This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/28/2016 at 22:21:51 (UTC).

SanDisk Corporation v. Round Rock Research LLC

Case Summary

On 08/04/2014 SanDisk Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Round Rock Research LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    14-1678

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SanDisk Corporation

Defendant

Round Rock Research LLC

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#80

#83

#85

#87

#88

#91

#92

#0130373786

#0130519737

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#0130519737) TENDERED from Appellee SanDisk Corporation. Title: RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 01/16/2015 by email. [210628]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#0130373786) TENDERED from Appellant Round Rock Research LLC. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 10/03/2014 by email. [187793]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) ORDER filed granting motion to terminate appeal [91] filed by Appellee SanDisk Corporation and Appellant Round Rock Research LLC; issuing mandate. pursuant to FRAP 42(b). By: (Per Curiam. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [227937]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) MOTION of Appellant Round Rock Research LLC and Appellee SanDisk Corporation to terminate appeal through Dismissal. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/27/2015 by email. [227778]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) ORDER filed granting motion to withdraw attorney [87] filed by Amici Curiae Nokia Corporation and Nokia USA, Inc. By: Court (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [225248]--[Edited 03/18/2015 by SJ to correct docket text]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) MOTION of Amici Curiae Nokia Corporation and Nokia USA, Inc. to withdraw counsel Byron R. Holz. Response/Opposition is due 03/30/2015 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/17/2015 by email. [224998]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) APPENDIX FILED for Round Rock Research LLC [83]. Number of Pages: 582. Service: 02/12/2015 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 02/23/2015. [217701]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) TENDERED from Appellant Round Rock Research LLC. Title: JOINT APPENDIX. Service: 02/12/2015 by email. [217143]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) REPLY BRIEF FILED for Appellant Round Rock Research LLC [78]. Number of Pages: 29. Service: 02/02/2015 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 02/09/2015. Appendix is due 02/12/2015. [214839]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) TENDERED from Appellant Round Rock Research LLC. Title: REPLY BRIEF. Service: 02/02/2015 by email, US mail. [214555]

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Entry of appearance for Christopher V. Ryan as of counsel for Appellant Round Rock Research LLC. Service: 08/18/2014 by clerk. [175819]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Entry of appearance for Ajeet P. Pai as of counsel for Appellee SanDisk Corporation. Service: 08/18/2014 by clerk. [175817]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Entry of appearance for Steven A. Hirsch as of counsel for Appellee SanDisk Corporation. Service: 08/18/2014 by email. [175788]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Christa M. Anderson as of counsel for Appellee SanDisk Corporation. Service: 08/18/2014 by email. [175787]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for Robert A. Van Nest as principal counsel for Appellee SanDisk Corporation. Service: 08/18/2014 by email. [175785]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Richard M. Cowell as of counsel for Appellant Round Rock Research LLC. Service: 08/14/2014 by email, US mail. [175272]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Round Rock Research LLC. Service: 08/14/2014 by US mail, email. [175269]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Round Rock Research LLC. Service: 08/14/2014 by US mail, email. [175268]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Jon T. Hohenthaner as principal counsel for Appellant Round Rock Research LLC. Service: 04/14/2014 by US mail, email. [175265]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 07/25/2014. [172597]Entry of Appearance due 08/18/2014. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/18/2014. Docketing Statement due 08/18/2014. Appellant's brief is due 10/03/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Round Rock Research LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SanDisk LLC is a litigant