This case was last updated from PACER on 04/19/2020 at 13:11:40 (UTC).

Ruthelle Frank, et al v. Scott Walker, et al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2014 Ruthelle Frank filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Scott Walker. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    14-2058

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellees

BARBARA ODEN

JUSTIN LUFT

DARTRIC DAVIS

RUTHELLE FRANK

CARL ELLIS

Appellants and Defendants

DAVID G. DEININGER, in his official capacity as a member of the Wisconsin Government Accountability Board

GERALD NICHOL, in his official capacity as a member of the Wisconsin Government Accountability Board

THOMAS BARLAND, in his official capacity as member of the Wisconsin Government Accountability Board

SCOTT WALKER, in his official capacity as Governor of State of Wisconsin

MICHAEL BRENNAN, in his official capacity as a member of the Wisconsin Government Accountability Board

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellee Attorneys

Dale Ho

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION

18Th Floor, 125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004-0000

Sean Young

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION

18Th Floor, 125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004-0000

Neil A. Steiner

Attorney at DECHERT LLP

1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Craig G. Falls

Attorney at DECHERT LLP

1900 K Street

Washington, DC 20006-2401

Jeremy Rosen

Attorney at NATIONAL LAW CENTER ON HOMELESSNESS & POVERTY

Suite 210, 2000 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Karyn Rotker

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTY UNION OF WISCONSIN

Suite 325, 207 E. Buffalo Street

Milwaukee, WI 53202-3501

Angela M. Liu

Attorney at DECHERT LLP

Suite 3200, 77 W. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Maria S. Lazar

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Wisconsin Department Of Justice, 17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

Clayton P. Kawski

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Wisconsin Department Of Justice, 17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

Brian Patrick Keenan

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Wisconsin Department Of Justice, 17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

 

Court Documents

#702330861

Filed opinion of the court PER CURIAM. A judge in active service requested a vote on the question whether to rehear this appeal en banc. Chief Judge Wood and Judges Posner, Rovner, Williams, and Hamilton voted in favor of rehearing en banc. The proposal to rehear this case en banc therefore fails by an equally divided court. This order does not affect the ability of any party to seek rehearing by the panel or the full court, see Fed. R. App. P. 35, nor does it affect the time available for filing a petition, see Fed. R. App. P. 40. Posner, Circuit Judge, joined by Chief Judge Wood and Circuit Judges Rovner, Williams, and Hamilton, dissenting from denial of rehearing en banc. [6612084-1] [6612084] [14-2058, 14-2059]

#702326992

Filed opinion of the court by Judge Easterbrook. REVERSED. Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge; Diane S. Sykes, Circuit Judge and John Daniel Tinder, Circuit Judge. [6610611-1] [6610611] [14-2058, 14-2059]

#702323865

Filed opinion of the court. Per Curiam. The motion for reconsideration is denied. A judge called for a vote on the request for a hearing en banc. That request is denied by an equally divided court. Chief Judge Wood and Judges Posner, Rovner, Williams, and Hamilton voted to hear this matter en banc. Williams, Circuit Judge, with whom Wood, Chief Judge, and Posner, Rovner, and Hamilton, Circuit Judges, join, dissenting from the denial of rehearing en banc. Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge; Diane S. Sykes, Circuit Judge; John Daniel Tinder, Circuit Judge; Joel M. Flaum, Circuit Judge; Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge. [6609284-1] [6609284] [14-2058, 14-2059]--[Edited 09/30/2014 by JAD to correct typo.]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiled opinion of the court PER CURIAM. A judge in active service requested a vote on the question whether to rehear this appeal en banc. Chief Judge Wood and Judges Posner, Rovner, Williams, and Hamilton voted in favor of rehearing en banc. The proposal to rehear this case en banc therefore fails by an equally divided court. This order does not affect the ability of any party to seek rehearing by the panel or the full court, see Fed. R. App. P. 35, nor does it affect the time available for filing a petition, see Fed. R. App. P. 40. Posner, Circuit Judge, joined by Chief Judge Wood and Circuit Judges Rovner, Williams, and Hamilton, dissenting from denial of rehearing en banc. [6612084-1] [6612084] [14-2058, 14-2059]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiled opinion of the court by Judge Easterbrook. REVERSED. Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge; Diane S. Sykes, Circuit Judge and John Daniel Tinder, Circuit Judge. [6610611-1] [6610611] [14-2058, 14-2059]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiled opinion of the court. Per Curiam. The motion for reconsideration is denied. A judge called for a vote on the request for a hearing en banc. That request is denied by an equally divided court. Chief Judge Wood and Judges Posner, Rovner, Williams, and Hamilton voted to hear this matter en banc. Williams, Circuit Judge, with whom Wood, Chief Judge, and Posner, Rovner, and Hamilton, Circuit Judges, join, dissenting from the denial of rehearing en banc. Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge; Diane S. Sykes, Circuit Judge; John Daniel Tinder, Circuit Judge; Joel M. Flaum, Circuit Judge; Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge. [6609284-1] [6609284] [14-2058, 14-2059]--[Edited 09/30/2014 by JAD to correct typo.]

    Read MoreRead Less