This case was last updated from PACER on 05/27/2016 at 14:59:05 (UTC).

Schuten Electronics, Inc. v. AVX Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 10/23/2015 Schuten Electronics, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against AVX Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-04878

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. Beth Labson Freeman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Schuten Electronics, Inc.

Defendants

Panasonic Corporation of North America

KOA Corporation

Panasonic Corporation

Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd.

TDK Corporation

KEMET Electronics Corporation

Yageo Corporation

Yageo America Corporation

Panasonic Industrial Devices Sales Company of America

TDK U.S.A. Corporation

Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC

KOA Speer Electronics, Inc.

Vishay Intertechnology, Inc.

KEMET Corporation

ROHM Co. Ltd.

Sanyo North America Corporation

Panasonic Electronic Devices Co. Ltd.

TDK-EPC Corporation

AVX Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shana E. Scarlett

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

715 Hearst Avenue, Suite 202

Berkeley, CA 94710

Steve W. Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1918 Eighth Avenue, Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98101

Daniel A. Small

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC

1100 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 500 West Tower

Washington, DC 20005-3964

Laura M Alexander

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers and Toll PLLC

1100 New York Ave, Nw, Suite 500W

Washington, DC 20005

Kit A. Pierson

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers and Toll PLLC

1100 New York Ave., Nw, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20005

Jeff D Friedman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

715 Hearst Avenue, Suite 202

Berkeley, CA 94710

Emmy L Levens

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers and Toll PLLC

1100 New York Avenue Nw, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Antitrust Class Action Complaint against AVX Corporation, KEMET Corporation, KEMET Electronics Corporation, KOA Corporation, KOA Speer Electronics, Inc., Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Electronic Devices Co. Ltd., Panasonic Industrial Devices Sales Company of America, ROHM Co. Ltd., Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation, TDK Corporation, TDK U.S.A. Corporation, TDK-EPC Corporation, Vishay Intertechnology, Inc., Yageo America Corporation, Yageo Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9937938.). Filed bySchuten Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 10/23/2015) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

#2

(#2) *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 4 . *** Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 10/23/2015) Modified on 10/23/2015 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/23/2015)

#3

(#3) Statement Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Schuten Electronics, Inc.. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 10/23/2015) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 10/23/2015) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

#5

(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/19/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to AVX Corporation, KEMET Corporation, KEMET Electronics Corporation, KOA Corporation, KOA Speer Electronics, Inc., Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Electronic Devices Co. Ltd., Panasonic Industrial Devices Sales Company of America, ROHM Co. Ltd., Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation, TDK Corporation, TDK U.S.A. Corporation, TDK-EPC Corporation, Vishay Intertechnology, Inc., Yageo America Corporation, Yageo Corporation. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Schuten Electronics, Inc... (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 10/27/2015) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

#9

(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

#22

(#22) Initial Case Management Order by Judge Ronald M. Whyte.Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2015. The pending stipulations regarding waiver of service of summons and time to respond to the complaints (Case No. 15-cv-3820, Dkt. No. 26; Case No. 15-cv-4042, Dkt. No. 24; Case No. 15-cv-4201, Dkt. No. 21; and Case No. 15-4206, Dkt. No. 10) are ACCEPTED, subject to modification of the time to respond, to be discussed at the initial CMC.Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy's motion to appoint lead counsel (Case No. 15-cv-3820, Dkt. No. 46)is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and may be resubmitted in accordance with the procedures outlined in this order. The hearing on Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy's motion set for November 13, 2015 is hereby VACATED.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

#21

(#21) ORDER RELATING CASE. Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte in case 5:15-cv-03820-RMW; granting (40) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:15-cv-03868-RMW. Associated Cases: 5:15-cv-03868-RMW, 5:15-cv-03820-RMW, 5:15-cv-03907-RMW, 5:15-cv-04042-RMW, 5:15-cv-04201-RMW, 5:15-cv-04206-RMW, 5:15-cv-04878(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015) (Entered: 11/10/2015). Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/10/2015. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

#20

(#20) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015) (Entered: 11/05/2015)

#19

(#19) ORDER GRANTING 18 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/29/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

#18

(#18) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Steve W. Berman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9955635.) filed by Schuten Electronics, Inc.. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/30/2015) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

#17

(#17) ORDER GRANTING 13 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/29/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

#16

(#16) ORDER GRANTING 12 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/29/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING 11 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/29/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Laura M Alexander (Alexander, Laura) (Filed on 10/28/2015) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Initial Case Management Order by Judge Ronald M. Whyte.Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2015. The pending stipulations regarding waiver of service of summons and time to respond to the complaints (Case No. 15-cv-3820, Dkt. No. 26; Case No. 15-cv-4042, Dkt. No. 24; Case No. 15-cv-4201, Dkt. No. 21; and Case No. 15-4206, Dkt. No. 10) are ACCEPTED, subject to modification of the time to respond, to be discussed at the initial CMC.Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy's motion to appoint lead counsel (Case No. 15-cv-3820, Dkt. No. 46)is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and may be resubmitted in accordance with the procedures outlined in this order. The hearing on Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy's motion set for November 13, 2015 is hereby VACATED.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER RELATING CASE. Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte in case 5:15-cv-03820-RMW; granting (40) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:15-cv-03868-RMW. Associated Cases: 5:15-cv-03868-RMW, 5:15-cv-03820-RMW, 5:15-cv-03907-RMW, 5:15-cv-04042-RMW, 5:15-cv-04201-RMW, 5:15-cv-04206-RMW, 5:15-cv-04878(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015) (Entered: 11/10/2015). Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/10/2015. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015) (Entered: 11/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER GRANTING 18 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/29/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Steve W. Berman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9955635.) filed by Schuten Electronics, Inc.. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/30/2015) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER GRANTING 13 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/29/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER GRANTING 12 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/29/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER GRANTING 11 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/29/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Laura M Alexander (Alexander, Laura) (Filed on 10/28/2015) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Emmy L. Levens and (Proposed) Order ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9948481.) filed by Schuten Electronics, Inc.. (Levens, Emmy) (Filed on 10/28/2015) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order Executive Committee on 10/28/22015. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015) ). (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Schuten Electronics, Inc... (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 10/27/2015) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to AVX Corporation, KEMET Corporation, KEMET Electronics Corporation, KOA Corporation, KOA Speer Electronics, Inc., Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Electronic Devices Co. Ltd., Panasonic Industrial Devices Sales Company of America, ROHM Co. Ltd., Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation, TDK Corporation, TDK U.S.A. Corporation, TDK-EPC Corporation, Vishay Intertechnology, Inc., Yageo America Corporation, Yageo Corporation. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/19/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 10/23/2015) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Schuten Electronics, Inc.. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 10/23/2015) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 4 . *** Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 10/23/2015) Modified on 10/23/2015 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Antitrust Class Action Complaint against AVX Corporation, KEMET Corporation, KEMET Electronics Corporation, KOA Corporation, KOA Speer Electronics, Inc., Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Electronic Devices Co. Ltd., Panasonic Industrial Devices Sales Company of America, ROHM Co. Ltd., Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation, TDK Corporation, TDK U.S.A. Corporation, TDK-EPC Corporation, Vishay Intertechnology, Inc., Yageo America Corporation, Yageo Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9937938.). Filed bySchuten Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 10/23/2015) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.