This case was last updated from PACER on 04/02/2018 at 10:22:06 (UTC).

Schmidt et al v. Idaho Department of Corrections et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Schmidt filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Idaho Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is Candy W. Dale. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00242

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Candy W. Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jess Tronson

Ignacio Tellez

Jeremiah B Schmidt

Defendants

Roberto G Escobedo

Randy Blades

Idaho Department of Corrections

Tramel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Thomas Earl

 

Court Documents

#43

(#43) MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 21 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant Escobedo's Motion for Summary Judgment by Joinder in the IDOC Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 24 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants' Motion to Strike a Portion of the Exhibits to the Affidavit of Ryan Earl in Support of Plaintiffs' Objection to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 33 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

#45

(#45) ORDER SETTING TRIAL - A 5- day Jury Trial is set for 10/17/2016 01:30 PM in Boise - Courtroom 3 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2016 03:00 PM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Rule 702 Motions d ue by 4/18/2016. Witness Lists, Exhibit Lists, Exhibits, Proposed Voir Dire, Proposed Jury Instructions, TrialBriefs and Motions in Limine due by 9/14/2016. The parties agree that they shall notify the Court on or before 8/31/2016 that the case has either settled or will definitely go to trial (Case Management deadline set for 8/31/2016). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) ORDER SETTING TRIAL - A 5- day Jury Trial is set for 10/17/2016 01:30 PM in Boise - Courtroom 3 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2016 03:00 PM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Rule 702 Motions d ue by 4/18/2016. Witness Lists, Exhibit Lists, Exhibits, Proposed Voir Dire, Proposed Jury Instructions, TrialBriefs and Motions in Limine due by 9/14/2016. The parties agree that they shall notify the Court on or before 8/31/2016 that the case has either settled or will definitely go to trial (Case Management deadline set for 8/31/2016). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 21 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant Escobedo's Motion for Summary Judgment by Joinder in the IDOC Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 24 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants' Motion to Strike a Portion of the Exhibits to the Affidavit of Ryan Earl in Support of Plaintiffs' Objection to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 33 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.