This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 21:15:22 (UTC).

Scheffler v. Messerli & Kramer P.A.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2014 Scheffler filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Messerli Kramer P A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Ann D. Montgomery and Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:14-CV-01933

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Ann D. Montgomery

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Troy K. Scheffler

Defendant

Messerli & Kramer P.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter J Nickitas

431 S 7Th Street, Suite 2446

Minneapolis, MN 55415

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley R Armstrong

Attorney at Messerli & Kramer PA

3033 Campus Drive, Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Derrick N Weber

Attorney at Messerli & Kramer

3033 Campus Drive Ste 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Patrick D Newman

Attorney at Moss & Barnett

150 South Fifth Street, Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Messerli & Kramer P.A.. Case assigned to Judge Ann D. Montgomery per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Filed by Troy K. Scheffler. No summons requested. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Envelope) (AKL) (cc: Troy K. Scheffler)DOCUMENT QC'D ON 6/18/14 LGL Modified on 6/18/2014 (LGL). (Entered: 06/17/2014)

#2

(#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Troy K. Scheffler. (AKL)DOCUMENT QC'D ON 6/18/14 LGL Modified on 6/18/2014 (LGL). (Entered: 06/17/2014)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting 2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 6/23/14. (AKL) (Entered: 06/23/2014)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Messerli & Kramer P.A. (AKL) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy K. Scheffler. Messerli & Kramer P.A. served on 7/10/2014, answer due 7/31/2014. (AKL)DOCUMENT QC'D ON 7/22/14 LGL Modified on 7/22/2014 (LGL). (Entered: 07/21/2014)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss/General by Messerli & Kramer P.A.. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Messerli & Kramer P.A.. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

#9

(#9) LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Messerli & Kramer P.A. re 8 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Messerli & Kramer P.A.. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

#34

(#34) Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal filed by Troy K. Scheffler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Order granting in forma pauperis status in district court, # 2 Exhibit(s) Application to proceed in forma pauperis in district court)(Nickitas, Peter) (Entered: 10/24/2014)

#35

(#35) ORDER granting 34 Application on Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/27/14. (JME) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

#36

(#36) TRANSMITTAL OF APPEAL LETTER TO U.S. COURT OF APPEALS, 8TH CIRCUIT, Re: Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit 33 . (lmb) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

#37

(#37) USCA Case Number 14-3435 for 33 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by Troy K. Scheffler. (AKL) (Entered: 10/30/2014)

#38

(#38) NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (TJW) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

#39

(#39) TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's First Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings held on September 24, 2014 before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (20 pages). Court Reporter: Tim Willette (E-mail: Tim_Willette@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5108). Redaction Request due 1/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/7/2015. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (TJW) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

#40

(#40) NOTICE to USCA of subsequent filing in a civil case, Re: Notice of Filing of Official Transcript 38 , Transcript 39 . (ALM) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

#41

(#41) Opinion of USCA as to 33 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by Troy K. Scheffler (JDF) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

#42

(#42) USCA JUDGMENT as to 33 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by Troy K. Scheffler (received electronically from COA) (JDF) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) USCA JUDGMENT as to 33 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by Troy K. Scheffler (received electronically from COA) (JDF) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Opinion of USCA as to 33 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by Troy K. Scheffler (JDF) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) NOTICE to USCA of subsequent filing in a civil case, Re: Notice of Filing of Official Transcript 38 , Transcript 39 . (ALM) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's First Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings held on September 24, 2014 before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (20 pages). Court Reporter: Tim Willette (E-mail: Tim_Willette@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5108). Redaction Request due 1/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/7/2015. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (TJW) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (TJW) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) USCA Case Number 14-3435 for 33 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by Troy K. Scheffler. (AKL) (Entered: 10/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) TRANSMITTAL OF APPEAL LETTER TO U.S. COURT OF APPEALS, 8TH CIRCUIT, Re: Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit 33 . (lmb) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) ORDER granting 34 Application on Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/27/14. (JME) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal filed by Troy K. Scheffler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Order granting in forma pauperis status in district court, # 2 Exhibit(s) Application to proceed in forma pauperis in district court)(Nickitas, Peter) (Entered: 10/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 8TH CIRCUIT by Troy K. Scheffler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Appeal Forms A and B, # 2 Exhibit(s) Order Granting Plaintiff Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(Nickitas, Peter) (Entered: 10/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Declaration of Derrick N. Weber in Support of 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Messerli & Kramer P.A. DOCUMENT/EXHIBIT 2 FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE REDACTED VERSION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Newman, Patrick) Modified on 7/25/2014 (kt). Modified text on 7/28/2014 (lmb). (Entered: 07/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Messerli & Kramer P.A. re 8 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Messerli & Kramer P.A.. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Messerli & Kramer P.A.. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss/General by Messerli & Kramer P.A.. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy K. Scheffler. Messerli & Kramer P.A. served on 7/10/2014, answer due 7/31/2014. (AKL)DOCUMENT QC'D ON 7/22/14 LGL Modified on 7/22/2014 (LGL). (Entered: 07/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Messerli & Kramer P.A. (AKL) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting 2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 6/23/14. (AKL) (Entered: 06/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Troy K. Scheffler. (AKL)DOCUMENT QC'D ON 6/18/14 LGL Modified on 6/18/2014 (LGL). (Entered: 06/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Messerli & Kramer P.A.. Case assigned to Judge Ann D. Montgomery per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Filed by Troy K. Scheffler. No summons requested. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Envelope) (AKL) (cc: Troy K. Scheffler)DOCUMENT QC'D ON 6/18/14 LGL Modified on 6/18/2014 (LGL). (Entered: 06/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less