This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2017 at 23:26:22 (UTC).

Shoumin Zhang v. American Franchise Regional Center, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2015 Shoumin Zhang filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against American Franchise Regional Center, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patrick J. Walsh. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-09583

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Walsh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Counter Claimant

Shoumin Zhang

Defendants, Counter Defendants and Counter Claimants

Sidney Wang

Emax Escrow, Inc.

Hu & Associates, LLC

John Deyong Hu

Americana One, LLC

American Franchise Regional Center, LLC

Agnes Yen

Shoumin Zhang

Defendant, Counter Defendant and Intervenor

Americana One, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant, Counter Claimant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Mary M Sun

Attorney at The Law Office of Mary M Sun

317 East Foothill Boulevard Suite 201

Arcadia, CA 91006

Jason Chuan

Attorney at Law Office of Mary Sun

317 E. Foothill Boulevard Suite 203

Arcadia, CA 91006

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Intervenor Attorneys

Jennifer Felten

Attorney at Relaw APC

699 Hampshire Road, Suite 105

Westlake Village, CA 91361

Timothy S Camarena

Attorney at Relaw APC

699 Hampshire Road Suite 105

Westlake Village, CA 91361

Antonio J Gonzalez

Attorney at Gonzalez Law

1295 West Sunset Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90026

Gary M C Wong

Attorney at W and L Law Group LLP

1370 Valley Vista Drive Suite 200

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

Jeffrey C Chiao

Attorney at Jeffrey C Chiao Law Officces

150 North Santa Anita Avenue Suite 300

Arcadia, CA 91006

Defendant, Counter Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Gary M C Wong

Attorney at W and L Law Group LLP

1370 Valley Vista Drive Suite 200

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

Jeffrey C Chiao

Attorney at Jeffrey C Chiao Law Officces

150 North Santa Anita Avenue Suite 300

Arcadia, CA 91006

Mary M Sun

Attorney at The Law Office of Mary M Sun

317 East Foothill Boulevard Suite 201

Arcadia, CA 91006

Jason Chuan

Attorney at Law Office of Mary Sun

317 E. Foothill Boulevard Suite 203

Arcadia, CA 91006

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Antonio J Gonzalez

Attorney at Gonzalez Law

1295 West Sunset Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90026

Gary M C Wong

Attorney at W and L Law Group LLP

1370 Valley Vista Drive Suite 200

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

Mary M Sun

Attorney at The Law Office of Mary M Sun

317 East Foothill Boulevard Suite 201

Arcadia, CA 91006

Jason Chuan

Attorney at Law Office of Mary Sun

317 E. Foothill Boulevard Suite 203

Arcadia, CA 91006

Defendant, Counter Defendant and Intervenor Attorney

Jeffrey C Chiao

Attorney at Jeffrey C Chiao Law Officces

150 North Santa Anita Avenue Suite 300

Arcadia, CA 91006

 

Court Documents

#1

(#10) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Shoumin Zhang (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to First Amended Complaint)(Chuan, Jason) (Entered: 12/29/2015)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibits A and B to Complaint

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shoumin Zhang. (Chuan, Jason) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Shoumin Zhang. (Chuan, Jason) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shoumin Zhang, identifying None. (Chuan, Jason) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

#6

(#6) ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

#7

(#8) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's ex parte application for temporary restraining order #7 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant EMAX ESCROW is enjoined from transferring the $500,000 investment to Defendant Americana One and is ordered to deposit $500,000.00 U.S. Dollars with the Court's registry by 12/23/2015 10:00 AM Pacific. (gk) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

7 #3

Declaration of Jason Chuan

#284

(#284) NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 17-56577 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #283 as to plaintiff Shoumin Zhang. (mat) (Entered: 10/18/2017)

#283

(#283) NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Shoumin Zhang. Appeal of Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Adjudication #186 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20652898.) (Chuan, Jason) (Entered: 10/12/2017)

#186

(#283) NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Shoumin Zhang. Appeal of Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Adjudication #186 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20652898.) (Chuan, Jason) (Entered: 10/12/2017)

#280

(#280) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Stipulation to dismiss pursuant to a settlement agreement filed by Counterclaimant Hu & Associates, LLC.(Gonzalez, Antonio) (Entered: 09/15/2017)

#282

(#282) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE BETWEEN COUNTER-CLAIMANT HU & ASSOCIATES, LLC AND COUNTER-DEFENDANT SHOUMIN ZHAN by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh #280 . SEE ORDER. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (im) (Entered: 09/18/2017)

#281

(#281) STIPULATION for Order dismissal pursuant to settlement agreement filed by Counterclaimant Hu & Associates, LLC.(Gonzalez, Antonio) (Entered: 09/18/2017)

#279

(#279) MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. The matter was called and the parties stated their appearances. Counsel proceed, off the record, with the Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge McDermott. The matter settled. Plaintiff was ordered to file a dismissal promptly. If the dismissal is not filed by Friday, September 15, 2017, the parties MUST appear Monday, September 18 at 10:00a.m. Mr. Hu must personally appear. Court Recorder: CS09/08/2017. (san) (Entered: 09/08/2017)

#278

(#278) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott re Settlement Conference set for 9/8/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. Counter-claimants Hu and Hu & Associates, LLC shall prepare a settlement agreement in accordance with terms agreed at the First Settlement Conference on August 7, 2017 and submit it to Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Shoumin Zhang before the Settlement Conference on September 8, 2017. The parties are to meet and confer on the draft agreement before the Settlement Conference on September 8, 2017. The Court will want an update from Zhang or Zhang's counsel on the time frame for transferring the funds from China, or from other sources, to implement the agreement. (san) (Entered: 09/05/2017)

#277

(#277) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott #273 . The Application fails because it is based on a false premise. The Court's July 21, 2017Order states that "Defendant John Deyong Hu" individually is not to have contact with Plaintiff. [See Order for details.] (san) (Entered: 09/05/2017)

698 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#284) NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 17-56577 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #283 as to plaintiff Shoumin Zhang. (mat) (Entered: 10/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#283) NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Shoumin Zhang. Appeal of Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Adjudication #186 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20652898.) (Chuan, Jason) (Entered: 10/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#282) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE BETWEEN COUNTER-CLAIMANT HU & ASSOCIATES, LLC AND COUNTER-DEFENDANT SHOUMIN ZHAN by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh #280 . SEE ORDER. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (im) (Entered: 09/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#281) STIPULATION for Order dismissal pursuant to settlement agreement filed by Counterclaimant Hu & Associates, LLC.(Gonzalez, Antonio) (Entered: 09/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#280) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Stipulation to dismiss pursuant to a settlement agreement filed by Counterclaimant Hu & Associates, LLC.(Gonzalez, Antonio) (Entered: 09/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#279) MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. The matter was called and the parties stated their appearances. Counsel proceed, off the record, with the Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge McDermott. The matter settled. Plaintiff was ordered to file a dismissal promptly. If the dismissal is not filed by Friday, September 15, 2017, the parties MUST appear Monday, September 18 at 10:00a.m. Mr. Hu must personally appear. Court Recorder: CS09/08/2017. (san) (Entered: 09/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#278) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott re Settlement Conference set for 9/8/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. Counter-claimants Hu and Hu & Associates, LLC shall prepare a settlement agreement in accordance with terms agreed at the First Settlement Conference on August 7, 2017 and submit it to Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Shoumin Zhang before the Settlement Conference on September 8, 2017. The parties are to meet and confer on the draft agreement before the Settlement Conference on September 8, 2017. The Court will want an update from Zhang or Zhang's counsel on the time frame for transferring the funds from China, or from other sources, to implement the agreement. (san) (Entered: 09/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#277) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott #273 . The Application fails because it is based on a false premise. The Court's July 21, 2017Order states that "Defendant John Deyong Hu" individually is not to have contact with Plaintiff. [See Order for details.] (san) (Entered: 09/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#276) DECLARATION of John Deyong Hu In Support of Counterclaimant's Opposition to Counterdefendant's Ex Parte Re Contempt EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause re: Contempt #273 filed by Counter Claimant Hu & Associates, LLC. (Gonzalez, Antonio) (Entered: 09/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#275) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause re: Contempt #273 . The Court requires that John Deyong Hu ("Hu") file a declaration under oath subject to penalty of perjury that he did not send the email to Zhang #270 that is the subject of the Ex Parte Application, that he did not write it, that it was sent without his authorization and knowledge and that the employee who did send it (Hui Tang) was terminated. The Court ORDERS Hu to file the Declaration as soon as possible but no later than Friday, September 1. (san) (Entered: 08/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
264 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Shoumin Zhang (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to First Amended Complaint)(Chuan, Jason) (Entered: 12/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants American Franchise Regional Center, LLC, Americana One, LLC, Emax Escrow, Inc., John Deyong Hu. (jp) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's ex parte application for temporary restraining order #7 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant EMAX ESCROW is enjoined from transferring the $500,000 investment to Defendant Americana One and is ordered to deposit $500,000.00 U.S. Dollars with the Court's registry by 12/23/2015 10:00 AM Pacific. (gk) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Disbursement of Plaintiff's funds held in trust by Defendant Emax Escrow, Inc. and Writ of Attachment, or, in the alternative, Temporary Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Shoumin Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Mary Sun, #3 Declaration of Jason Chuan, #4 Declaration of Shoumin Zhang, #5 Proposed Order) (Chuan, Jason) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shoumin Zhang, identifying None. (Chuan, Jason) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Shoumin Zhang. (Chuan, Jason) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shoumin Zhang. (Chuan, Jason) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16932448 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Shoumin Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B to Complaint) (Attorney Jason Chuan added to party Shoumin Zhang(pty:pla))(Chuan, Jason) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.