This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:17:24 (UTC).

Sanchez v. M-I, L.L.C. d/b/a MI SWACO

Case Summary

On 03/13/2015 Sanchez filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against M-I, L L C d/b/a MI SWACO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-00192

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Sanchez

Defendant

M-I, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A. Josephson

Attorney at Fibich, Leebron, Copeland, Briggs & Josephson

1150 Bissonnet

Houston, TX 77005

Lindsay R. Itkin

Attorney at Fibich Leebron Copeland Briggs & Josephson

1150 Bissonnet

Houston, TX 77005

Andrew W. Dunlap

Attorney at Fibich, Leebron, Copeland, Briggs & Josephson

1150 Bissonnet

Houston, TX 77005

Richard J. Burch

Attorney at Bruckner Burch PLLC

8 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77046

Defendant Attorneys

Michael S. Hudson

Attorney at The Kullman Firm

119 3Rd Street South, Suite 2

Columbus, MS 39701

Samuel Zurik, III

Attorney at The Kullman Firm

1600 Energy Centre, 1100 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70163

Robert Peter Lombardi

Attorney at The Kullman Firm, A Professional Law Corp.

1100 Poydras Street, 1600 Energy Centre

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Add Attorney Robert Peter Lombardi,Michael S. Hudson for M-I, L.L.C. (rg) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING re 7 MOTION for Robert Peter Lombardi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samuel Zurik, III (Filing fee $100 receipt number 0542-7382307) filed by M-I, L.L.C. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rg) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion for Michael S. Hudson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rg) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7280962), filed by ROBERT SANCHEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Consent, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Sanchez. M-I, L.L.C. served on 3/23/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. (Itkin, Lindsay) (Entered: 04/06/2015)

#14

(#14) ORDER (Setting Pretrial Conference for 7/14/2015 10:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rg) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samuel Zurik, III (MSH) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-7383477) by on behalf of M-I, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Zurik, Samuel) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

#15

(#15) CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Robert Sanchez. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

#12

(#12) ORDER (Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 6/30/2015). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rg) (Entered: 06/18/2015)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Robert Sanchez. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#13

(#13) Proposed Scheduling Order by M-I, L.L.C.. (Lombardi, Robert) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to 1 Complaint . Attorney Samuel Zurik, III added to party M-I, L.L.C.(pty:dft) by M-I, L.L.C..(Zurik, Samuel) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard J. Burch on behalf of Robert Sanchez (Burch, Richard) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to M-I, L.L.C. (rg) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

#16

(#16) NOTICE CONCERNING REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by M-I, L.L.C. (Lombardi, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samuel Zurik, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-7382307) by on behalf of M-I, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Zurik, Samuel) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE CONCERNING REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by M-I, L.L.C. (Lombardi, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Robert Sanchez. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER (Setting Pretrial Conference for 7/14/2015 10:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rg) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Proposed Scheduling Order by M-I, L.L.C.. (Lombardi, Robert) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER (Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 6/30/2015). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rg) (Entered: 06/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion for Michael S. Hudson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rg) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GRANTING re 7 MOTION for Robert Peter Lombardi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samuel Zurik, III (Filing fee $100 receipt number 0542-7382307) filed by M-I, L.L.C. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rg) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Add Attorney Robert Peter Lombardi,Michael S. Hudson for M-I, L.L.C. (rg) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samuel Zurik, III (MSH) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-7383477) by on behalf of M-I, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Zurik, Samuel) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samuel Zurik, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-7382307) by on behalf of M-I, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Zurik, Samuel) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to 1 Complaint . Attorney Samuel Zurik, III added to party M-I, L.L.C.(pty:dft) by M-I, L.L.C..(Zurik, Samuel) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Sanchez. M-I, L.L.C. served on 3/23/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. (Itkin, Lindsay) (Entered: 04/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard J. Burch on behalf of Robert Sanchez (Burch, Richard) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to M-I, L.L.C. (rg) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Robert Sanchez. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7280962), filed by ROBERT SANCHEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Consent, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.