This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 23:56:34 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commission v. Blackburn et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2015 Securities and Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Blackburn. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-02451

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Carl Barbier

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendants

Treaty Energy Corporation

Lee C. Schlesinger

Ronald L Blackburn

Michael A Mulshine

Andrew V Reid

Samuel E Whitley

Bruce A Gwyn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jessica B Magee

Attorney at United Sates Securities and Exchange Commission

801 Cherry Street, Ste 1900

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Jennifer Dianne Brandt

Attorney at U. S. Securities and Exchange Commission (Ft. Worth)

Suite 1900, 801 Cherry St.

Fort Worth, TX 76102-6882

Chris Davis

Attorney at U. S. Securities and Exchange Commission (Ft. Worth)

Suite 1900, 801 Cherry St.

Fort Worth, TX 76102-6882

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Lewis Kramer

Attorney at Andrew L. Kramer, LLC

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 2504

New Orleans, LA 70170

Jeffrey J Ansley

Attorney at Bell Nunnally & Martin LLP - Dallas

3232 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75204-2429

Gregory D. Kelminson

Attorney at Bell Nunnally & Martin, LLP

3232 Mckinney Ave., Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75204-2429

Henry L. Klein

Attorney at Henry L. Klein, Attorney at Law

844 Baronne St.

New Orleans, LA 70113-1103

Robert Michael Corn

Attorney at Law Office of Robert M. Corn

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Ronald L Blackburn. (baf, ) [Transferred from txed on 7/6/2015.] (Entered: 12/15/2014)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Parties (Magee, Jessica) [Transferred from txed on 7/6/2015.] (Entered: 12/15/2014)

#99

(#99) SEALED ORDER granting MOTION for Leave to File Motion Under Seal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that any responses or replies to the SEC's Motion to Leave or Motion to Compel shall be filed under seal. (gec) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Lee C Schlesinger. (baf, ) [Transferred from txed on 7/6/2015.] (Entered: 12/15/2014)

#97

(#97) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Brandt, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/01/2015)

#96

(#96) ORDER & REASONS. It is ORDERED that Defendant's 90 Motion to Strike Pursuant to Rule 12(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is DENIED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Bruce A Gwyn. (baf, ) [Transferred from txed on 7/6/2015.] (Entered: 12/15/2014)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Samuel E Whitley. (baf, ) [Transferred from txed on 7/6/2015.] (Entered: 12/15/2014)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Treaty Energy Corporation. (baf, ) [Transferred from txed on 7/6/2015.] (Entered: 12/15/2014)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Michael A Mulshine. (baf, ) [Transferred from txed on 7/6/2015.] (Entered: 12/15/2014)

#103

(#103) ORDER granting 102 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 97 Amended Complaint as to Lee C. Schlesinger; answer due 10/22/2015. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/9/15. (sek) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

#102

(#102) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re 97 Amended Complaint by Lee C. Schlesinger. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kelminson, Gregory) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#104

(#104) SEALED Opposition to Motion to Compel and for Protective Order. (gec) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

#100

(#100) SEALED MOTION to Compel and for Protective Order. (gec) Modified on 10/5/2015 (gec). (Entered: 10/02/2015)

#101

(#101) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 100 SEALED MOTION to Compel and for Protective Order. Notice of Submission incorrectly reflects that motion is set before Judge Carl Barbier. Motion is set for submission on 10/21/2015 before Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (gec) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

#98

(#98) SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Motion Under Seal. (gec) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew V Reid. (baf, ) [Transferred from txed on 7/6/2015.] (Entered: 12/15/2014)

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#104) SEALED Opposition to Motion to Compel and for Protective Order. (gec) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) ORDER granting 102 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 97 Amended Complaint as to Lee C. Schlesinger; answer due 10/22/2015. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/9/15. (sek) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re 97 Amended Complaint by Lee C. Schlesinger. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kelminson, Gregory) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 100 SEALED MOTION to Compel and for Protective Order. Notice of Submission incorrectly reflects that motion is set before Judge Carl Barbier. Motion is set for submission on 10/21/2015 before Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (gec) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) SEALED MOTION to Compel and for Protective Order. (gec) Modified on 10/5/2015 (gec). (Entered: 10/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) SEALED ORDER granting MOTION for Leave to File Motion Under Seal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that any responses or replies to the SEC's Motion to Leave or Motion to Compel shall be filed under seal. (gec) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Motion Under Seal. (gec) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Brandt, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) ORDER & REASONS. It is ORDERED that Defendant's 90 Motion to Strike Pursuant to Rule 12(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is DENIED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#95) ORDER granting 93 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Chris Davis for Securities and Exchange Commission. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/16/15. (sek) (Entered: 09/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Andrew L Kramer on behalf of Treaty Energy Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5001259. (Kramer, Andrew) [Transferred from txed on 7/6/2015.] (Entered: 01/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew V Reid. (baf, ) [Transferred from txed on 7/6/2015.] (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Treaty Energy Corporation. (baf, ) [Transferred from txed on 7/6/2015.] (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Samuel E Whitley. (baf, ) [Transferred from txed on 7/6/2015.] (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Lee C Schlesinger. (baf, ) [Transferred from txed on 7/6/2015.] (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Michael A Mulshine. (baf, ) [Transferred from txed on 7/6/2015.] (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Bruce A Gwyn. (baf, ) [Transferred from txed on 7/6/2015.] (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Ronald L Blackburn. (baf, ) [Transferred from txed on 7/6/2015.] (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Parties (Magee, Jessica) [Transferred from txed on 7/6/2015.] (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Magee, Jessica) [Transferred from txed on 7/6/2015.] (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.