This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2016 at 09:17:11 (UTC).

Rockwood Select Asset Fund XI, (6)-1, LLC v. Devine, Millimet & Branch, P.A. et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2014 Rockwood Select Asset Fund XI, 6 -1, LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Devine, Millimet Branch, P A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00303

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Judge

Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rockwood Select Asset Fund XI, (6)-1, LLC

Defendants

Karen S. McGinley

Devine, Millimet & Branch, P.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Norman Williams

Attorney at Gravel & Shea PC

Po Box 369

Burlington, VT 05402-0369

Robert F. O'Neill

Attorney at Gravel & Shea PC

Po Box 369

Burlington, VT 05402-0369

Finis E. Williams, III

Attorney at Williams Law Office

15 North Main St, Ste 206

Concord, NH 03301

Defendant Attorneys

James C. Wheat

Attorney at Wadleigh Starr & Peters

95 Market St

Manchester, NH 03101

Pierre A. Chabot

Attorney at Wadleigh Starr & Peters PLLC

95 Market St

Manchester, NH 03101

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

#16

#17

#18

#19

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER approving with changes 12 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3-4 days. Case Track: Standard. Amendment of pleadings by 1/5/2015. Mediation Follow Up on 7/1/2015. Summary Judgment Motions due by 10/2/2015. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb) (Entered: 11/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Pierre A. Chabot on behalf of Devine, Millimet & Branch, P.A., Karen S. McGinley Attorney Pierre A. Chabot added to party Devine, Millimet & Branch, P.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Pierre A. Chabot added to party Karen S. McGinley(pty:dft).(Chabot, Pierre) (Entered: 10/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for October 30, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb) (Entered: 10/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE re 13 Order, Set Deadlines,, filed by Rockwood Select Asset Fund XI, (6)-1, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Ex. A Purjes Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Ex. B Kissell Affidavit, # 3 Attachment to Exhibit Ex 1 to Kissell Aff.-Listing Devine Offices, # 4 Attachment to Exhibit Ex 2 Kissell Aff.-Devine Shareholders)(Williams, Finis) (Entered: 10/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Assented to MOTION for Norman Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1151548.) filed by Rockwood Select Asset Fund XI, (6)-1, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Affidavit of Norman Williams)(Williams, Finis) (Entered: 09/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Assented to MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert F. O'Neill (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1151529.) filed by Rockwood Select Asset Fund XI, (6)-1, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Affidavit of Robert F. O'Neill)(Williams, Finis) Modified on 9/25/2014 to add: Robert F. O'Neill(cmp). (Entered: 09/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) PROCEDURAL ORDER re subject-matter jurisdiction. Rockwood to respond as outlined no later than October 3, 2014. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of this action for failure to establish subject-matter jurisdiction. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 10/3/2014.(jb) (Entered: 09/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Proposed Discovery Plan on behalf of both Parties filed by Devine, Millimet & Branch, P.A., Karen S. McGinley. In cases assigned to the Magistrate Judge, plaintiff, or the removing defendant if the case was initiated by a Notice of Removal, is responsible for filing a consent form on or before the deadline for filing the Discovery Plan using the Other Documents/Magistrate Judge Assignment--Consent/Objection event.(Wheat, James) (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NO CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Because not all parties to the case consent to the assignment of a United States Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, 28 U.S.C. sec. 636(c), and Local Rule 73.1(b)(2), the case will be assigned to a United States District Judge. Clerk James R. Starr. (Williams, Finis) (Entered: 09/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff(s) for service on all parties.(ko) (Entered: 09/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Landya B. McCafferty recused. So Ordered by District Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(ko) (Entered: 09/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to 1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand filed by Devine, Millimet & Branch, P.A., Karen S. McGinley.(Wheat, James) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Disclosure Statement by Devine, Millimet & Branch, P.A., Karen S. McGinley disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Wheat, James) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James C. Wheat on behalf of Devine, Millimet & Branch, P.A., Karen S. McGinley Attorney James C. Wheat added to party Devine, Millimet & Branch, P.A.(pty:dft), Attorney James C. Wheat added to party Karen S. McGinley(pty:dft).(Wheat, James) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Karen S. McGinley by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 7/10/2014. Answer Follow Up on 9/15/2014.(Williams, Finis) (Entered: 07/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Devine, Millimet & Branch, P.A. by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 7/10/2014. Answer Follow Up on 9/15/2014.(Williams, Finis) (Entered: 07/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Disclosure Statement by Rockwood Select Asset Fund XI, (6)-1, LLC disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Williams, Finis) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summonses and Waivers issued electronically as to Devine, Millimet & Branch, P.A., Karen S. McGinley. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: # 1 Notice ECF)(jeb) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1125833 filed by Rockwood Select Asset Fund XI, (6)-1, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons-Waiver Devine, # 3 Summons - Waiver McGinley)(Williams, Finis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2014: # 4 Complaint-text searchable version) (jeb). (Entered: 07/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less