This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2016 at 15:24:46 (UTC).

SHAPIRO v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY

Case Summary

On 01/08/2014 SHAPIRO filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Christopher R. Cooper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00019

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Christopher R. Cooper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO

Defendants

NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY

DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE

DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Louis Light

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JEFFREY LIGHT

1712 Eye Street, Nw, Suite 915

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorneys

William Mark Nebeker

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Damon William Taaffe

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Marsha Wellknown Yee

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Mercedeh Momeni

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

555 Fourth Street, Nw, Room E-4412

Washington, DC 20530

Robin Michelle Meriweather

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

555 Fourth Street, Nw, 11-909

Washington, DC 20814

Timothy E. Broomhead

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#9

#50

#51

#52

#53

#54

#55

#56

#57

#58

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) MEMORANDUM OPINION re 36 the CIA's Motion to Dismiss, 37 the NSA's Motion for Summary Judgment, 47 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/17/2016. (lccrc2) (Entered: 03/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) ORDER denying 36 the CIA's Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 37 the NSA's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/17/2016. (lccrc2) (Entered: 03/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Marsha W. Yee (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 03/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Marsha W. Yee (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 03/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Damon W. Taaffe (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) REPLY to opposition to motion re 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to NSA, 47 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to NSA filed by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy E. Broomhead on behalf of All Defendants (Broomhead, Timothy) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY filed by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Summons DOD, # 4 Summons DOJ, # 5 Summons NSA)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 03/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 03/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, (or Otherwise Answer) by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 02/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedeh Momeni on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 02/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 1/28/2014 (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/9/2014. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/8/2014.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/9/2014. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (3) Issued as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(kb) (Entered: 01/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3584971) filed by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - FOIA Request to CIA, # 2 Exhibit 1A - FOIA Request attachments, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons CIA, # 5 Summons USAO, # 6 Summons USDOJ)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Security Agency NSA is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE is a litigant

Latest cases where Department of Justice is a litigant

Latest cases where Central Intelligence Agency Inc. is a litigant