This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2016 at 11:10:59 (UTC).

Sell It Social, LLC v. Acumen Brands, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/14/2014 Sell It Social, LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Acumen Brands, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Richard M. Berman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-03491

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Richard M. Berman

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

Sell It Social, LLC

Counter Claimant

Acumen Brands, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Peter Stuart Dawson

Christopher George Renner

Edward John Normand

Nathan Andrew Holcomb

Richard A. Feinstein

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Aidan John Synnott

Gregory A. Clarick

Isaac Berkman Zaur

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (lcu) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Acumen Brands, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465407008554)Document filed by Sell It Social, LLC.(lcu) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (lcu) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sell It Social, LLC.(Dawson, Peter) (Entered: 05/20/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aidan John Synnott on behalf of Acumen Brands, Inc.. (Synnott, Aidan) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

#6

(#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Atlantic (Acumen) LLC for Acumen Brands, Inc.. Document filed by Acumen Brands, Inc..(Synnott, Aidan) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

#7

(#7) LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Aidan Synnott dated 06/06/2014 re: Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Acumen Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Tab A, # 2 Tab B)(Synnott, Aidan) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

#8

(#8) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 7 Letter filed by Acumen Brands, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff may respond by letter (3 page, double spaced) by 6/16/2014. A conference is hereby scheduled for 6/26/2014 @ 11:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 6/26/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/9/2014) (ja) (Entered: 06/09/2014)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. All Defendants. Service was accepted by Terry Turpin, COO. Document filed by Sell It Social, LLC. (Dawson, Peter) (Entered: 06/16/2014)

#40

(#40) LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Peter S. Dawson dated April 27, 2015 re: Discovery and Case Management Plan. Document filed by Sell It Social, LLC.(Dawson, Peter) (Entered: 04/27/2015)

#41

(#41) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: All discovery to be expeditiously completed by Sept 10, 2015 (fact and expert). Refer all discovery disputes/questions to J. Maas. Parties to engage in good faith settlement talks prior to Sept. conference. Fact Discovery due by 9/10/2015. Expert Discovery due by 9/10/2015. Discovery due by 9/10/2015. Settlement Conference set for 9/10/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 4/30/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

#42

(#42) ANSWER to 39 Counterclaim. Document filed by Sell It Social, LLC.(Dawson, Peter) (Entered: 05/14/2015)

#43

(#43) MOTION for Edward Normand, Richard Feinstein, Christopher Renner and Nathan Holcomb to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Sell It Social, LLC.(Normand, Edward) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

#44

(#44) DECLARATION of Edward Normand in Support re: 43 MOTION for Edward Normand, Richard Feinstein, Christopher Renner and Nathan Holcomb to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Sell It Social, LLC. (Normand, Edward) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

#45

(#45) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 43 MOTION for Edward Normand, Richard Feinstein, Christopher Renner and Nathan Holcomb to Withdraw as Attorney . filed by Sell It Social, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: A conference will be held regarding this matter on 6/16/15 @ 9:00. All counsel should attend. (Status Conference set for 6/16/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/1/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

#46

(#46) LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Edward Normand dated June 1, 2015 re: conference scheduled for June 16, 2015. Document filed by Sell It Social, LLC.(Normand, Edward) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

#47

(#47) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 46 Letter filed by Sell It Social, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Mr. Normand to appear in person for conference. Other Boies Schiller attorneys need not appear. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/1/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

#48

(#48) DISCOVERY CONFIDENTIALITY AND NON-DISCLOSURE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman, on consent, on 6/25/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 06/26/2015)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) DISCOVERY CONFIDENTIALITY AND NON-DISCLOSURE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman, on consent, on 6/25/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 06/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 46 Letter filed by Sell It Social, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Mr. Normand to appear in person for conference. Other Boies Schiller attorneys need not appear. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/1/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Edward Normand dated June 1, 2015 re: conference scheduled for June 16, 2015. Document filed by Sell It Social, LLC.(Normand, Edward) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 43 MOTION for Edward Normand, Richard Feinstein, Christopher Renner and Nathan Holcomb to Withdraw as Attorney . filed by Sell It Social, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: A conference will be held regarding this matter on 6/16/15 @ 9:00. All counsel should attend. (Status Conference set for 6/16/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/1/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) DECLARATION of Edward Normand in Support re: 43 MOTION for Edward Normand, Richard Feinstein, Christopher Renner and Nathan Holcomb to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Sell It Social, LLC. (Normand, Edward) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) MOTION for Edward Normand, Richard Feinstein, Christopher Renner and Nathan Holcomb to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Sell It Social, LLC.(Normand, Edward) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ANSWER to 39 Counterclaim. Document filed by Sell It Social, LLC.(Dawson, Peter) (Entered: 05/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: All discovery to be expeditiously completed by Sept 10, 2015 (fact and expert). Refer all discovery disputes/questions to J. Maas. Parties to engage in good faith settlement talks prior to Sept. conference. Fact Discovery due by 9/10/2015. Expert Discovery due by 9/10/2015. Discovery due by 9/10/2015. Settlement Conference set for 9/10/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 4/30/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Peter S. Dawson dated April 27, 2015 re: Discovery and Case Management Plan. Document filed by Sell It Social, LLC.(Dawson, Peter) (Entered: 04/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) ANSWER to 25 Amended Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Sell It Social, LLC. Document filed by Acumen Brands, Inc..(Zaur, Isaac) (Entered: 04/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Peter S. Dawson dated June 16, 2014 re: Response to Defendant's June 6 Correspondence advising as to intention to move to dismiss and requesting a Pre-Motion Conference.. Document filed by Sell It Social, LLC.(Dawson, Peter) (Entered: 06/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. All Defendants. Service was accepted by Terry Turpin, COO. Document filed by Sell It Social, LLC. (Dawson, Peter) (Entered: 06/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 7 Letter filed by Acumen Brands, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff may respond by letter (3 page, double spaced) by 6/16/2014. A conference is hereby scheduled for 6/26/2014 @ 11:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 6/26/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/9/2014) (ja) (Entered: 06/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Aidan Synnott dated 06/06/2014 re: Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Acumen Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Tab A, # 2 Tab B)(Synnott, Aidan) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Atlantic (Acumen) LLC for Acumen Brands, Inc.. Document filed by Acumen Brands, Inc..(Synnott, Aidan) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aidan John Synnott on behalf of Acumen Brands, Inc.. (Synnott, Aidan) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sell It Social, LLC.(Dawson, Peter) (Entered: 05/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (lcu) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Acumen Brands, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465407008554)Document filed by Sell It Social, LLC.(lcu) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (lcu) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sell It Social, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard A. Feinstein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan Andrew Holcomb

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward John Normand