This case was last updated from PACER on 05/27/2016 at 16:18:08 (UTC).

Rupal Badani, Yosemite Construction Inc Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Rupal Badani, Yosemite Construction Inc was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-MD-02532

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. Maxine M. Chesney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rupal Badani

K. G.

N. G.

M. J.

Rupal Badani on behalf of the Estate of Amit Jha

Christopher J Harrison

Roger Mann

Felicia I Tornabene

Cathy Carrillo

Carolyn Garisto

Sherrie Mann

K. J.

Defendants, Cross Claimants and Cross Defendants

Yosemite Construction Inc

Delaware North Companies Parks & Resorts, Inc

Delaware North Companies, Inc

United States of America

Popp Bradley

Delaware North Companies Parks & Resorts at Yosemite, Inc

Bradley Popp

DNC Parks & Resorts Reservation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

June Patricia Bashant

Attorney at Rouda Feder Tietjen McGuinn

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 4000

San Francisco, CA 94104

Michael Albert Kelly

Attorney at Walkup, Melodia, Kelly & Schoenberger, APC

650 California Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108-2615

John B. Dempsey

Attorney at MYERS, BRIER AND KELLY, LLP

425 Spruce Street, Suite 200

Scranton, PA 18503

Frank J. Brier

Attorney at Myers, Brier and Kelly, LLP

425 Spruce Street, Suite 200

Scranton, PA 18503

Daniel Thomas Brier

Attorney at Myers Brier and Kelly, LLP

425 Spruce Street, Suite 200

Scranton, PA 18503

Paul E. Rice

Attorney at Paul E Rice, A Professional Corporation

350 Cambridge Avenue, Suite 225

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Charles S. Russell

Attorney at Callahan Thompson Sherman & Caudill Llp

2601 Main Street, Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92614

Carolyn Li-Jun Tan

Attorney at DeWitt Algorri Algorri

25 East Union Street

Pasadena, CA 91790

Sam Shimon Soleimany

Attorney at DeWitt Algorri Algorri

25 E. Union Street

Pasadena, CA 91103

Defendant, Cross Claimant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Jeff M. Fackler

Attorney at Michel & Fackler

2175 North California Boulevard, Suite 550

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Michael L. McCabe

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

One Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203-2887

Justin G. Weber

Attorney at Pepper Hamilton LLP

100 Market Street, Suite 200, Post Office Box 1181

Harrisburg, PA 17108-1181

Kevin J. English

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

One Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203

John Lauchlan Kortum

Attorney at Archer Norris

2033 North Main Street, Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Kenneth C. Ward

Attorney at Archer Norris

2033 North Main Street, Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Adam Bain

Attorney at US Department of Justice

Po Box 340 Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Joseph A Skale

Attorney at Rawle & Henderson, LLP

One South Penn Square

Philadephia, PA 19107

Michele Greif

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

1331 Pennsylvania Ave, Nw, Suite 8014

Washington, DC 20004

Wagner D Jackson

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

1331 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 8208N

Washington, DC 20004

John A. Mosychuck

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

One Canal Side, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203

21 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multi District Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, that the action is transferred to the Northern District of California Creating MDL No. 3:14-md-2532 MMC. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#2

(#2) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) of CAE 13-0666 Mann et al v. Delaware North Companies Incorporated et al and CAE 14-0300 Carrillo v. DNC Parks &Resorts at Yosemite, Inc. et al. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#3

(#3) ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. A Case Management Conference is scheduled for July 25, 2014, at 10:30 a.m., in Courtroom 7. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than July 18, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 19, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2014: # 1 Appendix Standing Order) (mmclc1, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Rupal Badani. (Bashant, June) (Filed on 6/27/2014) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

#5

(#5) ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION BY ALL PARTIES TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference currently set for July 25, 2014 is vacated and continued to August 15, 2014 at 10:30 a.m. A joint case management statement shall be filed no later than August 8, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 27, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

#6

(#6) ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 2, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014) (Entered: 07/02/2014)

#7

(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Suzanne P. Conaboy ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8749719.) filed by N. G., Carolyn Garisto. (Conaboy, Suzanne) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/07/2014)

#8

(#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Daniel T. Brier ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8749788.) filed by N. G., Carolyn Garisto. (Brier, Daniel) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/07/2014)

#9

(#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Frank J. Brier ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8749823.) filed by N. G., Carolyn Garisto. (Brier, Frank) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/07/2014)

#49

(#49) Proposed Order To Appoint Carolyn Garisto as Guardian ad Litem for Minor Plaintiffs K.G. and N.G. by Carolyn Garisto. (Baghdadi, Khaldoun) (Filed on 9/3/2014) (Entered: 09/03/2014)

#50

(#50) Proposed Order For Appointment of Plaintiffs' Co-Liason Counsel by Carolyn Garisto. (Baghdadi, Khaldoun) (Filed on 9/3/2014) (Entered: 09/03/2014)

#51

(#51) Proposed Summons. (Owens, Bryan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

#52

(#52) Proposed Summons. (Owens, Bryan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

#53

(#53) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CROSS-CLAIMS filed by United States of America. (Barnette, Matthew) (Filed on 9/4/2014) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

#54

(#54) Summons Issued on First Amended Complaint as to Bradley Popp. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

#55

(#55) Summons Issued on First Amended Complaint as to Yosemite Construction Inc. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

#56

(#56) ORDER GRANTING PETITION TO APPOINT CAROLYN GARISTO AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 8, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

#57

(#57) ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF PLAINTIFFS' CO-LIAISON COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 8, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF PLAINTIFFS' CO-LIAISON COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 8, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) ORDER GRANTING PETITION TO APPOINT CAROLYN GARISTO AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 8, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) Summons Issued on First Amended Complaint as to Yosemite Construction Inc. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) Summons Issued on First Amended Complaint as to Bradley Popp. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CROSS-CLAIMS filed by United States of America. (Barnette, Matthew) (Filed on 9/4/2014) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) Proposed Summons. (Owens, Bryan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) Proposed Summons. (Owens, Bryan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) Proposed Order For Appointment of Plaintiffs' Co-Liason Counsel by Carolyn Garisto. (Baghdadi, Khaldoun) (Filed on 9/3/2014) (Entered: 09/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) Proposed Order To Appoint Carolyn Garisto as Guardian ad Litem for Minor Plaintiffs K.G. and N.G. by Carolyn Garisto. (Baghdadi, Khaldoun) (Filed on 9/3/2014) (Entered: 09/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR MASTER CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs. Filed byCarolyn Garisto. (Baghdadi, Khaldoun) (Filed on 9/3/2014) (Entered: 09/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Bradley Popp and Yosemite Construction, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint for Damages byBradley Popp, Yosemite Construction Inc. (Fackler, Jeff) (Filed on 7/9/2014) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Frank J. Brier ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8749823.) filed by N. G., Carolyn Garisto. (Brier, Frank) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Daniel T. Brier ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8749788.) filed by N. G., Carolyn Garisto. (Brier, Daniel) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Suzanne P. Conaboy ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8749719.) filed by N. G., Carolyn Garisto. (Conaboy, Suzanne) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 2, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014) (Entered: 07/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION BY ALL PARTIES TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference currently set for July 25, 2014 is vacated and continued to August 15, 2014 at 10:30 a.m. A joint case management statement shall be filed no later than August 8, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 27, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Rupal Badani. (Bashant, June) (Filed on 6/27/2014) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. A Case Management Conference is scheduled for July 25, 2014, at 10:30 a.m., in Courtroom 7. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than July 18, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 19, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2014: # 1 Appendix Standing Order) (mmclc1, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) of CAE 13-0666 Mann et al v. Delaware North Companies Incorporated et al and CAE 14-0300 Carrillo v. DNC Parks &Resorts at Yosemite, Inc. et al. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multi District Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, that the action is transferred to the Northern District of California Creating MDL No. 3:14-md-2532 MMC. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.