This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2016 at 09:21:27 (UTC).

Sillage LLC v. Histoires de Parfums LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/05/2014 Sillage LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Histoires de Parfums LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block and Judge Christina A. Snyder. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:14-CV-00172

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block

Judge

Judge Christina A. Snyder

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sillage LLC

Defendants

Histoires de Parfums LLC

Scent-Sation LA

P.E., Inc.

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider

Michael R Diliberto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin Klaeb

Attorney at Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth PC

100 Wilshire Blvd Suite 400

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Douglas Quinton Hahn

Attorney at Stradling Yocca Carlson and Rauth PC

100 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 400

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Thomas J Speiss, III

Attorney at Stradling Yocca Carlson and Rauth PC

100 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 440

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Defendant Attorneys

Christian John Martinez

Attorney at Red Bridge Law

1831 Solano Ave, Suite 8341

Berkeley, CA 94707

Kevin W Isaacson

Attorney at Tingley Law Group PC

10 Almaden Boulevard, Suite 430

San Jose, CA 95113

Stephen Douglas Collins

Attorney at Tingley Law Group PC

10 Almaden Boulevard Suite 430

San Jose, CA 95113

Thomas M O'Leary

Attorney at LeClairRyan LLP

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 350

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13336065 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Sillage LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Attorney Thomas J Speiss, III added to party Sillage LLC(pty:pla))(Speiss, Thomas) (Entered: 02/05/2014)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sillage LLC. (Speiss, Thomas) (Entered: 02/05/2014)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Sillage LLC. (Speiss, Thomas) (Entered: 02/05/2014)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sillage LLC, identifying Sillage LLC; Histoires de Parfums LLC; Scent-Sation LA; P.E. Inc.. (Speiss, Thomas) (Entered: 02/05/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (dg) (Entered: 02/06/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (dg) (Entered: 02/06/2014)

#7

(#7) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Sillage LLC. (dg) (Entered: 02/06/2014)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to defendants Histoires de Parfums LLC, P.E., Inc., Scent-Sation LA. (dg) (Entered: 02/06/2014)

#9

(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV13-01994 CAS (RNBx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth and Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV14-00172 CAS (RNBx). Signed by Judge Christina A. Snyder (dro) (Entered: 02/11/2014)

#56

(#56) SCHEDULING NOTICE CONTINUED by Judge Christina A. Snyder previously scheduled for 12/15/2014 at 11:00 AM has been rescheduled to allow the parties time to engage in further settlement discussions. Status Conference re: Settlement is continued to 2/23/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/10/2014)

#57

(#57) STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Sillage LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Speiss, Thomas) (Entered: 12/24/2014)

#58

(#58) STIPULATION for Permanent Injunction as to Moshe, Inc., erroneously sued as Scent-Sation LA filed by Plaintiff Sillage LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Speiss, Thomas) (Entered: 02/13/2015)

#59

(#59) Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from February 23, 2015 to June 1, 2015 filed by Plaintiff Sillage LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Speiss, Thomas) (Entered: 02/13/2015)

#60

(#60) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder, re Stipulation to Continue 59 . The Court accepts the parties Joint Stipulation Continuing Status Conference re: Settlement, and reschedules the Status Conference re: Settlement from February 23, 2015 to June 1, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. (kss) (Entered: 02/18/2015)

#61

(#61) STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL filed by Judge Christina A. Snyder Pursuant to the stipulation between Plaintiff Sillage, LLC (Sillage) and Defendant Moshe, Inc., erroneously sued as Scent-Sation LA. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(d), Moshe, along with its directors shall be and hereby are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED. The COURT ORDERS Sillages claims against Moshe are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs to either party. The court shall retain jurisdiction. (pj) (Entered: 02/18/2015)

#62

(#62) STIPULATION for Permanent Injunction as to Histoires de Parfums, LLC d/b/a Alice & Peter filed by Plaintiff Sillage LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Speiss, Thomas) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

#63

(#63) STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Stipulation 62 , the Court ORDERS that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(d), Histoires de Parfums, LLC, along with its directors, principals, officers, agents, servants, employees, representatives, successors and assigns, and all those persons or entities acting in concert or participation with them, shall be and hereby are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED and restrained from making, using, offering to sell, selling, importing, marketing, or promoting the accused bottles of perfume, which incorporate the issued patents. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), Sillage's claims against Histoires de Parfums LLC are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs to either party. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce this Stipulated Permanent Injunction and Order of Dismissal. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (gk) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

#64

(#64) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Permanent Injunction and Order of Dismissal) (gk) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Permanent Injunction and Order of Dismissal) (gk) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Stipulation 62 , the Court ORDERS that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(d), Histoires de Parfums, LLC, along with its directors, principals, officers, agents, servants, employees, representatives, successors and assigns, and all those persons or entities acting in concert or participation with them, shall be and hereby are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED and restrained from making, using, offering to sell, selling, importing, marketing, or promoting the accused bottles of perfume, which incorporate the issued patents. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), Sillage's claims against Histoires de Parfums LLC are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs to either party. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce this Stipulated Permanent Injunction and Order of Dismissal. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (gk) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) STIPULATION for Permanent Injunction as to Histoires de Parfums, LLC d/b/a Alice & Peter filed by Plaintiff Sillage LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Speiss, Thomas) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL filed by Judge Christina A. Snyder Pursuant to the stipulation between Plaintiff Sillage, LLC (Sillage) and Defendant Moshe, Inc., erroneously sued as Scent-Sation LA. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(d), Moshe, along with its directors shall be and hereby are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED. The COURT ORDERS Sillages claims against Moshe are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs to either party. The court shall retain jurisdiction. (pj) (Entered: 02/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder, re Stipulation to Continue 59 . The Court accepts the parties Joint Stipulation Continuing Status Conference re: Settlement, and reschedules the Status Conference re: Settlement from February 23, 2015 to June 1, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. (kss) (Entered: 02/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from February 23, 2015 to June 1, 2015 filed by Plaintiff Sillage LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Speiss, Thomas) (Entered: 02/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) STIPULATION for Permanent Injunction as to Moshe, Inc., erroneously sued as Scent-Sation LA filed by Plaintiff Sillage LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Speiss, Thomas) (Entered: 02/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Sillage LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Speiss, Thomas) (Entered: 12/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) SCHEDULING NOTICE CONTINUED by Judge Christina A. Snyder previously scheduled for 12/15/2014 at 11:00 AM has been rescheduled to allow the parties time to engage in further settlement discussions. Status Conference re: Settlement is continued to 2/23/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Hearing held and counsel are present. The Court confers with counsel and continues the matter to December 15, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (bp) (Entered: 10/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sillage LLC, upon Defendant Histoires de Parfums LLC served on 2/13/2014, answer due 3/6/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Matthews of The Company Corporation, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Hahn, Douglas) (Entered: 02/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV13-01994 CAS (RNBx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth and Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV14-00172 CAS (RNBx). Signed by Judge Christina A. Snyder (dro) (Entered: 02/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to defendants Histoires de Parfums LLC, P.E., Inc., Scent-Sation LA. (dg) (Entered: 02/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Sillage LLC. (dg) (Entered: 02/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (dg) (Entered: 02/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (dg) (Entered: 02/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sillage LLC, identifying Sillage LLC; Histoires de Parfums LLC; Scent-Sation LA; P.E. Inc.. (Speiss, Thomas) (Entered: 02/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Sillage LLC. (Speiss, Thomas) (Entered: 02/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sillage LLC. (Speiss, Thomas) (Entered: 02/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13336065 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Sillage LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Attorney Thomas J Speiss, III added to party Sillage LLC(pty:pla))(Speiss, Thomas) (Entered: 02/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less