This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/25/2020 at 06:21:22 (UTC).

Script Security Solutions, L.L.C. v. ADT LLC

Case Summary

On 03/13/2015 Script Security Solutions, L L C filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ADT LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William C. Bryson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00369

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C. Bryson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Consolidated Counter Defendant, Counter Defendant and Consolidated Plaintiff

Script Security Solutions, L.L.C.

Defendant

ADT LLC

Counter Claimants and Consolidated Defendants

FrontPoint Security Solutions, LLC

Monitronics International, Inc.

Protection One Alarm Monitoring, Inc.

AT&T Digital Life, Inc.

Consolidated Defendants and Counter Claimants

DIRECTV, LLC

FrontPoint Security Solutions, LLC

Lifeshield Security LLC

Comcast Broadband Security, LLC

Monitronics International, Inc.

DirecTV Group, Inc., The

Protection One Alarm Monitoring, Inc.

LifeShield LLC

AT&T Digital Life, Inc.

CenturyTel Security Systems, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

David Folsom

Texarkana, TX 75503

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Consolidated Counter Defendant, Counter Defendant and Consolidated Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew J Antonelli

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Ste 450

Houston, TX 77006

Zachariah Harrington

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Ste 450

Houston, TX 77006

Califf Teal Cooper

Attorney at OSHA Liang LLP

Two Houston Center, 909 Fannin, Suite 3500

Houston, TX 77010

Defendant Attorneys

Ranjini Acharya

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP - Palo Alto

2550 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Jackson Ho

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP - Palo Alto

630 Hansen Way

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Jennifer Klein Ayers

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP - Dallas

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2400

Dallas, TX 75201

Consolidated Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Carlos Perez-Albuerne

Attorney at Choate Hall & Stewart LLP

Two International Place

Boston, MA 02110

Margaret E Ives

Attorney at Choate Hall & Stewart LLP

Two International Place

Boston, MA 02110

Andy Tindel

Attorney at Mann, Tindel & Thompson - Attorneys at Law

112 E Line, Suite 304

Tyler, TX 75702

Neil J McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Bret Thomas Winterle

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Harry Lee Gillam, Jr

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Thomas W Sankey

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP - Houston

1330 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 800

Houston, TX 77056

Daniel J Goettle

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP - Philadelphia

Cira Centre - 12Th Floor, 2929 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19104

John M Jackson

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP - Dallas

2323 Ross Ave., Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael E Jones

Attorney at Potter Minton, a Professional Corporation

110 N College Avenue, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Melissa L Hotze

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP - Houston

700 Louisiana Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Allen Franklin Gardner

Attorney at Allen Gardner Law, PLLC

609 South Fannin

Tyler, TX 75701

Matthew Christopher Gaudet

Attorney at Duane Morris - Atlanta

1075 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 2000

Atlanta, GA 30309-3929

Not Classified By Court Attorney

David Folsom

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

6002-B Summerfield Drive

Texarkana, TX 75503

28 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#117

#116

#115

#114

113 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#113

#112

95 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#95

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

162 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 06/27/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) GENERAL ORDER 15-23 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William C. Bryson for all further proceedings. Judge Rodney Gilstrap no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/15/2015. (ch, ) Modified on 12/17/2015 (ch, ). (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) ORDER granting #113 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/30/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #95 MOTION to Stay Pending Decision on Its Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Georgia (Dkt. No. 28) by Script Security Solutions, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Califf) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-CV-1030. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/19/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #107 Order, Terminate Motions, Scheduling Order,,, by FrontPoint Security Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Fifth Amended DCO)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) ORDER granting #108 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Deadline is 11/30/2015. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/17/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) ORDER granting #106 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice DEI Holdings, Inc. and DEI Sales, Inc. (Consolidated from case 2:15-cv-373). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/17/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO AT&T'S AND LIFESHIELD'S MOTIONS TO TRANSFER by Script Security Solutions, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to ADT LLC. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachariah Harrington on behalf of Script Security Solutions, L.L.C. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 03/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Antonelli on behalf of Script Security Solutions, L.L.C. (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 03/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of Script Security Solutions, L.L.C. (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 03/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Cooper, Califf) (Entered: 03/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Script Security Solutions, L.L.C. (Cooper, Califf) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Script Security Solutions, L.L.C. OF RELATED CASES (Cooper, Califf) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ADT LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5100161.), filed by Script Security Solutions, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cooper, Califf) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Comcast Broadband Security, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FrontPoint Security Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Script Security Solutions, L.L.C. is a litigant