This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 15:57:44 (UTC).

Schenker AG v. Societe Air France et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2014 Schenker AG filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Societe Air France. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Brian M. Cogan and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-04711

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Brian M. Cogan

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Schenker AG

Defendants

SAS Cargo Group A/S

Cargolux Airlines International S.A.

Martinair Holland N.V.

Societe Air France

Nippon Cargo Airlines Co., Ltd.

Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V.

All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd.

Qantas Airways Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark Thomas Ciani

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

575 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

James Joseph Calder

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

575 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Thomas P. Peabody

Attorney at Katten Muchin

525 West Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60661

Mary Ellen Hennessy

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

525 W Monroe St, Suite 1900

Chicago, IL 60661

Sheldon T. Zenner

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

525 W Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60661

Defendant Attorneys

George D. Ruttinger

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Sima Namiri-Kalantari

Attorney at Crowell & Moring

515 S Flower Street, 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Stokes Joshua

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

515 S Flower Street, 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Heather Lamberg-Kafele

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

801 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Katherine Mallory Tosch Brennan

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Thomas A. McGrath

Attorney at Linklaters LLP

1345 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10105

Brenda D. DiLuigi

Attorney at Linklaters LLP

1345 Avenue Of The Americas, 18Th Fl

New York, NY 10105

James R. Warnot, Jr.

Attorney at Linklaters LLP

1345 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10105

Charles Simpson

Attorney at Zuckert, Scoutt & Rasenberger, LLP

888 Seventeenth Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

Ankur Kapoor

Attorney at Constantine Cannon LLP

335 Madison Avenue, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Ishai Mooreville

Attorney at Baker & Miller PLLC

2401 Pennsylvania Ave, Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20037

William T. Miller

Attorney at Baker & Miller PLLC

2401 Pennsylvania Ave Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20037

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd., Cargolux Airlines International S.A., Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V., Martinair Holland N.V., Nippon Cargo Airlines Co., Ltd., Qantas Airways Limited, SAS Cargo Group A/S, Societe Air France filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-7123725 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Schenker AG. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons) (Calder, James) (Entered: 08/07/2014)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

#4

(#4) Notice of Related Case (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Schenker AG As To Defendant Nippon Cargo Airlines Co., Ltd., Without Prejudice, Pursuant To FRCP 41(a)(1)(A) (Calder, James) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

#6

(#6) Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Mary Ellen Hennessy -- Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7157861. by Schenker AG. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Of Mary Ellen Hennessy In Support, # 2 Exhibit A To Affidavit - Certificates Of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order) (Hennessy, Mary) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

#7

(#7) Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Sheldon T. Zenner -- Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7157956. by Schenker AG. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Of Sheldon T. Zenner In Support, # 2 Exhibit A To Affidavit - Certificates Of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order) (Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Warnot, Jr on behalf of Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V., Martinair Holland N.V., Societe Air France (aty to be noticed) (Warnot, James) (Entered: 08/27/2014)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION and Proposed Order by Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V., Martinair Holland N.V., Societe Air France (Warnot, James) (Entered: 08/27/2014)

#84

(#84) Letter regarding status update pursuant to Practice and Procedure Order Number 9 by Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V., Martinair Holland N.V., Societe Air France (Warnot, James) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#83

(#83) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NUMBER 9. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/19/2016 ) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-BMC-VVP et al. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

#82

(#82) ORDER granting plaintiffs' 2409 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Air China Limited and Air China Cargo Company Limited. The terms of the Settlement Agreement are preliminarily approved as being fair, reasonable, and adequate to the Class, subject to the Fairness Hearing described herein. This order is without prejudice to the non-settling defendants' seeking relief from the Court and an opportunity for briefing to the extent that any of the settlements in the case deprives such defendants of information to which they otherwise would be entitled under the Federal Rules. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/18/2016 ) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-BMC-VVP et al. (Guzzi, Roseann) Modified on 2/19/2016 (Guzzi, Roseann). (Entered: 02/19/2016)

#81

(#81) Letter Confirmation that Hogan Lovells US LLP and its predecessor firms no longer have a role in this action by Air Canada, AC Cargo LP Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-BMC-VVP et al. (Litvack, Sanford) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#80

(#80) ORDER DATED 2/9/16 regarding confirmation that the law firm Hogan Lovells US LLP and its predecessor and affiliate firms(HL) no longer have a role in this action. The Court e requests that HL submit a letter within seven days addressing the issues above and confirming that it should no longer be listed as counsel of record in these cases. Any party wishing to respond to HLs submission may do so within seven days thereafter. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/9/2016 ) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-BMC-VVP et al. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

#79

(#79) JPMDL Order:Due to the retirement of the Honorable John Gleeson, the Eastern District of New York has notified the Panel of the need to reassign the actions in the above litigation to another judge in that district.IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, with the consent of that court, this litigation isreassigned to the Honorable Brian Cogan for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

#78

(#78) SUGGESTION OF CASE REASSIGNMENT : The Clerk of Court is directed to transmit a copy of this Suggestion of Case Reassignment to Thomasenia 0. Duncan, Panel Executive for the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Once the panel approves the reassignment, the Clerk of Court is directed to reassign the case(s). Copy emailed to Thomasenia O. Duncan on 2/4/2016. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 2/3/2016. Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

#77

(#77) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Wesley Earnhardt on behalf of Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Polar Air Cargo, Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Earnhardt, Joseph) (Entered: 11/12/2015)

#76

(#76) NOTICE of Appearance by Evan R. Chesler on behalf of Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Polar Air Cargo, Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Chesler, Evan) (Entered: 11/12/2015)

111 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#84) Letter regarding status update pursuant to Practice and Procedure Order Number 9 by Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V., Martinair Holland N.V., Societe Air France (Warnot, James) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#83) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NUMBER 9. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/19/2016 ) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-BMC-VVP et al. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#82) ORDER granting plaintiffs' 2409 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Air China Limited and Air China Cargo Company Limited. The terms of the Settlement Agreement are preliminarily approved as being fair, reasonable, and adequate to the Class, subject to the Fairness Hearing described herein. This order is without prejudice to the non-settling defendants' seeking relief from the Court and an opportunity for briefing to the extent that any of the settlements in the case deprives such defendants of information to which they otherwise would be entitled under the Federal Rules. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/18/2016 ) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-BMC-VVP et al. (Guzzi, Roseann) Modified on 2/19/2016 (Guzzi, Roseann). (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#81) Letter Confirmation that Hogan Lovells US LLP and its predecessor firms no longer have a role in this action by Air Canada, AC Cargo LP Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-BMC-VVP et al. (Litvack, Sanford) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#80) ORDER DATED 2/9/16 regarding confirmation that the law firm Hogan Lovells US LLP and its predecessor and affiliate firms(HL) no longer have a role in this action. The Court e requests that HL submit a letter within seven days addressing the issues above and confirming that it should no longer be listed as counsel of record in these cases. Any party wishing to respond to HLs submission may do so within seven days thereafter. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/9/2016 ) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-BMC-VVP et al. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) JPMDL Order:Due to the retirement of the Honorable John Gleeson, the Eastern District of New York has notified the Panel of the need to reassign the actions in the above litigation to another judge in that district.IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, with the consent of that court, this litigation isreassigned to the Honorable Brian Cogan for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#78) SUGGESTION OF CASE REASSIGNMENT : The Clerk of Court is directed to transmit a copy of this Suggestion of Case Reassignment to Thomasenia 0. Duncan, Panel Executive for the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Once the panel approves the reassignment, the Clerk of Court is directed to reassign the case(s). Copy emailed to Thomasenia O. Duncan on 2/4/2016. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 2/3/2016. Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#77) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Wesley Earnhardt on behalf of Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Polar Air Cargo, Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Earnhardt, Joseph) (Entered: 11/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#76) NOTICE of Appearance by Evan R. Chesler on behalf of Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Polar Air Cargo, Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Chesler, Evan) (Entered: 11/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) NOTICE of Appearance by Sheron Korpus on behalf of Air New Zealand Limited (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Korpus, Sheron) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda D. Di Luigi on behalf of Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V., Martinair Holland N.V., Societe Air France (aty to be noticed) (Di Luigi, Brenda) (Entered: 08/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION and Proposed Order by Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V., Martinair Holland N.V., Societe Air France (Warnot, James) (Entered: 08/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Warnot, Jr on behalf of Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V., Martinair Holland N.V., Societe Air France (aty to be noticed) (Warnot, James) (Entered: 08/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Sheldon T. Zenner -- Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7157956. by Schenker AG. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Of Sheldon T. Zenner In Support, # 2 Exhibit A To Affidavit - Certificates Of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order) (Zenner, Sheldon) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Mary Ellen Hennessy -- Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7157861. by Schenker AG. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Of Mary Ellen Hennessy In Support, # 2 Exhibit A To Affidavit - Certificates Of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order) (Hennessy, Mary) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Schenker AG As To Defendant Nippon Cargo Airlines Co., Ltd., Without Prejudice, Pursuant To FRCP 41(a)(1)(A) (Calder, James) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Related Case (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd., Cargolux Airlines International S.A., Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V., Martinair Holland N.V., Nippon Cargo Airlines Co., Ltd., Qantas Airways Limited, SAS Cargo Group A/S, Societe Air France filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-7123725 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Schenker AG. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons) (Calder, James) (Entered: 08/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.