This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2016 at 13:51:34 (UTC).

ScarX Corp. v. Waissbluth

Case Summary

On 09/24/2014 ScarX Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Waissbluth. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy and Hon. William M. Skretny. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00802

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy

Judge

Hon. William M. Skretny

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

ScarX Corp.

Counter Claimant and Defendant

Ivan Waissbluth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Kalman G. Magyar

Gavin Thomas Bogle

Michael James Berchou

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Pasquale A. Razzano

Timothy J. Kelly

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#28

#29

#30

#31

#32

#33

#34

#35

#36

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) STIPULATION of Dismissal by ScarX Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) TEXT DISMISSAL ORDERThis Court having been advised that this case has been settled.IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED.FURTHER, the parties are directed to file with the Clerk of the Court a stipulation of discontinuance on or before 10/1/2015.FURTHER, that the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close this case.SO ORDERED.Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 8/17/2015. (CLERK TO FOLLOW UP) (CMD) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Mediation Certification by Mediator Ronald Dimock.(JEC) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) TEXT ORDER : Upon the payment of the filing fee, the motion of Gavin Thomas Bogle, Esq. for pro hac vice admission 31 is granted. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 7/16/15. (DAZ) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by ScarX Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) (Entered: 07/14/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gavin Thomas Bogle by ScarX Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Sponsoring Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A (Petition), # 3 Exhibit B (Attorney's Oath), # 4 Exhibit C (Civility Oath), # 5 Exhibit D (Database Form), # 6 Exhibit E (ECF Registration Form), # 7 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 5/26/2015. (JCCh). (Entered: 05/27/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: A Scheduling Conference was held on May 26, 2015. The parties discussed Case Management Order deadlines. APPEARANCES: Kalman Magyar appearing on behalf of ScarX via telephone; Michael Berchou appearing in person on behalf of ScarX, and Timothy Kelly appearing on behalf of Ivan Waissbluth. (Court Reporter ECRO) (JCCh) Modified on 5/27/2015 (JCCh). (Entered: 05/27/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) NOTICE of Appearance by Kalman G. Magyar on behalf of ScarX Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Magyar, Kalman) (Entered: 05/22/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Proposed Pretrial Order by ScarX Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Case Management Order), # 2 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael) (Entered: 05/12/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ScarX Corp.. (Berchou, Michael) (Entered: 11/10/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING NOTICE on Defendant's 8 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 11/10/2014. Reply due by 11/20/2014. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court as necessary. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/27/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ivan Waissbluth. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Razzano, Pasquale) (Entered: 10/22/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ScarX Corp.. Ivan Waissbluth served on 10/7/2014, answer due 10/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Additional Proof of Service)(Berchou, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Ivan Waissbluth. (DLC) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Report on the Filing or Determination of Patent or Trademark Case sent to USPTO. (Attachments:#(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B.) (DLC) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Right to Consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge form. (Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening.) (DLC) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ScarX Corp.. (Berchou, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Original Summons Filed. (Berchou, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Ivan Waissbluth ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-2113896.), filed by ScarX Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berchou, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less