This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:41:08 (UTC).

Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC et al v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/25/2015 Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against American Honda Motor Co , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne and Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-01877

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant, Consolidated Plaintiff and Consolidated Counter Defendant

Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC

Defendants

Honda of America Mfg., Inc.

American Honda Motor Co., Inc.

Counter Claimants and Consolidated Defendants

Smartlabs, Inc. d/b/a Insteon

Mercededs-Benz USA, LLC

AT&T Mobility LLC

Carrier Corporation

Consolidated Defendants and Counter Claimants

FCA US LLC

Smartlabs, Inc. d/b/a Insteon

Subaru of America, Inc.

Mercededs-Benz USA, LLC

AT&T Mobility LLC

Verizon Communications Inc

Carrier Corporation

Rheem Manufacturing

T-Mobile USA, Inc.

TOYOTA MOTOR SALES USA, INC

Hyundai Motor America

Toyota Motor Corporation

BMW of North America, LLC

Mazda Motor of North America Inc

Mazda Motor of North America, Inc.

Nexia Intelligence, LLC

Volvo Cars of North America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Consolidated Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Lauren Keller Katzenellenbogen

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson & Bear LLP - Irvine,CA

2040 Main St, Fourteenth Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

James Mark Mann

Attorney at Mann Tindel & Thompson

300 W. Main

Henderson, TX 75652

Monica Rae Hughes

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP - Dallas

2001 Ross Ave., Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201-2980

Jerry Tice, II

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP - Dallas

2001 Ross Ave., Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201-2980

Timothy S Durst

Attorney at Baker Botts - Dallas

2001 Ross Ave, 600 Trammell Crow Center

Dallas, TX 75201-2980

Bret Thomas Winterle

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Megan S Woodworth

Attorney at Venable LLP

575 7Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

S Neil Anderson

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP - CA

2475 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1194

Michael E Jones

Attorney at Potter Minton, a Professional Corporation

110 N College Avenue, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

John Russell Emerson

Attorney at Haynes & Boone, LLP - Dallas

2323 Victory Avenue, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75219

Bethany Karen Hrischuk

Attorney at Haynes & Boone, LLP - Dallas

2323 Victory Avenue, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75219

Matthew Philip Chiarizio

Attorney at Haynes and Boone LLP - Dallas

2323 Victory Avenue, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75219

Alex Verbin Chachkes

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe- New York

666 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10103-0001

Lillian Mao

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe - Menlo Park

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Leslie H Tronche

Attorney at Beck Redden LLP - Houston

1221 Mckinney, Suite 4500

Houston, TX 77010-2010

Thomas W Winland

Attorney at Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner LLP-DC

901 New York Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Mark A Baghdassarian

Attorney at Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

1177 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Allen Franklin Gardner

Attorney at Gillam & Smith LLP

102 N College, Suite 800

Tyler, TX 75702

Robert Benjamin Cassady

Attorney at Finnegan, LLP- Washington, DC

901 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Lionel Marks Lavenue

Attorney at Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunn LLP - Reston

Two Freedom Square, 11955 Freedom Drive

Reston, VA 20190

22 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Original Complaint against American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda of America Mfg., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5500422.), filed by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

#2

(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/28/15. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/28/2015)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Honda of America MFG Inc)(ch, ) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

#4

(#4) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Honda of America Mfg., Inc. (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

#5

(#5) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-cv-1877. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/22/16. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/23/2016)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dawn Michelle Jenkins on behalf of Subaru of America, Inc. (Jenkins, Dawn) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Keller Katzenellenbogen on behalf of Smartlabs, Inc. d/b/a Insteon (Katzenellenbogen, Lauren) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

#8

(#8) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael K Friedland on behalf of Smartlabs, Inc. d/b/a Insteon (Friedland, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

#63

(#63) NOTICE by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC Notice of Selection of Mediator (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

#62

(#62) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 by Mercededs-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

#61

(#61) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Stuart Gerchick on behalf of Mercededs-Benz USA, LLC (Gerchick, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#60

(#60) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Nelson Watkins on behalf of Mercededs-Benz USA, LLC (Watkins, Brett) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#59

(#59) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward J DeFranco on behalf of Mercededs-Benz USA, LLC (DeFranco, Edward) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#58

(#58) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., BMW of North America, LLC, FCA US LLC, Honda of America Mfg., Inc., Rheem Manufacturing, Smartlabs, Inc. d/b/a Insteon, Subaru of America, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., TOYOTA MOTOR SALES USA, INC, Toyota Motor Corporation, Volvo Cars of North America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Satchwell, Matthew) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#57

(#57) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hyundai Motor America.( Baghdassarian, Mark) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#56

(#56) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Benjamin Cassady on behalf of BMW of North America, LLC (Cassady, Robert) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#55

(#55) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank C Cimino, Jr on behalf of FCA US LLC (Cimino, Frank) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) NOTICE by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC Notice of Selection of Mediator (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 by Mercededs-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Stuart Gerchick on behalf of Mercededs-Benz USA, LLC (Gerchick, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Nelson Watkins on behalf of Mercededs-Benz USA, LLC (Watkins, Brett) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward J DeFranco on behalf of Mercededs-Benz USA, LLC (DeFranco, Edward) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., BMW of North America, LLC, FCA US LLC, Honda of America Mfg., Inc., Rheem Manufacturing, Smartlabs, Inc. d/b/a Insteon, Subaru of America, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., TOYOTA MOTOR SALES USA, INC, Toyota Motor Corporation, Volvo Cars of North America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Satchwell, Matthew) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hyundai Motor America.( Baghdassarian, Mark) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Benjamin Cassady on behalf of BMW of North America, LLC (Cassady, Robert) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank C Cimino, Jr on behalf of FCA US LLC (Cimino, Frank) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Hyundai Motor America (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Plaintiff Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and Counterclaims of Carrier Corporation by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC.(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael K Friedland on behalf of Smartlabs, Inc. d/b/a Insteon (Friedland, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Keller Katzenellenbogen on behalf of Smartlabs, Inc. d/b/a Insteon (Katzenellenbogen, Lauren) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dawn Michelle Jenkins on behalf of Subaru of America, Inc. (Jenkins, Dawn) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-cv-1877. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/22/16. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Honda of America Mfg., Inc. (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued as to American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Honda of America MFG Inc)(ch, ) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/28/15. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Original Complaint against American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda of America Mfg., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5500422.), filed by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.