This case was last updated from PACER on 05/27/2016 at 17:19:27 (UTC).

Ross Weintraub v. Elon Musk et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Ross Weintraub filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Elon Musk. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Hon. Charles R. Breyer and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-02817

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. Charles R. Breyer

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ross Weintraub

Defendants

Ira Ehrenpreis

Kimbal Musk

Steve Jurvetson

Antonio J. Gracias

Tesla Motors, Inc

Brad W. Buss

Harald Kroeger

Elon Musk

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vahn Alexander

Attorney at The Alexander Firm P.C. - A Professional Law Corporation

1875 Century Park East, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Charles Edward Elder

Attorney at Irell and Manella LLP

1800 Ave Of The Stars 9Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276

Colin T Roth

Attorney at Irell and Manella LLP

1800 Ave Of The Stars Ste 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#1

No Description Available

#11

(#11) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying Litigation filed by Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc. (Elder, Charles) (Filed on 8/21/2014) (Entered: 08/21/2014)

1 #1

No Description Available

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Alexander, Vahn) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#3

(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2014. Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Steve Jurvetson, Harald Kroeger, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ross Weintraub. Service waived by Brad W. Buss waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014; Ira Ehrenpreis waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014; Antonio J. Gracias waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014; Steve Jurvetson waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014; Elon Musk waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014; Kimbal Musk waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014; Tesla Motors, Inc waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014. (Alexander, Vahn) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc.. (Elder, Charles) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

#8

(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

#9

(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as the referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 7/17/2014. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

#10

(#10) ORDER RELATING CASE C-14-2817RMW to C-13-5216CRB. Counsel are instructed that all future filings in any reassigned case are to bear the initials of the newly assigned judge (CRB) immediately after the case number, Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/21/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014) (Entered: 08/21/2014)

#12

(#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc (Roth, Colin) (Filed on 8/21/2014) (Entered: 08/21/2014)

#13

(#13) ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 11 Stipulation Staying Litigation pending disposition of motion to dismiss in Securities Action. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014) Modified on 8/29/2014 (beS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/22/2014)

#14

(#14) Certificate of Interested Entities by Ross Weintraub (Alexander, Vahn) (Filed on 9/23/2014) (Entered: 09/23/2014)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Action Without Prejudice by Ross Weintraub (Alexander, Vahn) (Filed on 10/10/2014) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

#17

(#17) ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting (43) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:13-cv-05216-CRB (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014) (Entered: 12/05/2014)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting (43) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:13-cv-05216-CRB (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014) (Entered: 12/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Action Without Prejudice by Ross Weintraub (Alexander, Vahn) (Filed on 10/10/2014) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Harald Kroeger Without Prejudice by Ross Weintraub (Alexander, Vahn) (Filed on 9/23/2014) (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Certificate of Interested Entities by Ross Weintraub (Alexander, Vahn) (Filed on 9/23/2014) (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 11 Stipulation Staying Litigation pending disposition of motion to dismiss in Securities Action. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014) Modified on 8/29/2014 (beS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc (Roth, Colin) (Filed on 8/21/2014) (Entered: 08/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying Litigation filed by Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc. (Elder, Charles) (Filed on 8/21/2014) (Entered: 08/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER RELATING CASE C-14-2817RMW to C-13-5216CRB. Counsel are instructed that all future filings in any reassigned case are to bear the initials of the newly assigned judge (CRB) immediately after the case number, Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/21/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014) (Entered: 08/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as the referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 7/17/2014. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc.. (Elder, Charles) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ross Weintraub. Service waived by Brad W. Buss waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014; Ira Ehrenpreis waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014; Antonio J. Gracias waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014; Steve Jurvetson waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014; Elon Musk waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014; Kimbal Musk waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014; Tesla Motors, Inc waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014. (Alexander, Vahn) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Steve Jurvetson, Harald Kroeger, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2014. Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Alexander, Vahn) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8706450.). Filed byRoss Weintraub. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, Vahn) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less