales, Carlene Saelg, Jim Scearce, Liz Scearce, Vicki Schacter, Angie Schlecter, Shawn Schnoor, Randolph Scoville, Jorie Scull, Sherry Waters Setzer, Brooks Silva, Vicki Simmons, David Sisnetsky, Chad Skurkis, Michelle Skurkis, Suzan Starkey, Dale Starks, Carla Strand, Joe Strand, Karen Suing, Laurie Tatum, Joshua Taylor, Suzanne Terpak, Carol Thomas, Suzanne Tuskey, Duane Vadnais, Linda Van Orsdol, Susan Vesel, Michael Voronkov, Laura Voronkova, Jean Lynn Walker, Michelle Weststeyn, Philip White, Charles Willison, Janet Willison, Linda Wilson, Linda Woods, Kim Wozniak, Glenwood Young, Mark Zakrzewski, Sharon Zakrzewski, Lori Zuanich, Tony Zuanich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (part 1 of 2), # 3 Exhibit B (part 2 of 2), # 4 Exhibit C (part 1 of 4), # 5 Exhibit C (part 2 of 4), # 6 Exhibit C (part 3 of 4), # 7 Exhibit C (part 4 of 4), # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N, # 19 Exhibit O, # 20 Exhibit P, # 21 Exhibit Q, # 22 Exhibit R)(Related document(s) 41 ) (Roldan, Peter) (Filed on 6/10/2016) Modified on 6/13/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/10/2016)

#43

(#43) Proposed Order Denying re 39 MOTION to Dismiss by John Acker, Andrea Albright, Diana Alvardo-Harris, Rick Amato, Jacqueline Anteau, Kim Arendt, Frizzet Barnes, Bruce Bartelt, Devin Bates, Tim Bauer, Vi Becker, Kathy Bergami, Jessica Brower, Justin William Brown, Richard Buckley, Cecilia Bunnell, Tiffany Bunnell, Frances Burke, Trinadh Bylipudi, Daniel Callaway, Dena Castello, Kum-Lok Chia, Sam Claypeople, Shawnna Conner, Gregg Contreras, Roberto Correa, Sherilyn Correa, Joan Cover, Jory Cummings, Heather Damon, Pamela Denny, Pamela Duque, Genevieve Edwards, James Farardo, Jan Favorite, Joe Filippo, Agnes Florendo, Kelly Floyd, Karen Furlow, Rosalie Garcia, Cynthia Gebhardt, Joseph Gebhardt, Mary Gerhart, Susan Glass, Doug Glenn, Victor Gutierrez, Mark Harbolt, Susan Harbolt, Christina Headington, Chris Hepburn, Nicole Hepburn, Debe Hickman, Kim Holstein, Gregory Hunter, Judy Hunter, Robert Janesh, Jill Morrison Johnson, Krandall Johnson, Monica Johnson, Randy Dean Johnson, Cynthia Woods Jones, Gale Jones, Kelli Kaestler, Liana Katejova, Howard Kinsey, Sherrie Kinsey, Dawn Klapcuniak, Kenneth Klapcuniak, Shannon Knight, Tammy Knutson, Tamara Kurtz, Heather Le Vine, Anthony Ledesma, Elizabeth Ledesma, Baltzell Leota, Sharon Louros, Yasmine Lu, Harold Mahoney, Lucy Mahoney, Brian Martin, Wendy Martin, Ellen Menter, William Menter, Nichole Mollica, Andy Monson, Margaret Monson, Robert Moore, Cindy Morris, Donna Morris, Barbara Mowery, Sheila Mullins-Brill, Connie Musilek, Fred Navarro, Rizalina Navarro, Michael Neri, Bridgette Newsome, Charlotte Christine Noonan, Daryl Noonan, Jean Norton, Brian O'Neal, Claudia Ocoro, Karen Okerman, Cristine Osborne, Diane Ottelenghi, Johnnie Parker, Johnette Parmelee, Jen Pigg, Knicole Porter, Stacey Price-Brown, Linda Quelet, Mario Ramirez, Sandra Rheinecker, Cheryl Rich, Kristy Ritz, Robert Ritz, Barbara Rodriguez, Diego Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Susan Rogge, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Israel Rosales, Carlene Saelg, Jim Scearce, Liz Scearce, Vicki Schacter, Angie Schlecter, Shawn Schnoor, Randolph Scoville, Jorie Scull, Sherry Waters Setzer, Brooks Silva, Vicki Simmons, David Sisnetsky, Chad Skurkis, Michelle Skurkis, Suzan Starkey, Dale Starks, Carla Strand, Joe Strand, Karen Suing, Laurie Tatum, Joshua Taylor, Suzanne Terpak, Carol Thomas, Suzanne Tuskey, Duane Vadnais, Linda Van Orsdol, Susan Vesel, Michael Voronkov, Laura Voronkova, Jean Lynn Walker, Michelle Weststeyn, Philip White, Charles Willison, Janet Willison, Linda Wilson, Linda Woods, Kim Wozniak, Glenwood Young, Mark Zakrzewski, Sharon Zakrzewski, Lori Zuanich, Tony Zuanich. (Roldan, Peter) (Filed on 6/10/2016) Modified on 6/13/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/10/2016)

#44

(#44) REPLY (re 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byArmando Montelongo Seminars, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew Moon, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cawdrey, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/17/2016) (Entered: 06/17/2016)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) REPLY (re 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byArmando Montelongo Seminars, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew Moon, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cawdrey, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/17/2016) (Entered: 06/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) Proposed Order Denying re 39 MOTION to Dismiss by John Acker, Andrea Albright, Diana Alvardo-Harris, Rick Amato, Jacqueline Anteau, Kim Arendt, Frizzet Barnes, Bruce Bartelt, Devin Bates, Tim Bauer, Vi Becker, Kathy Bergami, Jessica Brower, Justin William Brown, Richard Buckley, Cecilia Bunnell, Tiffany Bunnell, Frances Burke, Trinadh Bylipudi, Daniel Callaway, Dena Castello, Kum-Lok Chia, Sam Claypeople, Shawnna Conner, Gregg Contreras, Roberto Correa, Sherilyn Correa, Joan Cover, Jory Cummings, Heather Damon, Pamela Denny, Pamela Duque, Genevieve Edwards, James Farardo, Jan Favorite, Joe Filippo, Agnes Florendo, Kelly Floyd, Karen Furlow, Rosalie Garcia, Cynthia Gebhardt, Joseph Gebhardt, Mary Gerhart, Susan Glass, Doug Glenn, Victor Gutierrez, Mark Harbolt, Susan Harbolt, Christina Headington, Chris Hepburn, Nicole Hepburn, Debe Hickman, Kim Holstein, Gregory Hunter, Judy Hunter, Robert Janesh, Jill Morrison Johnson, Krandall Johnson, Monica Johnson, Randy Dean Johnson, Cynthia Woods Jones, Gale Jones, Kelli Kaestler, Liana Katejova, Howard Kinsey, Sherrie Kinsey, Dawn Klapcuniak, Kenneth Klapcuniak, Shannon Knight, Tammy Knutson, Tamara Kurtz, Heather Le Vine, Anthony Ledesma, Elizabeth Ledesma, Baltzell Leota, Sharon Louros, Yasmine Lu, Harold Mahoney, Lucy Mahoney, Brian Martin, Wendy Martin, Ellen Menter, William Menter, Nichole Mollica, Andy Monson, Margaret Monson, Robert Moore, Cindy Morris, Donna Morris, Barbara Mowery, Sheila Mullins-Brill, Connie Musilek, Fred Navarro, Rizalina Navarro, Michael Neri, Bridgette Newsome, Charlotte Christine Noonan, Daryl Noonan, Jean Norton, Brian O'Neal, Claudia Ocoro, Karen Okerman, Cristine Osborne, Diane Ottelenghi, Johnnie Parker, Johnette Parmelee, Jen Pigg, Knicole Porter, Stacey Price-Brown, Linda Quelet, Mario Ramirez, Sandra Rheinecker, Cheryl Rich, Kristy Ritz, Robert Ritz, Barbara Rodriguez, Diego Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Susan Rogge, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Israel Rosales, Carlene Saelg, Jim Scearce, Liz Scearce, Vicki Schacter, Angie Schlecter, Shawn Schnoor, Randolph Scoville, Jorie Scull, Sherry Waters Setzer, Brooks Silva, Vicki Simmons, David Sisnetsky, Chad Skurkis, Michelle Skurkis, Suzan Starkey, Dale Starks, Carla Strand, Joe Strand, Karen Suing, Laurie Tatum, Joshua Taylor, Suzanne Terpak, Carol Thomas, Suzanne Tuskey, Duane Vadnais, Linda Van Orsdol, Susan Vesel, Michael Voronkov, Laura Voronkova, Jean Lynn Walker, Michelle Weststeyn, Philip White, Charles Willison, Janet Willison, Linda Wilson, Linda Woods, Kim Wozniak, Glenwood Young, Mark Zakrzewski, Sharon Zakrzewski, Lori Zuanich, Tony Zuanich. (Roldan, Peter) (Filed on 6/10/2016) Modified on 6/13/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) DECLARATION of Christopher Wimmer in Opposition to re 39 Motion to Dismiss filed byJohn Acker, Andrea Albright, Diana Alvardo-Harris, Rick Amato, Jacqueline Anteau, Kim Arendt, Frizzet Barnes, Bruce Bartelt, Devin Bates, Tim Bauer, Vi Becker, Kathy Bergami, Jessica Brower, Justin William Brown, Richard Buckley, Cecilia Bunnell, Tiffany Bunnell, Frances Burke, Trinadh Bylipudi, Daniel Callaway, Dena Castello, Kum-Lok Chia, Sam Claypeople, Shawnna Conner, Gregg Contreras, Roberto Correa, Sherilyn Correa, Joan Cover, Jory Cummings, Heather Damon, Pamela Denny, Pamela Duque, Genevieve Edwards, James Farardo, Jan Favorite, Joe Filippo, Agnes Florendo, Kelly Floyd, Karen Furlow, Rosalie Garcia, Cynthia Gebhardt, Joseph Gebhardt, Mary Gerhart, Susan Glass, Doug Glenn, Victor Gutierrez, Mark Harbolt, Susan Harbolt, Christina Headington, Chris Hepburn, Nicole Hepburn, Debe Hickman, Kim Holstein, Gregory Hunter, Judy Hunter, Robert Janesh, Jill Morrison Johnson, Krandall Johnson, Monica Johnson, Randy Dean Johnson, Cynthia Woods Jones, Gale Jones, Kelli Kaestler, Liana Katejova, Howard Kinsey, Sherrie Kinsey, Dawn Klapcuniak, Kenneth Klapcuniak, Shannon Knight, Tammy Knutson, Tamara Kurtz, Heather Le Vine, Anthony Ledesma, Elizabeth Ledesma, Baltzell Leota, Sharon Louros, Yasmine Lu, Harold Mahoney, Lucy Mahoney, Brian Martin, Wendy Martin, Ellen Menter, William Menter, Nichole Mollica, Andy Monson, Margaret Monson, Robert Moore, Cindy Morris, Donna Morris, Barbara Mowery, Sheila Mullins-Brill, Connie Musilek, Fred Navarro, Rizalina Navarro, Michael Neri, Bridgette Newsome, Charlotte Christine Noonan, Daryl Noonan, Jean Norton, Brian O'Neal, Claudia Ocoro, Karen Okerman, Cristine Osborne, Diane Ottelenghi, Johnnie Parker, Johnette Parmelee, Jen Pigg, Knicole Porter, Stacey Price-Brown, Linda Quelet, Mario Ramirez, Sandra Rheinecker, Cheryl Rich, Kristy Ritz, Robert Ritz, Barbara Rodriguez, Diego Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Susan Rogge, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Israel Rosales, Carlene Saelg, Jim Scearce, Liz Scearce, Vicki Schacter, Angie Schlecter, Shawn Schnoor, Randolph Scoville, Jorie Scull, Sherry Waters Setzer, Brooks Silva, Vicki Simmons, David Sisnetsky, Chad Skurkis, Michelle Skurkis, Suzan Starkey, Dale Starks, Carla Strand, Joe Strand, Karen Suing, Laurie Tatum, Joshua Taylor, Suzanne Terpak, Carol Thomas, Suzanne Tuskey, Duane Vadnais, Linda Van Orsdol, Susan Vesel, Michael Voronkov, Laura Voronkova, Jean Lynn Walker, Michelle Weststeyn, Philip White, Charles Willison, Janet Willison, Linda Wilson, Linda Woods, Kim Wozniak, Glenwood Young, Mark Zakrzewski, Sharon Zakrzewski, Lori Zuanich, Tony Zuanich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (part 1 of 2), # 3 Exhibit B (part 2 of 2), # 4 Exhibit C (part 1 of 4), # 5 Exhibit C (part 2 of 4), # 6 Exhibit C (part 3 of 4), # 7 Exhibit C (part 4 of 4), # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N, # 19 Exhibit O, # 20 Exhibit P, # 21 Exhibit Q, # 22 Exhibit R)(Related document(s) 41 ) (Roldan, Peter) (Filed on 6/10/2016) Modified on 6/13/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) RESPONSE (re 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) or Transfer] filed byJohn Acker, Andrea Albright, Diana Alvardo-Harris, Rick Amato, Jacqueline Anteau, Kim Arendt, Frizzet Barnes, Bruce Bartelt, Devin Bates, Tim Bauer, Vi Becker, Kathy Bergami, Jessica Brower, Justin William Brown, Richard Buckley, Cecilia Bunnell, Tiffany Bunnell, Frances Burke, Trinadh Bylipudi, Daniel Callaway, Dena Castello, Kum-Lok Chia, Sam Claypeople, Shawnna Conner, Gregg Contreras, Roberto Correa, Sherilyn Correa, Joan Cover, Jory Cummings, Heather Damon, Pamela Denny, Pamela Duque, Genevieve Edwards, James Farardo, Jan Favorite, Joe Filippo, Agnes Florendo, Kelly Floyd, Karen Furlow, Rosalie Garcia, Cynthia Gebhardt, Joseph Gebhardt, Mary Gerhart, Susan Glass, Doug Glenn, Victor Gutierrez, Mark Harbolt, Susan Harbolt, Christina Headington, Chris Hepburn, Nicole Hepburn, Debe Hickman, Kim Holstein, Gregory Hunter, Judy Hunter, Robert Janesh, Jill Morrison Johnson, Krandall Johnson, Monica Johnson, Randy Dean Johnson, Cynthia Woods Jones, Gale Jones, Kelli Kaestler, Liana Katejova, Howard Kinsey, Sherrie Kinsey, Dawn Klapcuniak, Kenneth Klapcuniak, Shannon Knight, Tammy Knutson, Tamara Kurtz, Heather Le Vine, Anthony Ledesma, Elizabeth Ledesma, Baltzell Leota, Sharon Louros, Yasmine Lu, Harold Mahoney, Lucy Mahoney, Brian Martin, Wendy Martin, Ellen Menter, William Menter, Nichole Mollica, Andy Monson, Margaret Monson, Robert Moore, Cindy Morris, Donna Morris, Barbara Mowery, Sheila Mullins-Brill, Connie Musilek, Fred Navarro, Rizalina Navarro, Michael Neri, Bridgette Newsome, Charlotte Christine Noonan, Daryl Noonan, Jean Norton, Brian O'Neal, Claudia Ocoro, Karen Okerman, Cristine Osborne, Diane Ottelenghi, Johnnie Parker, Johnette Parmelee, Jen Pigg, Knicole Porter, Stacey Price-Brown, Linda Quelet, Mario Ramirez, Sandra Rheinecker, Cheryl Rich, Kristy Ritz, Robert Ritz, Barbara Rodriguez, Diego Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Susan Rogge, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Israel Rosales, Carlene Saelg, Jim Scearce, Liz Scearce, Vicki Schacter, Angie Schlecter, Shawn Schnoor, Randolph Scoville, Jorie Scull, Sherry Waters Setzer, Brooks Silva, Vicki Simmons, David Sisnetsky, Chad Skurkis, Michelle Skurkis, Suzan Starkey, Dale Starks, Carla Strand, Joe Strand, Karen Suing, Laurie Tatum, Joshua Taylor, Suzanne Terpak, Carol Thomas, Suzanne Tuskey, Duane Vadnais, Linda Van Orsdol, Susan Vesel, Michael Voronkov, Laura Voronkova, Jean Lynn Walker, Michelle Weststeyn, Philip White, Charles Willison, Janet Willison, Linda Wilson, Linda Woods, Kim Wozniak, Glenwood Young, Mark Zakrzewski, Sharon Zakrzewski, Lori Zuanich, Tony Zuanich. (Roldan, Peter) (Filed on 6/10/2016) Modified on 6/13/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wimmer, Christopher) (Filed on 6/3/2016) (Entered: 06/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 6/10/2016. Replies due by 6/17/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Armando Montelongo, Jr., # 2 Proposed Order)(Cawdrey, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/27/2016) (Entered: 05/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on August 31, 2016 at 10:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016) (Entered: 05/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Cawdrey, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/27/2016) (Entered: 05/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 34 Joint Stipulation. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016) (Entered: 05/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) NOTICE Regarding ADR Stipulation and Certifications by John Acker, Andrea Albright, Diana Alvardo-Harris, Rick Amato, Jacqueline Anteau, Kim Arendt, Frizzet Barnes, Bruce Bartelt, Devin Bates, Tim Bauer, Vi Becker, Kathy Bergami, Jessica Brower, Justin William Brown, Richard Buckley, Cecilia Bunnell, Tiffany Bunnell, Frances Burke, Trinadh Bylipudi, Daniel Callaway, Dena Castello, Kum-Lok Chia, Sam Claypeople, Shawnna Conner, Gregg Contreras, Roberto Correa, Sherilyn Correa, Joan Cover, Jory Cummings, Heather Damon, Pamela Denny, Pamela Duque, Genevieve Edwards, James Farardo, Jan Favorite, Joe Filippo, Agnes Florendo, Kelly Floyd, Karen Furlow, Rosalie Garcia, Cynthia Gebhardt, Joseph Gebhardt, Mary Gerhart, Susan Glass, Doug Glenn, Victor Gutierrez, Mark Harbolt, Susan Harbolt, Christina Headington, Chris Hepburn, Nicole Hepburn, Debe Hickman, Kim Holstein, Gregory Hunter, Judy Hunter, Robert Janesh, Jill Morrison Johnson, Krandall Johnson, Monica Johnson, Randy Dean Johnson, Cynthia Woods Jones, Gale Jones, Kelli Kaestler, Liana Katejova, Howard Kinsey, Sherrie Kinsey, Dawn Klapcuniak, Kenneth Klapcuniak, Shannon Knight, Tammy Knutson, Tamara Kurtz, Heather Le Vine, Anthony Ledesma, Elizabeth Ledesma, Baltzell Leota, Sharon Louros, Yasmine Lu, Harold Mahoney, Lucy Mahoney, Brian Martin, Wendy Martin, Ellen Menter, William Menter, Nichole Mollica, Andy Monson, Margaret Monson, Robert Moore, Cindy Morris, Donna Morris, Barbara Mowery, Sheila Mullins-Brill, Connie Musilek, Fred Navarro, Rizalina Navarro, Michael Neri, Bridgette Newsome, Charlotte Christine Noonan, Daryl Noonan, Jean Norton, Brian O'Neal, Claudia Ocoro, Karen Okerman, Cristine Osborne, Diane Ottelenghi, Johnnie Parker, Johnette Parmelee, Jen Pigg, Knicole Porter, Stacey Price-Brown, Linda Quelet, Mario Ramirez, Sandra Rheinecker, Cheryl Rich, Kristy Ritz, Robert Ritz, Barbara Rodriguez, Diego Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Susan Rogge, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Israel Rosales, Carlene Saelg, Jim Scearce, Liz Scearce, Vicki Schacter, Angie Schlecter, Shawn Schnoor, Randolph Scoville, Jorie Scull, Sherry Waters Setzer, Brooks Silva, Vicki Simmons, David Sisnetsky, Chad Skurkis, Michelle Skurkis, Suzan Starkey, Dale Starks, Carla Strand, Joe Strand, Karen Suing, Laurie Tatum, Joshua Taylor, Suzanne Terpak, Carol Thomas, Suzanne Tuskey, Duane Vadnais, Linda Van Orsdol, Susan Vesel, Michael Voronkov, Laura Voronkova, Jean Lynn Walker, Michelle Weststeyn, Philip White, Charles Willison, Janet Willison, Linda Wilson, Linda Woods, Kim Wozniak, Glenwood Young, Mark Zakrzewski, Sharon Zakrzewski, Lori Zuanich, Tony Zuanich re 33 ADR Clerk's Notice (Wimmer, Christopher) (Filed on 5/24/2016) Modified on 5/25/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016) (Entered: 03/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by 2015 License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo Seminars, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Performance Advantage Group, Inc. (Alford, Fletcher) (Filed on 3/24/2016) (Entered: 03/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by 2015 License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo Seminars, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Performance Advantage Group, Inc... (Alford, Fletcher) (Filed on 3/24/2016) (Entered: 03/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint [Local Rule 6-1(a)] filed by 2015 License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo Seminars, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Performance Advantage Group, Inc.. (Alford, Fletcher) (Filed on 3/24/2016) (Entered: 03/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Acker, Andrea Albright, Diana Alvardo-Harris, Rick Amato, Jacqueline Anteau, Kim Arendt, Frizzet Barnes, Bruce Bartelt, Devin Bates, Tim Bauer, Vi Becker, Kathy Bergami, Jessica Brower, Justin William Brown, Richard Buckley, Cecilia Bunnell, Tiffany Bunnell, Frances Burke, Trinadh Bylipudi, Daniel Callaway, Dena Castello, Kum-Lok Chia, Sam Claypeople, Shawnna Conner, Gregg Contreras, Roberto Correa, Sherilyn Correa, Joan Cover, Jory Cummings, Heather Damon, Pamela Denny, Pamela Duque, Genevieve Edwards, James Farardo, Jan Favorite, Ron Field, Joe Filippo, Agnes Florendo, Kelly Floyd, Karen Furlow, Rosalie Garcia, Cynthia Gebhardt, Joseph Gebhardt, Mary Gerhart, Susan Glass, Doug Glenn, Victor Gutierrez, Mark Harbolt, Susan Harbolt, Christina Headington, Chris Hepburn, Nicole Hepburn, Debe Hickman, Kim Holstein, Gregory Hunter, Judy Hunter, Robert Janesh, Jill Morrison Johnson, Krandall Johnson, Monica Johnson, Randy Dean Johnson, Cynthia Woods Jones, Gale Jones, Kelli Kaestler, Liana Katejova, Howard Kinsey, Sherrie Kinsey, Dawn Klapcuniak, Kenneth Klapcuniak, Shannon Knight, Tammy Knutson, Tamara Kurtz, Heather Le Vine, Anthony Ledesma, Elizabeth Ledesma, Baltzell Leota, Sharon Louros, Yasmine Lu, Harold Mahoney, Lucy Mahoney, Brian Martin, Wendy Martin, Ellen Menter, William Menter, Nichole Mollica, Andy Monson, Margaret Monson, Robert Moore, Cindy Morris, Donna Morris, Barbara Mowery, Sheila Mullins-Brill, Connie Musilek, Fred Navarro, Rizalina Navarro, Michael Neri, Bridgette Newsome, Charlotte Christine Noonan, Daryl Noonan, Jean Norton, Brian O'Neal, Claudia Ocoro, Karen Okerman, Cristine Osborne, Diane Ottelenghi, Johnnie Parker, Johnette Parmelee, Jen Pigg, Knicole Porter, Stacey Price-Brown, Linda Quelet, Mario Ramirez, Sandra Rheinecker, Cheryl Rich, Kristy Ritz, Robert Ritz, Barbara Rodriguez, Diego Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Susan Rogge, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Israel Rosales, Carlene Saelg, Jim Scearce, Liz Scearce, Vicki Schacter, Angie Schlecter, Shawn Schnoor, Randolph Scoville, Jorie Scull, Sherry Waters Setzer, Brooks Silva, Vicki Simmons, David Sisnetsky, Chad Skurkis, Michelle Skurkis, Suzan Starkey, Dale Starks, Carla Strand, Joe Strand, Karen Suing, Laurie Tatum, Joshua Taylor, Suzanne Terpak, Carol Thomas, Suzanne Tuskey, Duane Vadnais, Linda Van Orsdol, Susan Vesel, Michael Voronkov, Laura Voronkova, Jean Lynn Walker, Michelle Weststeyn, Philip White, Charles Willison, Janet Willison, Linda Wilson, Linda Woods, Kim Wozniak, Glenwood Young, Mark Zakrzewski, Sharon Zakrzewski, Lori Zuanich, Tony Zuanich.. (Wimmer, Christopher) (Filed on 3/14/2016) (Entered: 03/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to 2015 License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo Seminars, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Performance Advantage Group, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2016. Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Trinadh Bylipudi, Michelle Skurkis (Wimmer, Christopher) (Filed on 2/29/2016) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 3/14/2016. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-10247832). Filed by Trinadh Bylipudi, Michelle Skurkis. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Wimmer, Christopher) (Filed on 2/26/2016) Modified on 3/1/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less