This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2016 at 08:17:54 (UTC).

Rodenhouse Body Shop, Inc. et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2014 Rodenhouse Body Shop, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith and Judge Gregory A. Presnell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:14-CV-06007

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith

Judge

Judge Gregory A. Presnell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Professional Finish, Inc.

Lantagne's Auto Body, LLC

H.D. Way Corporation

Rodenhouse Body Shop, Inc.

Defendants

Donegal Mutual Insurance Company

Hanover American Insurance Company, The

Michigan Millers Mutual Insurance Company

Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Grange Insurance Co. of Michigan

Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Wolverine Mutual Insurance Company

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company

Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Michigan

Hanover Insurance Company, The

Farmers Insurance Exchange

Meemic Insurance Company

Pioneer State Mutual Insurance Company

Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan

Secura Insurance a Mutual Company

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew John Rodenhouse

Attorney at Rodenhouse Kuipers, PC

678 Front Ave. Nw

Grand Rapids, MI 49504-5300

William R. Sevier

Attorney at John Arthur Eaves, Attorneys at Law

101 N. State St.

Jackson, MS 39201-2811

John Arthur Eaves, Jr.

Attorney at John Arthur Eaves, Attorney at Law

101 North State Street

Jackson, MS 39201

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas A. French

Attorney at Rhoads & Sinon, LLP

1 S Market Sq - 12Th Floor, Po Box 1146

Harrisburg, PA 17108-1146

Lori McAllister

Attorney at Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Suite 900, 201 Townsend St

Lansing, MI 48933

Mark L. Hanover

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

Suite 7800, 233 S Wacker Dr

Chicago, IL 60606

Richard L. Fenton

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

233 S Wacker Dr Ste 5900

Chicago, IL 60606-6361

Bonnie Lau

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Lori J. Caldwell

Attorney at Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, PA

300 S Orange Ave - Ste 1400, Po Box 1873

Orlando, FL 32802-1873

David Michael Peterson, II

Attorney at Wolverine Mutual Insurance Company

One Wolverine Way

Dowagiac, MI 49047-0530

Anthony S. Kogut

Attorney at Willingham & Cote PC

333 Albert Ave., Ste. 500

East Lansing, MI 48823-4394

Scott Lee Mandel

Attorney at Foster, Swift, Collins & Smith, PC

313 S. Washington Square

Lansing, MI 48933-2193

Other Attorneys

Christine A. Hopkinson

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Steven F. Griffith, Jr.

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Suite 3600, 201 St Charles Ave

New Orleans, LA 70170

Johanna W. Clark

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA

450 S. Orange Ave.

Orlando, FL 32801

Thomas G. Rohback

Attorney at Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider, LLP

90 State House Square

Hartford, CT 06103

Jeffrey S. Cashdan

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Michael Beekhuizen

Attorney at Carpenter Lipps & Leland LLP

280 N High St

Columbus, OH 43215

Claire Carothers Oates

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Elizabeth Helmer

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

Suite 4200, 1201 W Peachtree St

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

34 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#49

(#49) ORDER directing Clerk to close file. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/21/2015. (ED) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by plaintiffs Bernardi & Judge Corp, Clarkston Auto Body II, Inc., Clarkston Auto Body, Inc., Classic Auto Collision, Inc., H.D. Way Corporation, Jerry's Body Shop, Inc., Judd's Body Shop, Inc., Lantange's Auto Body, LLC, Northville Collision, Inc., Professional Finish, Inc., R & R Auto Body Repair, Inc., Rodenhouse Body Shop, Inc. (Rodenhouse, Andrew) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.] (Entered: 10/27/2014)

#42

(#42) ORDER to remove William R. Sevier from the CM/ECF service list and discontinue serving pleadings and papers on him. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

#44

(#44) ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (199) Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Christine A. Hopkinson terminated as counsel for Progressive defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/26/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 06/26/2015)

#47

(#47) ORDER granting 36 motion to dismiss; terminating 41 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint by September 8, 2015.Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/17/2015. Copies mailed. (LAM) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (O'Brien, David) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.] (Entered: 11/12/2014)

#43

(#43) ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (195) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

#48

(#48) ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (223) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cynthia M Locke terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases in which she has appeared. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/18/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

#3

(#3) FIRST MOTION to expedite the return to Plaintiffs the proposed Summonses by plaintiffs Bernardi & Judge Corp, Clarkston Auto Body II, Inc., Clarkston Auto Body, Inc., Classic Auto Collision, Inc., H.D. Way Corporation, Jerry's Body Shop, Inc., Judd's Body Shop, Inc., Lantange's Auto Body, LLC, Northville Collision, Inc., Professional Finish, Inc., R & R Auto Body Repair, Inc., Rodenhouse Body Shop, Inc.; (Rodenhouse, Andrew) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.] (Entered: 10/27/2014)

#41

(#41) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: all pending motions to dismiss in cases 6:14-cv-6006, 6:14-cv-6007, 6:14-cv-6008, 6:14-cv-6009, 6:14-cv-6010, 6:14-cv-6011, 6:14-cv-6012, 6:14-cv-6013, 6:14-cv-6014, 6:14-cv-6015, 6:14-cv-6018, 6:14-cv-6019, 6:14-cv-6020, and 6:15-cv-6022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/3/2015. (SMW) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

#46

(#46) RESPONSE to 45 objections to 41 Report and Recommendations by Allmerica Financial Alliance Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Auto Club Group Insurance Company, Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Cincinatti Insurance Company, The, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Donegal Mutual Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan, Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Michigan, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Co. of Michigan, Hanover American Insurance Company, The, Hanover Insurance Company, The, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hastings Mutual Insurance Company, Horace Mann Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Meemic Insurance Company, Michigan Millers Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Pioneer State Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Ins. Co., Progressive Michigan Ins. Co., Secura Insurance a Mutual Company, Secura Supreme Insurance Company, State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Wolverine Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Yohai, David) Modified on 7/17/2015 (JET). (Entered: 07/16/2015)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (O'Brien, David) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.] (Entered: 11/12/2014)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to all defendants (kvt) Modified text on 10/27/2014 (kvt). [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.] (Entered: 10/27/2014)

#45

(#45) OMNIBUS OBJECTION filed by Various Plaintiffs re 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (94 in 6:14-cv-06008-GAP-TBS) Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8 and 12(B)(6) and Supporting Memorandum of Law (Fry, Allison) Modified on 6/30/2015 (IGC). Modified on 6/30/2015 (LAK). (Entered: 06/29/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Judge Gordon J. Quist (kvt) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.] (Entered: 10/27/2014)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (Attachments: # 1 Additional Summons)(Rodenhouse, Andrew) Modified text on 10/27/2014 (kvt). [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.] (Entered: 10/27/2014)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS returned executed; All Defendants (Rodenhouse, Andrew) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.] (Entered: 10/30/2014)

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) ORDER directing Clerk to close file. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/21/2015. (ED) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (223) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cynthia M Locke terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases in which she has appeared. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/18/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) ORDER granting 36 motion to dismiss; terminating 41 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint by September 8, 2015.Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/17/2015. Copies mailed. (LAM) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) RESPONSE to 45 objections to 41 Report and Recommendations by Allmerica Financial Alliance Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Auto Club Group Insurance Company, Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Cincinatti Insurance Company, The, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Donegal Mutual Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan, Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Michigan, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Co. of Michigan, Hanover American Insurance Company, The, Hanover Insurance Company, The, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hastings Mutual Insurance Company, Horace Mann Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Meemic Insurance Company, Michigan Millers Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Pioneer State Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Ins. Co., Progressive Michigan Ins. Co., Secura Insurance a Mutual Company, Secura Supreme Insurance Company, State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Wolverine Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Yohai, David) Modified on 7/17/2015 (JET). (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) OMNIBUS OBJECTION filed by Various Plaintiffs re 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (94 in 6:14-cv-06008-GAP-TBS) Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8 and 12(B)(6) and Supporting Memorandum of Law (Fry, Allison) Modified on 6/30/2015 (IGC). Modified on 6/30/2015 (LAK). (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (199) Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Christine A. Hopkinson terminated as counsel for Progressive defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/26/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 06/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (195) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER to remove William R. Sevier from the CM/ECF service list and discontinue serving pleadings and papers on him. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: all pending motions to dismiss in cases 6:14-cv-6006, 6:14-cv-6007, 6:14-cv-6008, 6:14-cv-6009, 6:14-cv-6010, 6:14-cv-6011, 6:14-cv-6012, 6:14-cv-6013, 6:14-cv-6014, 6:14-cv-6015, 6:14-cv-6018, 6:14-cv-6019, 6:14-cv-6020, and 6:15-cv-6022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/3/2015. (SMW) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Carothers Oates on behalf of Progressive Marathon Ins. Co., Progressive Michigan Ins. Co. (Oates, Claire) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) JOINT MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Expedited Consideration Requested, by defendants Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company, Hanover American Insurance Company, The, Hanover Insurance Company, The, Hastings Mutual Insurance Company, Michigan Millers Mutual Insurance Company, Pioneer State Mutual Insurance Company, Secura Insurance a Mutual Company, Secura Supreme Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company; (McAllister, Lori) Modified text on 11/13/2014 (pjw). [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.] (Entered: 11/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (O'Brien, David) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.] (Entered: 11/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (O'Brien, David) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.] (Entered: 11/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS returned executed; All Defendants (Rodenhouse, Andrew) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.] (Entered: 10/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to all defendants (kvt) Modified text on 10/27/2014 (kvt). [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.] (Entered: 10/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Judge Gordon J. Quist (kvt) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.] (Entered: 10/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by plaintiffs Bernardi & Judge Corp, Clarkston Auto Body II, Inc., Clarkston Auto Body, Inc., Classic Auto Collision, Inc., H.D. Way Corporation, Jerry's Body Shop, Inc., Judd's Body Shop, Inc., Lantange's Auto Body, LLC, Northville Collision, Inc., Professional Finish, Inc., R & R Auto Body Repair, Inc., Rodenhouse Body Shop, Inc. (Rodenhouse, Andrew) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.] (Entered: 10/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FIRST MOTION to expedite the return to Plaintiffs the proposed Summonses by plaintiffs Bernardi & Judge Corp, Clarkston Auto Body II, Inc., Clarkston Auto Body, Inc., Classic Auto Collision, Inc., H.D. Way Corporation, Jerry's Body Shop, Inc., Judd's Body Shop, Inc., Lantange's Auto Body, LLC, Northville Collision, Inc., Professional Finish, Inc., R & R Auto Body Repair, Inc., Rodenhouse Body Shop, Inc.; (Rodenhouse, Andrew) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.] (Entered: 10/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (Attachments: # 1 Additional Summons)(Rodenhouse, Andrew) Modified text on 10/27/2014 (kvt). [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.] (Entered: 10/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by H.D. Way Corporation, Bernardi & Judge Corp, Rodenhouse Body Shop, Inc., R & R Auto Body Repair, Inc., Judd's Body Shop, Inc., Lantange's Auto Body, LLC, Professional Finish, Inc., Classic Auto Collision, Inc., Jerry's Body Shop, Inc., Northville Collision, Inc., Clarkston Auto Body, Inc., Clarkston Auto Body II, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibits 1-4, # 2 Summonses)(Rodenhouse, Andrew) Modified text on 10/27/2014 (kvt). [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.] (Entered: 10/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.