This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 08:37:57 (UTC).

Rosciano v. Experian et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2014 Rosciano filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Neil V Wake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-02102

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Neil V Wake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Rosciano

Mesa, AZ 85210

Defendants

Midland Funding

T-Mobile USA Incorporated

Experian Information Solutions Incorporated

Midland Credit Management Incorporated

Experian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Ronald Ayers

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP - Phoenix, AZ

3200 N Central Ave., Ste. 800

Phoenix, AZ 85012-2428

Bradley Lynn Dunn

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP - Phoenix, AZ

3200 N Central Ave., Ste. 800

Phoenix, AZ 85012-2428

Randy Jiro Aoyama

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP - Phoenix, AZ

3200 N Central Ave., Ste. 800

Phoenix, AZ 85012-2428

Matthew Benjamin du Mee

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - Phoenix, AZ

P.O. Box 400

Phoenix, AZ 85001-0400

Jean-Jacques Cabou

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - Phoenix, AZ

P.O. Box 400

Phoenix, AZ 85001-0400

Jonathan Adam Dessaules

Attorney at Dessaules Law Group

5353 N 16Th St., Ste. 110

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Angela M Taylor

Attorney at Jones Day

3161 Michelson Drive, Ste 800

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2015
  • (#39) ORDER that Defendant Midland's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) (Doc. 23 ) is granted with leave to amend by 01/30/15. If by that date Plaintiff has not filed an amended complaint, Defendant Midland's motion will be granted with prejudice. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 1/13/15. (NKS) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • (#38) REPLY to Response to Motion re: 23 MOTION to Dismiss Case /Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) And to Rosciano's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Midland Credit Management Incorporated, Midland Funding. (Ayers, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • (#37) ORDER that Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Claims (Doc. 13 ) is granted. This action will be stayed until Plaintiff has exhausted his arbitration remedy. If Plaintiff does not commence arbitration proceedings by 02/20/15, this action will be dismissed as against Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 12/19/14. (NKS) (Entered: 12/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • (#36) ORDER denying 33 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is denied without prejudice to filing a proper motion for leave to file and amended complaint. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 12/19/2014.(LMR) (Entered: 12/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • (#35) REPLY to Response to Motion re: 33 MOTION to Amend/Correct, 13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Claims filed by T-Mobile USA Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(du Mee, Matthew) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • (#34) AFFIDAVIT of Jose Rosciano in Support of re: 33 RESPONSE to Motion re: 23 MOTION to Dismiss Case /Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) by Plaintiff Jose Rosciano. (KMG) (Entered: 12/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • (#33) RESPONSE to Motion re: 23 MOTION to Dismiss Case /Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) and MOTION to Amend/Correct re 1 Complaint filed by Jose Rosciano. (KMG). (Entered: 12/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • (#32) AFFIDAVIT of Jose Rosciano in Support of re: 31 Response to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Claims by Plaintiff Jose Rosciano. (KMG) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • (#31) RESPONSE to Motion re: 13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Claims filed by Jose Rosciano. (KMG) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • (#30) ORDER: The Court having reviewed the Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to "Defendants" Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Rule 12(B)(6) Stay Claims (Doc. 29 ), ORDERED granting the Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have up to and including December 10, 2014, to file a response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Rule 12(B)(6) (Doc. 23 ). No further extension will be granted. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS) (Entered: 11/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2014
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Midland Credit Management Incorporated, Midland Funding. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Ayers, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ronald Ayers on behalf of Midland Credit Management Incorporated, Midland Funding. (Ayers, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • (#8) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Order upon Experian Information Solutions, Inc on 10/3/2014. (KMG) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • (#7) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Order upon Midland Funding NCC-2 Corporation on 10/3/2014. (KMG) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • (#6) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Order upon T-Mobile USA, Inc on 10/3/2014. (KMG) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • (#5) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Order upon Midland Credit Management, Inc on 10/3/2014. (KMG) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • (#4) *SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Order upon Experian Information Solutions Inc on 10/8/2014. (KMG) *Modified to correct served upon date on 10/10/2014 (KMG). (Entered: 10/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • (#3) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(c) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 9/24/14. (CLB) (Entered: 09/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • (#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX150622. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Neil V. Wake. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-14-02102-PHX=-NVW. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAS) (Entered: 09/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX150622 filed by Jose Rosciano (5 pages). (Attachments: # 1 civil cover sheet)(BAS) (Entered: 09/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less