Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:55:24 (UTC).

Sharp v. Bank of America et al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2016 Sharp filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Bank of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is District Judge Henry E. Hudson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:16-CV-00063

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Henry E. Hudson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patty Jo Sharp

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Bank of America

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Trans Union, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig Carley Marchiando

Attorney at Consumer Litigation Associates

763 J Clyde Morris Boulevard, Suite 1A

Newport News, VA 23601

Dale Wood Pittman

Attorney at The Law Office of Dale W. Pittman, P.C.

112-A W Tabb Street

Petersburg, VA 23803-3212

Susan Mary Rotkis

Attorney at Consumer Litigation Associates

763 J Clyde Morris Boulevard, Suite 1A

Newport News, VA 23601

Leonard Anthony Bennett

Attorney at Consumer Litigation Associates

763 J Clyde Morris Boulevard, Suite 1A

Newport News, VA 23601

Defendant Attorneys

John Willard Montgomery, Jr.

Attorney at John W. Montgomery Jr. Attorney PLC

2116 Dabney Rd, Suite A-1

Richmond, VA 23230

Brian Emory Pumphrey

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP (Richmond)

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Robert William McFarland

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

101 W Main St, Suite 9000

Norfolk, VA 23510-1655

Michael Robert Ward

Attorney at Morris & Morris PC

11 South 12Th Street, 5Th Floor, Po Box 30

Richmond, VA 23218

Gibson Sinclair Wright

Attorney at Morris & Morris PC

11 South 12Th Street, 5Th Floor, Po Box 30

Richmond, VA 23218

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bank of America, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC (Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 34683031963), filed by Patty Jo Sharp. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Letter, # 3 Receipt (nbrow) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#2

(#2) Summonses Issued as to Bank of America, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC. Clerk mailed to attorney as requested. (nbrow) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Compliance by Patty Jo Sharp. Bank of America served on 02/19/2016, Answer due 03/11/2016. (walk, ) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patty Jo Sharp; Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 2/12/2016, answer due 3/4/2016; and Trans Union, LLC served on 2/12/2016, answer due 3/4/2016. (Attachment: # 1 Letter). (sbea, ) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Carley Marchiando on behalf of Patty Jo Sharp (Marchiando, Craig) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

#6

(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Bank of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McFarland, Robert) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#7

(#7) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Bank of America. (McFarland, Robert) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#8

(#8) AGREED ORDER granting Defendant Bank of America's 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File its responsive pleadings to the Complaint on or before March 18, 2016, which shall be deemed timely filed. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 2/29/16. (jtho, ) (jtho, ) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Montgomery, John) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

#12

(#12) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Trans Union, LLC. (Wright, Gibson) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Robert Ward on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Ward, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice ONLY as to Defendant, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Patty Jo Sharp. (Bennett, Leonard). Modified docket entry on 03/07/2016. (walk, ). (Entered: 03/07/2016)

#15

(#15) ORDER re 14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. It is HEREBY ORDERED that Experian Information Solutions, Inc., is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 03/07/2016. (ccol, ) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patty Jo Sharp. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 02/29/2016, Answer due 03/21/2016. (Attachment: # 1 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiff). (walk, ) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Bank of America.(McFarland, Robert) (Entered: 03/18/2016)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Emory Pumphrey on behalf of Bank of America (Pumphrey, Brian) (Entered: 03/21/2016)

#19

(#19) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2016 at 9:05 AM in Richmond Courtroom 6300 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz) (Entered: 04/06/2016)

#20

(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment # 1 Pretrial Schedule A (signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 4/6/2016) (rpiz) (Entered: 04/06/2016)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment # 1 Pretrial Schedule A (signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 4/6/2016) (rpiz) (Entered: 04/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2016 at 9:05 AM in Richmond Courtroom 6300 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz) (Entered: 04/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Emory Pumphrey on behalf of Bank of America (Pumphrey, Brian) (Entered: 03/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Bank of America.(McFarland, Robert) (Entered: 03/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patty Jo Sharp. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 02/29/2016, Answer due 03/21/2016. (Attachment: # 1 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiff). (walk, ) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER re 14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. It is HEREBY ORDERED that Experian Information Solutions, Inc., is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 03/07/2016. (ccol, ) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice ONLY as to Defendant, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Patty Jo Sharp. (Bennett, Leonard). Modified docket entry on 03/07/2016. (walk, ). (Entered: 03/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Robert Ward on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Ward, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Trans Union, LLC. (Wright, Gibson) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Trans Union, LLC.(Wright, Gibson) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Montgomery, John) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Montgomery, John) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AGREED ORDER granting Defendant Bank of America's 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File its responsive pleadings to the Complaint on or before March 18, 2016, which shall be deemed timely filed. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 2/29/16. (jtho, ) (jtho, ) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Bank of America. (McFarland, Robert) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Bank of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McFarland, Robert) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Carley Marchiando on behalf of Patty Jo Sharp (Marchiando, Craig) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patty Jo Sharp; Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 2/12/2016, answer due 3/4/2016; and Trans Union, LLC served on 2/12/2016, answer due 3/4/2016. (Attachment: # 1 Letter). (sbea, ) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Compliance by Patty Jo Sharp. Bank of America served on 02/19/2016, Answer due 03/11/2016. (walk, ) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summonses Issued as to Bank of America, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC. Clerk mailed to attorney as requested. (nbrow) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Bank of America, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC (Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 34683031963), filed by Patty Jo Sharp. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Letter, # 3 Receipt (nbrow) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant