This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2016 at 22:24:29 (UTC).

ROSADO v. ARAMARK et al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2014 ROSADO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ARAMARK. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-03033

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUAN ROSADO

Defendants and Cross Defendants

JOSE LUIS BOGGIO

ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.

ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES

ARARMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC

CORIZON

EVARISTO EVANGELISTA

NOI WALKENSTEIN

ARAMARK CORPORATION

CORIZON HEALTH, INC.

ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY SERVICES, INC.

KALU

U.S. FACILITIES, INC.

JAMES ARNONE

ARAMARK

MARIE BROWN ETRIS

PRWT SERVICES, INC.

PAULA PATTON

CITY OF PHILADELPHIA

Defendants, Cross Claimants and Cross Defendants

CORIZON

EVARISTO EVANGELISTA

CORIZON HEALTH, INC.

KALU

U.S. FACILITIES, INC.

JAMES ARNONE

PRWT SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RANIA MAJOR TRUNFIO

2915 North 5Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19133

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

ROBERT CONNELL PUGH

Attorney at KANE, PUGH, KNOELL & DRISCOLL, LLP

510 Swede Street

Norristown, PA 19401

EVELYN R. DEVINE

Attorney at KANE PUGH KNOELL TROY & KRAMER LLP

510 Swede St

Norristown, PA 19401

STEPHEN E. SIEGRIST

Attorney at O'CONNOR KIMBALL, LLP

15Th St & John F. Kennedy Blvd, Suite 1100

Philadelphia, PA 19102

DREW L. MALLICK

Attorney at MARKS O'NEILL O'BRIEN DOHERTY & KELLY PC

1800 John F Kennedy Blvd Ste 1900

Philadelphia, PA 19103

PATRICK C. LAMB

Attorney at MARKS O'NEILL O'BRIEN DOHERTY & KELLY PC

1800 John F. Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 1900

Philadelphia, PA 19103

SUSAN M. CIRILLI

Attorney at FOWLER HIRTZEL MCNULTY & SPAULDING, LLP

2000 Market Street, Suite 1840

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JOHN R. MCHAFFIE, JR.

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF JEFFREY EISEMAN

1515 Market Street, Suite 1802

Philadelphia, PA 19102

MICHAEL R. MILLER

Attorney at CITY OF PHILADELPHIA LAW DEPT

1515 Arch St 14Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19102

CHRISTOPHER H. RIDER

Attorney at CITY OF PHILADELPHIA LAW DEPT

1515 Arch St., 14Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA from Philadelphia CCP, case number 140200991. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 101875), Certificate of Service.(tj, ) (Entered: 05/29/2014)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK C. LAMB on behalf of U.S. FACILITIES, INC. with Jury Demand(LAMB, PATRICK) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN E. SIEGRIST on behalf of CORIZON, CORIZON HEALTH, INC., EVARISTO EVANGELISTA, KALU with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(SIEGRIST, STEPHEN) Modified on 6/2/2014 (lisad, ). (Entered: 05/30/2014)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Valitas Health Services, Inc by CORIZON, CORIZON HEALTH, INC..(SIEGRIST, STEPHEN) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

#5

(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(MILLER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/02/2014)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Certificate of Service, CROSSCLAIM against ARAMARK, ARAMARK CORPORATION, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY SERVICES, INC., ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., ARARMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC, PRWT SERVICES, INC., U.S. FACILITIES, INC. by KALU, CORIZON HEALTH, INC., JAMES ARNONE, CORIZON, EVARISTO EVANGELISTA.(SIEGRIST, STEPHEN) *FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY RE-FILED AT DOC. 11 * Modified on 6/9/2014 (lisad, ). (Entered: 06/05/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by EVELYN R. DEVINE on behalf of ARAMARK, ARAMARK CORPORATION, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY SERVICES, INC., ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., ARARMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC with Jury Demand(DEVINE, EVELYN) (Entered: 06/05/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT CONNELL PUGH on behalf of ARAMARK, ARAMARK CORPORATION, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY SERVICES, INC., ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., ARARMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC with Jury Demand(PUGH, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/05/2014)

#9

(#9) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ARAMARK Corporation, parent company of ARAMARK Correctional Services, LLC, which owns 100% of ARAMARK Correctional Services, LLC. ARAMARK Corporation is, in turn, owned by ARAMARK Intermediate Holdco Corporation, which is, in turn, owned by ARAMARK Holdings Corporation. by ARAMARK, ARAMARK CORPORATION, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY SERVICES, INC., ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., ARARMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC.(PUGH, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/05/2014)

#48

(#48) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 11/25/2014. (kp, ) (Entered: 11/26/2014)

#47

(#47) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS DISMISSED AND REMANDED TO THE PHILADELPHIA COURT OF COMMON PLEAS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 11/25/2014. 11/26/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 11/26/2014)

#46

(#46) Report Of F.R.C.P. 26(f) MEETING by ARAMARK, ARAMARK CORPORATION, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY SERVICES, INC., ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., ARARMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PRWT SERVICES, INC., U.S. FACILITIES, INC.. (MCHAFFIE, JOHN) (Entered: 11/20/2014)

#45

(#45) MOTION to Compel Answers to Defendant U.S. Facilities, Inc.'s Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by U.S. FACILITIES, INC..Certificate of Service.(MALLICK, DREW) (Entered: 11/20/2014)

#44

(#44) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MICHAEL R. MILLER on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA(MILLER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

#43

(#43) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER H. RIDER on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA with Certificate of Service(RIDER, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

#42

(#42) Defendant U.S. Facilities ANSWER to 6 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by U.S. FACILITIES, INC..(MALLICK, DREW) (Entered: 11/17/2014)

#41

(#41) ORDER THAT THE ORDER OF 11/7/2014 IS CLARIFIED THAT PHILADELPHIA'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS GRANTED BUT ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT COUNT 4 OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM IS DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 11/14/2014. 11/14/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 11/14/2014)

#40

(#40) First MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Full and Complete Answers to Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by ARAMARK, ARAMARK CORPORATION, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY SERVICES, INC., ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., ARARMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC.Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 5 Certificate of Counsel)(DEVINE, EVELYN) (Entered: 11/13/2014)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 11/25/2014. (kp, ) (Entered: 11/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS DISMISSED AND REMANDED TO THE PHILADELPHIA COURT OF COMMON PLEAS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 11/25/2014. 11/26/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 11/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) Report Of F.R.C.P. 26(f) MEETING by ARAMARK, ARAMARK CORPORATION, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY SERVICES, INC., ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., ARARMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PRWT SERVICES, INC., U.S. FACILITIES, INC.. (MCHAFFIE, JOHN) (Entered: 11/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) MOTION to Compel Answers to Defendant U.S. Facilities, Inc.'s Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by U.S. FACILITIES, INC..Certificate of Service.(MALLICK, DREW) (Entered: 11/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MICHAEL R. MILLER on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA(MILLER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER H. RIDER on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA with Certificate of Service(RIDER, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) Defendant U.S. Facilities ANSWER to 6 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by U.S. FACILITIES, INC..(MALLICK, DREW) (Entered: 11/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) ORDER THAT THE ORDER OF 11/7/2014 IS CLARIFIED THAT PHILADELPHIA'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS GRANTED BUT ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT COUNT 4 OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM IS DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 11/14/2014. 11/14/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 11/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) First MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Full and Complete Answers to Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by ARAMARK, ARAMARK CORPORATION, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY SERVICES, INC., ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., ARARMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC.Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 5 Certificate of Counsel)(DEVINE, EVELYN) (Entered: 11/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) Rule 26 Initial Disclosures with Certificate of Service by ARAMARK, ARAMARK CORPORATION, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY SERVICES, INC., ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., ARARMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(DEVINE, EVELYN) Modified on 11/13/2014 (tjd). (Entered: 11/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Demand for Punitve Damages filed by ARAMARK, ARAMARK CORPORATION, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY SERVICES, INC., ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., ARARMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Certificate of Service)(PUGH, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ARAMARK Corporation, parent company of ARAMARK Correctional Services, LLC, which owns 100% of ARAMARK Correctional Services, LLC. ARAMARK Corporation is, in turn, owned by ARAMARK Intermediate Holdco Corporation, which is, in turn, owned by ARAMARK Holdings Corporation. by ARAMARK, ARAMARK CORPORATION, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY SERVICES, INC., ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., ARARMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC.(PUGH, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT CONNELL PUGH on behalf of ARAMARK, ARAMARK CORPORATION, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY SERVICES, INC., ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., ARARMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC with Jury Demand(PUGH, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by EVELYN R. DEVINE on behalf of ARAMARK, ARAMARK CORPORATION, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY SERVICES, INC., ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., ARARMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC with Jury Demand(DEVINE, EVELYN) (Entered: 06/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Certificate of Service, CROSSCLAIM against ARAMARK, ARAMARK CORPORATION, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY SERVICES, INC., ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., ARARMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC, PRWT SERVICES, INC., U.S. FACILITIES, INC. by KALU, CORIZON HEALTH, INC., JAMES ARNONE, CORIZON, EVARISTO EVANGELISTA.(SIEGRIST, STEPHEN) *FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY RE-FILED AT DOC. 11 * Modified on 6/9/2014 (lisad, ). (Entered: 06/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(MILLER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Valitas Health Services, Inc by CORIZON, CORIZON HEALTH, INC..(SIEGRIST, STEPHEN) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN E. SIEGRIST on behalf of CORIZON, CORIZON HEALTH, INC., EVARISTO EVANGELISTA, KALU with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(SIEGRIST, STEPHEN) Modified on 6/2/2014 (lisad, ). (Entered: 05/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK C. LAMB on behalf of U.S. FACILITIES, INC. with Jury Demand(LAMB, PATRICK) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA from Philadelphia CCP, case number 140200991. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 101875), Certificate of Service.(tj, ) (Entered: 05/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.