This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2016 at 01:31:50 (UTC).

Sapphire Dolphin LLC v. Polk Audio LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2015 Sapphire Dolphin LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Polk Audio LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Sue L. Robinson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00144

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Sue L. Robinson

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

Sapphire Dolphin LLC

Counter Claimants

DEI Sales Inc.

DEI Holdings Inc.

Polk Audio LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Stephen B. Brauerman

Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes

Richard D. Kirk

Sara E. Bussiere

Maristella Collazo-Soto

Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola

Counter Claimant Attorneys

David Ellis Moore

Bindu Ann George Palapura

Richard L. Horwitz

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (dmp, ) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,094,676; 6,219,710;. (dmp, ) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sapphire Dolphin LLC. Polk Audio LLC served on 2/10/2015, answer due 3/3/2015. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eugenio J. Torres and Maristella Collazo-Soto - filed by Sapphire Dolphin LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Eugenio J. Torres, # 2 Certification of Maristella Collazo-Soto)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/12/2015)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 2, 2015 - filed by DEI Holdings Inc., DEI Sales Inc., Polk Audio LLC. (Horwitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#7

(#7) First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against DEI Holdings Inc., DEI Sales Inc., Polk Audio LLC- filed by Sapphire Dolphin LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint to April 23, 2015 - filed by DEI Holdings Inc., DEI Sales Inc., Polk Audio LLC. (Moore, David) (Entered: 03/30/2015)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint to May 13, 2015 - filed by DEI Holdings Inc., DEI Sales Inc., Polk Audio LLC. (Palapura, Bindu) (Entered: 04/23/2015)

#10

(#10) ORDER, IT IS ORDERED that, on or before May 28, 2015, counsel for plaintiff shall inform the court as to whether the need for coordinated discovery and/or Markman proceedings is anticipated as to the above cases and, if so, when a joint scheduling conference might most efficiently be conducted. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00085-SLR et al.(fms) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: 7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Sapphire Dolphin LLC by Polk Audio LLC, DEI Sales Inc., DEI Holdings Inc..(Palapura, Bindu) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

#12

(#12) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Viper Holdings, LLC for DEI Holdings Inc., DEI Sales Inc., Polk Audio LLC filed by DEI Holdings Inc., DEI Sales Inc., Polk Audio LLC. (Palapura, Bindu) (Entered: 05/20/2015)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen R. Smith of Cooley LLP - filed by DEI Holdings Inc., DEI Sales Inc., Polk Audio LLC. (Moore, David) (Entered: 05/22/2015)

#14

(#14) Letter to The Honorable Judge Sue L. Robinson from Sara E. Bussiere, Esquire regarding Coordination and Rule 16 Order. (Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to 11 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim / Plaintiff Sapphire Dolphin, LLC's Answer to Defendants' Counterclaim by Sapphire Dolphin LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

#16

(#16) Order Setting Scheduling Conference: An In-Person Scheduling Conference is set for 7/29/2015 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/3/2015. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00085-SLR, 1:15-cv-00069-SLR, 1:15-cv-00086-SLR, 1:15-cv-00144-SLR, 1:15-cv-00145-SLR(fms) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

#17

(#17) Order Setting Scheduling Conference: The In-Person Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2015 at 4:00 PM is rescheduled to commence at 05:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/18/2015. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00085-SLR, 1:15-cv-00086-SLR, 1:15-cv-00144-SLR, 1:15-cv-00145-SLR(fms) (Entered: 06/18/2015)

#18

(#18) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Sapphire Dolphin LLC. (Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

#19

(#19) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,094,676; 6,219,710. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation)(fms) (Entered: 07/19/2015)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,094,676; 6,219,710. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation)(fms) (Entered: 07/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Sapphire Dolphin LLC. (Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Order Setting Scheduling Conference: The In-Person Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2015 at 4:00 PM is rescheduled to commence at 05:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/18/2015. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00085-SLR, 1:15-cv-00086-SLR, 1:15-cv-00144-SLR, 1:15-cv-00145-SLR(fms) (Entered: 06/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Order Setting Scheduling Conference: An In-Person Scheduling Conference is set for 7/29/2015 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/3/2015. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00085-SLR, 1:15-cv-00069-SLR, 1:15-cv-00086-SLR, 1:15-cv-00144-SLR, 1:15-cv-00145-SLR(fms) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to 11 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim / Plaintiff Sapphire Dolphin, LLC's Answer to Defendants' Counterclaim by Sapphire Dolphin LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Letter to The Honorable Judge Sue L. Robinson from Sara E. Bussiere, Esquire regarding Coordination and Rule 16 Order. (Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen R. Smith of Cooley LLP - filed by DEI Holdings Inc., DEI Sales Inc., Polk Audio LLC. (Moore, David) (Entered: 05/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Viper Holdings, LLC for DEI Holdings Inc., DEI Sales Inc., Polk Audio LLC filed by DEI Holdings Inc., DEI Sales Inc., Polk Audio LLC. (Palapura, Bindu) (Entered: 05/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: 7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Sapphire Dolphin LLC by Polk Audio LLC, DEI Sales Inc., DEI Holdings Inc..(Palapura, Bindu) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER, IT IS ORDERED that, on or before May 28, 2015, counsel for plaintiff shall inform the court as to whether the need for coordinated discovery and/or Markman proceedings is anticipated as to the above cases and, if so, when a joint scheduling conference might most efficiently be conducted. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00085-SLR et al.(fms) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint to May 13, 2015 - filed by DEI Holdings Inc., DEI Sales Inc., Polk Audio LLC. (Palapura, Bindu) (Entered: 04/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint to April 23, 2015 - filed by DEI Holdings Inc., DEI Sales Inc., Polk Audio LLC. (Moore, David) (Entered: 03/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against DEI Holdings Inc., DEI Sales Inc., Polk Audio LLC- filed by Sapphire Dolphin LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 2, 2015 - filed by DEI Holdings Inc., DEI Sales Inc., Polk Audio LLC. (Horwitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eugenio J. Torres and Maristella Collazo-Soto - filed by Sapphire Dolphin LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Eugenio J. Torres, # 2 Certification of Maristella Collazo-Soto)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sapphire Dolphin LLC. Polk Audio LLC served on 2/10/2015, answer due 3/3/2015. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,094,676; 6,219,710;. (dmp, ) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (dmp, ) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against DEI Holdings Inc., DEI Sales Inc., Polk Audio LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-1671718.) - filed by Sapphire Dolphin LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, ) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less