This case was last updated from PACER on 06/02/2016 at 11:24:27 (UTC).

Siuzdak v. Lynch

Case Summary

On 10/20/2014 Siuzdak filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Lynch. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Victor A. Bolden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-01543

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Victor A. Bolden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kurt Siuzdak

Defendant

Eric H. Holder, Jr.

Consolidated Defendant

Loretta E. Lynch

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas W. Bucci

Attorney at Willinger, Willinger & Bucci, P.C.

855 Main St., Fifth Floor

Bridgeport, CT 06604

Consolidated Defendant and Defendant Attorney

Karen Folster Lesperance

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - NDNY

445 Broadway, Room 218

Albany, NY 12207

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Eric H. Holder, Jr ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-3393613.), filed by Kurt Siuzdak.(Bucci, Thomas) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 1/20/2015. Amended Pleadings due by 12/19/2014 Discovery due by 4/21/2015 Dispositive Motions due by 5/21/2015 Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/20/2014.(Garguilo, B) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/20/2014.(Garguilo, B) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/20/2014.(Garguilo, B) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 10/20/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Attachment)(Garguilo, B) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 5 Notice, 3 Electronic Filing Order, 4 Protective Order, 1 Complaint filed by Kurt Siuzdak Signed by Clerk on 10/20/2014.(Garguilo, B) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Eric H. Holder, Jr* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Thomas W. Bucci* *Willinger, Willinger & Bucci* *855 Main St.* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Garguilo, B) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kurt Siuzdak. Eric H. Holder, Jr served on 10/23/2014, answer due 11/13/2014. (Bucci, Thomas) (Entered: 10/30/2014)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Folster Lesperance on behalf of Eric H. Holder, Jr (Folster Lesperance, Karen) (Entered: 12/17/2014)

#31

(#31) ORDER granting 29 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/29/2016. (Shin, D.) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#32

(#32) NOTICE of Consolidation. Signed by Clerk on 3/1/2016.(Perez, J.) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

#33

(#33) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies and for failure to state a claim. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing reset for 3/3/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/2/2016. (Shin, D.) (Entered: 03/02/2016)

#34

(#34) Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Motion Hearing held on 3/3/2016 re 19 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies and for failure to state a claim filed by Eric H. Holder, Jr. Taking under advisement 19 Motion to Dismiss. Total time: 24 minutes(Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Perez, J.) (Entered: 03/03/2016)

#35

(#35) ORDER denying 19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/7/2016. (Shin, D.) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

#36

(#36) NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Rule 16 Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2016 03:30 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Counsel shall call Chambers at 203-579-5562 after all parties are on the line. (Shin, D.) (Entered: 04/15/2016)

#37

(#37) Supplemental REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bucci, Thomas) (Entered: 04/17/2016)

#38

(#38) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/18/2016. Amended Scheduling Order entered. Time: 4 minutes (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Shin, D.) (Entered: 04/18/2016)

#39

(#39) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Answer deadline updated for Loretta E. Lynch to 5/2/2016; Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2016, Discovery due by 1/31/2017, Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/17/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden, Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2017, Joint Trial Memorandum due within 30 days from the date of the ruling on any motion for summary judgment if such motion is filed or by 4/3/2017 if no dispositive motion is filed, Trial Ready Date within 30 days of the filing of the Joint Trial Memorandum. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/18/2016. (Shin, D.) (Entered: 04/18/2016)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Answer deadline updated for Loretta E. Lynch to 5/2/2016; Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2016, Discovery due by 1/31/2017, Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/17/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden, Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2017, Joint Trial Memorandum due within 30 days from the date of the ruling on any motion for summary judgment if such motion is filed or by 4/3/2017 if no dispositive motion is filed, Trial Ready Date within 30 days of the filing of the Joint Trial Memorandum. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/18/2016. (Shin, D.) (Entered: 04/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/18/2016. Amended Scheduling Order entered. Time: 4 minutes (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Shin, D.) (Entered: 04/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Supplemental REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bucci, Thomas) (Entered: 04/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Rule 16 Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2016 03:30 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Counsel shall call Chambers at 203-579-5562 after all parties are on the line. (Shin, D.) (Entered: 04/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) ORDER denying 19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/7/2016. (Shin, D.) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Motion Hearing held on 3/3/2016 re 19 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies and for failure to state a claim filed by Eric H. Holder, Jr. Taking under advisement 19 Motion to Dismiss. Total time: 24 minutes(Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Perez, J.) (Entered: 03/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies and for failure to state a claim. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing reset for 3/3/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/2/2016. (Shin, D.) (Entered: 03/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) NOTICE of Consolidation. Signed by Clerk on 3/1/2016.(Perez, J.) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ORDER granting 29 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/29/2016. (Shin, D.) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies and for failure to state a claim. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing reset for 3/3/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/26/2016. (Shin, D.) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to answer or move to dismiss by Eric H. Holder, Jr. (Folster Lesperance, Karen) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Folster Lesperance on behalf of Eric H. Holder, Jr (Folster Lesperance, Karen) (Entered: 12/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kurt Siuzdak. Eric H. Holder, Jr served on 10/23/2014, answer due 11/13/2014. (Bucci, Thomas) (Entered: 10/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Eric H. Holder, Jr* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Thomas W. Bucci* *Willinger, Willinger & Bucci* *855 Main St.* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Garguilo, B) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 5 Notice, 3 Electronic Filing Order, 4 Protective Order, 1 Complaint filed by Kurt Siuzdak Signed by Clerk on 10/20/2014.(Garguilo, B) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 10/20/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Attachment)(Garguilo, B) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/20/2014.(Garguilo, B) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/20/2014.(Garguilo, B) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 1/20/2015. Amended Pleadings due by 12/19/2014 Discovery due by 4/21/2015 Dispositive Motions due by 5/21/2015 Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/20/2014.(Garguilo, B) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Eric H. Holder, Jr ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-3393613.), filed by Kurt Siuzdak.(Bucci, Thomas) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less