This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 15:12:16 (UTC).

Seville Classics, Inc. v. Neatfreak Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2015 Seville Classics, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Neatfreak Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-06237

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge S. James Otero

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Seville Classics, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Neatfreak Group Corp.

Neatfreak Group, Inc.

Target Corporation

Does

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Heather F Auyang

Attorney at Lee Tran and Liang LLP

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 3900

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Lauren C Sliger

Attorney at Lee Tran and Liang LLP

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 3900

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Paul A Stewart

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson and Bear LLP

2040 Main Street 14Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Ali Razai

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson and Bear LLP

2040 Main Street 14Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

David Gee Kim

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson and Bear LLP

2040 Main Street 14Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Enoch H Liang

Attorney at Lee Tran and Liang LLP

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 3900

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Lisa J Chin

Attorney at Lee Tran and Liang LLP

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 3900

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jonathan S Goodman

Attorney at Patzik Frank and Samotny Ltd

150 South Wacker Drive Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60606

Russell Matthew Selmont

Attorney at Ervin Cohen and Jessup LLP

9401 Wilshire Boulevard 9Th Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Jordan Herzog

Attorney at Patzik Frank and Samotny Ltd

150 South Wacker Drive Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16277772 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5) (Attorney Enoch H Liang added to party Seville Classics, Inc.(pty:pla))(Liang, Enoch) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc.. (Liang, Enoch) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc.. (Liang, Enoch) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc., (Liang, Enoch) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Seville Classics, Inc.. (Liang, Enoch) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc. (Liang, Enoch) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jp) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants Neatfreak Group Corp., Neatfreak Group, Inc., Target Corporation. (jp) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#53

(#53) MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Count II of NeatFreak's First Amended Counterclaim NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike NeatFreak's Inequitable Conduct Defense Amended Answer to Complaint 51 , Amended Counterclaim 44 52 filed by Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc.. (Stewart, Paul) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#52

(#52) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Count II of NeatFreak's First Amended Counterclaim , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike NeatFreak's Inequitable Conduct Defense Amended Answer to Complaint 51 , Amended Counterclaim 44 filed by Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/28/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Stewart, Paul) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#51

(#51) AMENDED ANSWER (First Amended Affirmative Defenses) to Amended Complaint/Petition, 13 filed by Defendants Neatfreak Group Corp., Neatfreak Group, Inc.. (Herzog, Jordan) (Entered: 02/15/2016)

#50

(#50) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE FIRST AMENDED AFFIRMATIVEDEFENSES 49 by Judge S. James Otero: Defendants Neatfreak Group Corp. and Neatfreak Group, Inc. are hereby granted leave to file their First Affirmative Defenses in compliance with this Courts electronic filing rules by February 19, 2016. (lc) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#49

(#49) Joint STIPULATION to AMEND Answer to Complaint, 27 filed by Defendants Neatfreak Group Corp., Neatfreak Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Herzog, Jordan) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#48

(#48) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Gee Kim on behalf of Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc. (Attorney David Gee Kim added to party Seville Classics, Inc.(pty:pla))(Kim, David) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

#47

(#47) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Paul A Stewart on behalf of Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc. (Attorney Paul A Stewart added to party Seville Classics, Inc.(pty:pla))(Stewart, Paul) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

#46

(#46) SCHEDULING NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge S. James Otero. On the Court's own motion the Scheduling Conference set for hearing on 2/29/16 is continued to 4/4/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. The parties shall file the joint status report by March 21, 2016.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/11/2016)

#45

(#45) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B), a defendant is authorized to amend its counterclaims once as a matter of course within 21 days after service of a Rule12 motion. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B). Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc. filed a Motion to Dismiss Netfreak's Inequitable Conduct Counterclaim and Strike the Corresponding Defense on January 20, 2016. (Mot. to Dismiss Netfreak's Inequitable Conduct Countercl., ECF No. 36.) Defendants Netfreak Group Corp. and Netfreak Group Inc. ("Netfreak") filed their Joint First Amended Counterclaims ("Amended Counterclaims") on February 10, 2016. (Defs.' Joint First Am. Counterclaims, ECF No. 44.) Thus, Netfreak's Amended Counterclaims were filed within the 21-day period provided by Rule 15(a)(1)(B). The Court accordingly deems the Amended Counterclaims timely filed, and DISMISSES AS MOOT Seville's Motion 36 . Seville has 14 days to respond to the Amended Counterclaims. (lc) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Count II of NeatFreak's First Amended Counterclaim NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike NeatFreak's Inequitable Conduct Defense Amended Answer to Complaint 51 , Amended Counterclaim 44 52 filed by Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc.. (Stewart, Paul) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Count II of NeatFreak's First Amended Counterclaim , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike NeatFreak's Inequitable Conduct Defense Amended Answer to Complaint 51 , Amended Counterclaim 44 filed by Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/28/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Stewart, Paul) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) AMENDED ANSWER (First Amended Affirmative Defenses) to Amended Complaint/Petition, 13 filed by Defendants Neatfreak Group Corp., Neatfreak Group, Inc.. (Herzog, Jordan) (Entered: 02/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE FIRST AMENDED AFFIRMATIVEDEFENSES 49 by Judge S. James Otero: Defendants Neatfreak Group Corp. and Neatfreak Group, Inc. are hereby granted leave to file their First Affirmative Defenses in compliance with this Courts electronic filing rules by February 19, 2016. (lc) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) Joint STIPULATION to AMEND Answer to Complaint, 27 filed by Defendants Neatfreak Group Corp., Neatfreak Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Herzog, Jordan) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Gee Kim on behalf of Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc. (Attorney David Gee Kim added to party Seville Classics, Inc.(pty:pla))(Kim, David) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Paul A Stewart on behalf of Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc. (Attorney Paul A Stewart added to party Seville Classics, Inc.(pty:pla))(Stewart, Paul) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) SCHEDULING NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge S. James Otero. On the Court's own motion the Scheduling Conference set for hearing on 2/29/16 is continued to 4/4/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. The parties shall file the joint status report by March 21, 2016.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B), a defendant is authorized to amend its counterclaims once as a matter of course within 21 days after service of a Rule12 motion. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B). Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc. filed a Motion to Dismiss Netfreak's Inequitable Conduct Counterclaim and Strike the Corresponding Defense on January 20, 2016. (Mot. to Dismiss Netfreak's Inequitable Conduct Countercl., ECF No. 36.) Defendants Netfreak Group Corp. and Netfreak Group Inc. ("Netfreak") filed their Joint First Amended Counterclaims ("Amended Counterclaims") on February 10, 2016. (Defs.' Joint First Am. Counterclaims, ECF No. 44.) Thus, Netfreak's Amended Counterclaims were filed within the 21-day period provided by Rule 15(a)(1)(B). The Court accordingly deems the Amended Counterclaims timely filed, and DISMISSES AS MOOT Seville's Motion 36 . Seville has 14 days to respond to the Amended Counterclaims. (lc) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) First AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc. amending Amended Complaint/Petition, 13 ; JURY DEMAND, filed by Defendants Neatfreak Group Corp., Neatfreak Group, Inc.(Herzog, Jordan) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; AND REFER TO JUDGES PROCEDURES AND SCHEDULES FOR DETAILED INSTRUCTIONS RE SUBMISSION OF SEALED DOCUMENTS, EXCLUDING THOSE SUBMITTED BY PRO SE PARTIES AND IN CAMERA FILINGS) (lc) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants Neatfreak Group Corp., Neatfreak Group, Inc., Target Corporation. (jp) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jp) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc. (Liang, Enoch) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Seville Classics, Inc.. (Liang, Enoch) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc., (Liang, Enoch) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc.. (Liang, Enoch) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc.. (Liang, Enoch) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16277772 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Seville Classics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5) (Attorney Enoch H Liang added to party Seville Classics, Inc.(pty:pla))(Liang, Enoch) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less