This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 07:52:51 (UTC).

Sherwin Williams v. Suse et al

Case Summary

On 02/27/2015 Sherwin Williams filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Suse. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead and Judge Clark Waddoups. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00129

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead

Judge

Judge Clark Waddoups

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sherwin Williams

Defendants

Attachmate Corporation

Suse

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David M. Burkoff

Attorney at HUNTERMACLEAN

200 E Saint Julian St, Po Box 9848

Savannah, GA 31412-0048

Timothy K. Conde

Attorney at STOEL RIVES

201 S Main St Ste 1100

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-4904

Jose A. Abarca

Attorney at STOEL RIVES

201 S Main St Ste 1100

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-4904

Defendant Attorney

Sterling Arthur Brennan

Attorney at MASHOFF BRENNAN

20 Pacifica Ste 1130

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Plaintiff Sherwin Williams is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (bdr) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against Attachmate Corporation, Suse (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2217359), filed by Sherwin Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (Conde, Timothy) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#3

(#3) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Suse. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (eat) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#4

(#4) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Attachmate Corporation. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (eat) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney David M. Burkoff, for Plaintiff Sherwin Williams (bdr) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David M. Burkoff , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-2219888, filed by Plaintiff Sherwin Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Conde, Timothy) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

#7

(#7) DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 3/5/2015. (aw) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting 6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David M. Burkoff for Sherwin Williams. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/6/15. (jmr) (Entered: 03/06/2015)

#9

(#9) Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendants Attachmate Corporation, Suse. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Attorney Sterling Arthur Brennan added to party Attachmate Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Sterling Arthur Brennan added to party Suse(pty:dft)(Brennan, Sterling) (Entered: 03/12/2015)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline updated for Attachmate Corporation answer due 4/3/2015; Suse answer due 4/3/2015.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/16/15. (jmr) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline updated for Attachmate Corporation answer due 4/3/2015; Suse answer due 4/3/2015.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/16/15. (jmr) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendants Attachmate Corporation, Suse. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Attorney Sterling Arthur Brennan added to party Attachmate Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Sterling Arthur Brennan added to party Suse(pty:dft)(Brennan, Sterling) (Entered: 03/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting 6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David M. Burkoff for Sherwin Williams. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/6/15. (jmr) (Entered: 03/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 3/5/2015. (aw) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David M. Burkoff , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-2219888, filed by Plaintiff Sherwin Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Conde, Timothy) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney David M. Burkoff, for Plaintiff Sherwin Williams (bdr) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Attachmate Corporation. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (eat) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Suse. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (eat) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against Attachmate Corporation, Suse (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2217359), filed by Sherwin Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (Conde, Timothy) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Plaintiff Sherwin Williams is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (bdr) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Attachmate Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy K. Conde

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Michael Burkoff