This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 07:22:34 (UTC).

Shaf-Land, L.L.C. v. Sunbelt Chemicals Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2015 Shaf-Land, L L C filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sunbelt Chemicals Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes and Judge James J. Brady. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-00588

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes

Judge

Judge James J. Brady

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Shaf-Land, L.L.C.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

AIG Specialty Insurance Company

Sunbelt Chemicals Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Phillip E. Foco

Attorney at Bienvenu Bonnecaze Foco Viator & Holinga, APLLC

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Patrick Hayes Hunt

Attorney at Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator & Holinga

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Robert I. Siegel

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC - NO

701 Poydras Street, Suite - 4800 One Shell Square

New Orleans, LA 70139

Alistair Ward

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC - NO

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139

Mary Wilderotter Dale

Attorney at Chaffe McCall, LLP

8550 United Plaza Blvd, Suite 103

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Andrew Parr Sellers, Jr.

Attorney at Powers, Sellers & Chapoton, LLP

P. O. Box 15948, 7967 Office Park Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70895

Scott Cameron Barney

Attorney at Chaffe McCall, LLP - BR

8550 United Plaza Blvd., Suite103

Baton Rouge, LA 70809-2256

Steven Howard Watterson

Attorney at Powers, Sellers, & Chapoton, LLP

P.O. Box 15948, 7967 Office Park Boulevard

Baton Rouge, LA 70895

 

Court Documents

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Attachment

#1

No Description Available

#2

(#2) Certificate of Filing NOTICE of Removal by Sunbelt Chemicals Corp. re 1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: # 1 Attachment State Court Proceedings Notice of Removal)(Barney, Scott) Modified on 9/4/2015 to rotate attachment and edit text (LLH). (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#3

(#3) 90 DAY CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2015 at 9:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger. Status Report due by 11/25/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/9/2015. (SGO) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 1 Notice of Removal, by AIG Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Siegel, Robert) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. AIG Specialty Insurance Company and Sunbelt Chemicals Corp. responsive pleading to the [1-2] Petition for Damages and Breach of Constract due by 10/1/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/10/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Riedlinger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

#6

(#6) Counter Claim/Answer by Sunbelt Chemicals Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Verification)(Barney, Scott) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR DAMAGES AND BREACH OF CONTRACT by AIG Specialty Insurance Company.(Siegel, Robert) (Entered: 10/01/2015)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AIG Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for AIG Specialty Insurance Company. (Siegel, Robert) (Entered: 10/01/2015)

#9

(#9) Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Sunbelt Chemical Corporation's Counterclaim by Shaf-Land, L.L.C.. (Hunt, Patrick) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION to Substitute Andrew P. Sellers, Jr. and Steven H. Watterson in place of Scott C. Barney and Mary W. Dale as Attorney by Sunbelt Chemicals Corp.. (Watterson, Steven) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

#12

(#12) STATUS REPORT by Shaf-Land, L.L.C.. (Foco, Phillip) Modified on 12/4/2015 to substitute document per 14 Order (BCL). (Entered: 12/03/2015)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting 13 Joint Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Joint Status Report. The clerk of court will substitute the [13-2] Status Report submitted with the motion for the 12 Status Report previously filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/3/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Riedlinger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/03/2015)

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2016. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 1/29/2016. Discovery due by 8/15/2016. Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 7/15/2016. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 8/15/2016. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 9/15/2016. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 10/14/2016. Discovery from Experts due by 12/15/2016. Motions shall be filed by 2/15/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/15/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2017 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge James J. Brady. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 7/14/2017. Responses to Motions In Limine shall be filed by 8/4/2017. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 8/11/2017. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 8/18/2017. Jury Trial set for 9/11/2017 - 9/15/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge James J. Brady. The scheduling conference set for December 10, 2015 is canceled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/4/2015. (BCL) (Entered: 12/04/2015)

#16

(#16) NOTICE: Pursuant to General Order 2016-02, this case is reassigned from Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger to Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 01/04/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(NLT ADI, ) (Entered: 01/06/2016)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE: Pursuant to General Order 2016-02, this case is reassigned from Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger to Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 01/04/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(NLT ADI, ) (Entered: 01/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2016. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 1/29/2016. Discovery due by 8/15/2016. Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 7/15/2016. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 8/15/2016. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 9/15/2016. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 10/14/2016. Discovery from Experts due by 12/15/2016. Motions shall be filed by 2/15/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/15/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2017 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge James J. Brady. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 7/14/2017. Responses to Motions In Limine shall be filed by 8/4/2017. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 8/11/2017. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 8/18/2017. Jury Trial set for 9/11/2017 - 9/15/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge James J. Brady. The scheduling conference set for December 10, 2015 is canceled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/4/2015. (BCL) (Entered: 12/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting 13 Joint Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Joint Status Report. The clerk of court will substitute the [13-2] Status Report submitted with the motion for the 12 Status Report previously filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/3/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Riedlinger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Joint MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute 12 STATUS REPORT by Shaf-Land, L.L.C.. (Foco, Phillip) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Order, # 2 Attachment Joint Status Report)(Foco, Phillip) Modified to edit text on 12/4/2015 (BCL). (Entered: 12/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STATUS REPORT by Shaf-Land, L.L.C.. (Foco, Phillip) Modified on 12/4/2015 to substitute document per 14 Order (BCL). (Entered: 12/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting 10 Motion and Order to Substitute Counsel of Record. Andrew P. Sellers, Jr., and Steven H. Watterson added as attorneys for Sunbelt Chemicals Corp., replacing Scott C. Barney and Mary W. Dale. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/1./2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Riedlinger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint MOTION to Substitute Andrew P. Sellers, Jr. and Steven H. Watterson in place of Scott C. Barney and Mary W. Dale as Attorney by Sunbelt Chemicals Corp.. (Watterson, Steven) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Sunbelt Chemical Corporation's Counterclaim by Shaf-Land, L.L.C.. (Hunt, Patrick) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AIG Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for AIG Specialty Insurance Company. (Siegel, Robert) (Entered: 10/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR DAMAGES AND BREACH OF CONTRACT by AIG Specialty Insurance Company.(Siegel, Robert) (Entered: 10/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Counter Claim/Answer by Sunbelt Chemicals Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Verification)(Barney, Scott) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. AIG Specialty Insurance Company and Sunbelt Chemicals Corp. responsive pleading to the [1-2] Petition for Damages and Breach of Constract due by 10/1/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/10/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Riedlinger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 1 Notice of Removal, by AIG Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Siegel, Robert) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) 90 DAY CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2015 at 9:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger. Status Report due by 11/25/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/9/2015. (SGO) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Filing NOTICE of Removal by Sunbelt Chemicals Corp. re 1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: # 1 Attachment State Court Proceedings Notice of Removal)(Barney, Scott) Modified on 9/4/2015 to rotate attachment and edit text (LLH). (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th JDC, Case Number 1042334. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1285228), filed by Sunbelt Chemicals Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Barney, Scott) (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/4/2015) (ELW). (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/4/2015) (ELW). Modified on 9/4/2015 to correct page orientations.(ELW). (Entered: 09/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less