This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:43:16 (UTC).

Roche et al v. S-3 Pump Service, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2015 Roche filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against S-3 Pump Service, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-00268

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Xavier Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stephen Moore

Kelby Gogenola

Matthew Griffin

Michael Sperling

Shawn Lars

William Featherly

Ethan Jessee

Gary Battlefield

Brandon Green

Donnie Lang

Danny Bridgewater

Patrick Masterson

Chris Mitchell

David Jurgens

Samuel Todd Parker

Justin Muller

Christopher Clark

Chris Schell

Jason Roche

Jeremy Cravens

48 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Josh Sanford

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm PLLC

One Financial Center

Little Rock, AR 72211

Other Attorneys

Jennifer Walls Hilburn

Attorney at Hilburn & Hilburn, APLC

220 Carroll Street, Building B

Shreveport, LA 71105

Cary Allen Hilburn

Attorney at Hilburn & Hilburn - APLC

220 Carroll Street, Building B

Shreveport, LA 71105

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Collective Action) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7351239), filed by Sean Follis, Blake Vines, David Jurgens, Shane Talley, Jason Roche, James Wedgeworth, Brandon Burris. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Consents to Join (All Plaintiffs), # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Brandon Burris, Sean Follis, David Jurgens, Jason Roche, Shane Talley, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth. to Defendant S-3 Pump Service, Inc. (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to S-3 Pump Service, Inc.. (wg) (Entered: 04/10/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE Consent to Join Collective Action -- Mark Burton by Brandon Burris, Sean Follis, David Jurgens, Jason Roche, Shane Talley, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE Consent to Join -- Jeffery Grabner by Brandon Burris, Sean Follis, David Jurgens, Jason Roche, Shane Talley, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE Consent to Join -- Syler Gassner by Brandon Burris, Mark Burton, Sean Follis, Jeff Grabner, David Jurgens, Jason Roche, Shane Talley (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE Consent to Join -- Patrick Masterson by Brandon Burris, Mark Burton, Sean Follis, Jeff Grabner, David Jurgens, Jason Roche, Shane Talley (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE Consent to Join -- Chris Schell by Brandon Burris, Mark Burton, Sean Follis, Jeff Grabner, David Jurgens, Jason Roche, Shane Talley, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 04/14/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE Consent to Join -- Justino Pena by Brandon Burris, Mark Burton, Sean Follis, Skyler Gassner, Jeff Grabner, David Jurgens, Patrick Masterson, Jason Roche, Chris Schell, Shane Talley, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 04/14/2015)

#75

(#75) ORDER GRANTING 40 Motion to Conditional Certification Class of this case. The Court Order the Plaintiff to supply the Defendant within (14) Days a list of Current and Former Employees in the class listed. Plaintiffs shall send potential class members the Court Approved Notice, deadline for opt-in is (60) Days from the date of the mailing of the notices. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 07/09/2015)

#74

(#74) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Aaron Anthony, Gary Battlefield, Sean Bice, James Boyd, George Brice, Danny Bridgewater, Brandon Burris, Mark Burton, Frank Cilluffo, Christopher Clark, Joe Conger, Jeremy Cravens, Kienen Ennis, James Estes, Josh Farley, William Featherly, Sean Follis, Emanuel Ford, Edward Franks, Theral Wesley Gandy, Kristopher Garrett, Skyler Gassner, James Glover, Kelby Gogenola, Jeff Grabner, Brandon Green, Matthew Griffin, Michael Hatala, Willie Holloway, Michael A. Horton, Ethan Jessee, Rodney Johnson, Justin Jones, Michael Josey, David Jurgens, Donnie Lang, Shawn Lars, Roy Lewis, Shannon Lewis, Shunn Lewis, Tanner Litton, Patrick Masterson, Chris Mitchell, Dustin Moore, Stephen Moore, Justin Muller, Aaron Normand, Mike Norsworthy, Tony Odenbaugh, Christopher Otto, Samuel Todd Parker, Christopher Pelfrey, Justino Pena, Jeremy Richardson, Jonas Robbins, Jason Roche, Carl Russell, Chris Schell, Ezell Smith, Michael Sperling, Kyle Sturgiss, Coty Sullivan, Shane Talley, James. Thompson, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth, John Wright, re 40 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification, for Disclosure of Contact Information, and for Court-Approved Notices filed by Plaintiff Donnie Lang, Plaintiff Brandon Burris, Plaintiff William Featherly, Plaintiff Jeff Grabner, Plaintiff James. Thompson, Plaintiff Shane Talley, Plaintiff Jonas Robbins, Plaintiff Theral Wesley Gandy, Plaintiff Jeremy Cravens, Plaintiff Justin Muller, Plaintiff Shannon Lewis, Plaintiff David Jurgens, Plaintiff Chris Schell, Plaintiff Matthew Griffin, Plaintiff Christopher Clark, Plaintiff Edward Franks, Plaintiff Dustin Moore, Plaintiff Roy Lewis, Plaintiff Sean Follis, Plaintiff Justino Pena, Plaintiff Jason Roche, Plaintiff Shunn Lewis, Plaintiff Tony Odenbaugh, Plaintiff Joe Conger, Plaintiff Michael Hatala, Plaintiff James Wedgeworth, Plaintiff Shawn Lars, Plaintiff Patrick Masterson, Plaintiff Jeremy Richardson, Plaintiff George Brice, Plaintiff Blake Vines, Plaintiff Chris Mitchell, Plaintiff Kyle Sturgiss, Plaintiff Kelby Gogenola, Plaintiff Skyler Gassner, Plaintiff Mark Burton, Plaintiff Carl Russell, Plaintiff Michael A. Horton, Plaintiff Aaron Normand, Plaintiff Mike Norsworthy, Plaintiff Rodney Johnson (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 07/08/2015)

#73

(#73) NOTICE Consent to Join -- James Glover by Aaron Anthony, Gary Battlefield, Sean Bice, James Boyd, George Brice, Danny Bridgewater, Brandon Burris, Mark Burton, Frank Cilluffo, Christopher Clark, Joe Conger, Jeremy Cravens, James Estes, Josh Farley, William Featherly, Sean Follis, Emanuel Ford, Edward Franks, Theral Wesley Gandy, Kristopher Garrett, Skyler Gassner, Kelby Gogenola, Jeff Grabner, Brandon Green, Matthew Griffin, Michael Hatala, Willie Holloway, Michael A. Horton, Ethan Jessee, Rodney Johnson, Justin Jones, Michael Josey, David Jurgens, Donnie Lang, Shawn Lars, Roy Lewis, Shannon Lewis, Shunn Lewis, Tanner Litton, Patrick Masterson, Chris Mitchell, Dustin Moore, Stephen Moore, Justin Muller, Aaron Normand, Mike Norsworthy, Tony Odenbaugh, Christopher Otto, Samuel Todd Parker, Christopher Pelfrey, Justino Pena, Jeremy Richardson, Jonas Robbins, Jason Roche, Carl Russell, Chris Schell, Ezell Smith, Michael Sperling, Kyle Sturgiss, Coty Sullivan, Shane Talley, James. Thompson, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth, John Wright (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#72

(#72) NOTICE Consent to Join -- Keinen Ennis by Aaron Anthony, Gary Battlefield, Sean Bice, James Boyd, George Brice, Danny Bridgewater, Brandon Burris, Mark Burton, Frank Cilluffo, Christopher Clark, Joe Conger, Jeremy Cravens, James Estes, Josh Farley, William Featherly, Sean Follis, Emanuel Ford, Edward Franks, Theral Wesley Gandy, Kristopher Garrett, Skyler Gassner, Kelby Gogenola, Jeff Grabner, Brandon Green, Matthew Griffin, Michael Hatala, Willie Holloway, Michael A. Horton, Ethan Jessee, Rodney Johnson, Justin Jones, Michael Josey, David Jurgens, Donnie Lang, Shawn Lars, Roy Lewis, Shannon Lewis, Shunn Lewis, Tanner Litton, Patrick Masterson, Chris Mitchell, Dustin Moore, Stephen Moore, Justin Muller, Aaron Normand, Mike Norsworthy, Tony Odenbaugh, Christopher Otto, Samuel Todd Parker, Christopher Pelfrey, Justino Pena, Jeremy Richardson, Jonas Robbins, Jason Roche, Carl Russell, Chris Schell, Ezell Smith, Michael Sperling, Kyle Sturgiss, Coty Sullivan, Shane Talley, James. Thompson, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth, John Wright (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#71

(#71) Order and Advisory. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order by 8/6/2015) Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#70

(#70) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by S-3 Pump Service, Inc., re 40 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification, for Disclosure of Contact Information, and for Court-Approved Notices filed by Plaintiff Donnie Lang, Plaintiff Brandon Burris, Plaintiff William Featherly, Plaintiff Jeff Grabner, Plaintiff James. Thompson, Plaintiff Shane Talley, Plaintiff Jonas Robbins, Plaintiff Theral Wesley Gandy, Plaintiff Jeremy Cravens, Plaintiff Justin Muller, Plaintiff Shannon Lewis, Plaintiff David Jurgens, Plaintiff Chris Schell, Plaintiff Matthew Griffin, Plaintiff Christopher Clark, Plaintiff Edward Franks, Plaintiff Dustin Moore, Plaintiff Roy Lewis, Plaintiff Sean Follis, Plaintiff Justino Pena, Plaintiff Jason Roche, Plaintiff Shunn Lewis, Plaintiff Tony Odenbaugh, Plaintiff Joe Conger, Plaintiff Michael Hatala, Plaintiff James Wedgeworth, Plaintiff Shawn Lars, Plaintiff Patrick Masterson, Plaintiff Jeremy Richardson, Plaintiff George Brice, Plaintiff Blake Vines, Plaintiff Chris Mitchell, Plaintiff Kyle Sturgiss, Plaintiff Kelby Gogenola, Plaintiff Skyler Gassner, Plaintiff Mark Burton, Plaintiff Carl Russell, Plaintiff Michael A. Horton, Plaintiff Aaron Normand, Plaintiff Mike Norsworthy, Plaintiff Rodney Johnson (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hilburn, Cary) (Entered: 07/03/2015)

#69

(#69) Original ANSWER to 25 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand by S-3 Pump Service, Inc..(Hilburn, Cary) (Entered: 07/03/2015)

#68

(#68) NOTICE Consent to Join -- Josh Farley by Aaron Anthony, Gary Battlefield, Sean Bice, James Boyd, George Brice, Danny Bridgewater, Brandon Burris, Mark Burton, Frank Cilluffo, Christopher Clark, Joe Conger, Jeremy Cravens, James Estes, William Featherly, Sean Follis, Emanuel Ford, Edward Franks, Theral Wesley Gandy, Kristopher Garrett, Skyler Gassner, Kelby Gogenola, Jeff Grabner, Brandon Green, Matthew Griffin, Michael Hatala, Willie Holloway, Michael A. Horton, Ethan Jessee, Rodney Johnson, Justin Jones, Michael Josey, David Jurgens, Donnie Lang, Shawn Lars, Roy Lewis, Shannon Lewis, Shunn Lewis, Tanner Litton, Patrick Masterson, Chris Mitchell, Dustin Moore, Stephen Moore, Justin Muller, Aaron Normand, Mike Norsworthy, Tony Odenbaugh, Christopher Otto, Samuel Todd Parker, Christopher Pelfrey, Justino Pena, Jeremy Richardson, Jonas Robbins, Jason Roche, Carl Russell, Chris Schell, Ezell Smith, Michael Sperling, Kyle Sturgiss, Coty Sullivan, Shane Talley, James. Thompson, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth, John Wright (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

#67

(#67) NOTICE Consent to Join -- John Wright by Aaron Anthony, Gary Battlefield, Sean Bice, James Boyd, George Brice, Danny Bridgewater, Brandon Burris, Mark Burton, Frank Cilluffo, Christopher Clark, Joe Conger, Jeremy Cravens, James Estes, William Featherly, Sean Follis, Emanuel Ford, Edward Franks, Theral Wesley Gandy, Kristopher Garrett, Skyler Gassner, Kelby Gogenola, Jeff Grabner, Brandon Green, Matthew Griffin, Michael Hatala, Willie Holloway, Michael A. Horton, Ethan Jessee, Rodney Johnson, Justin Jones, Michael Josey, David Jurgens, Donnie Lang, Shawn Lars, Roy Lewis, Shannon Lewis, Shunn Lewis, Tanner Litton, Patrick Masterson, Chris Mitchell, Dustin Moore, Stephen Moore, Justin Muller, Aaron Normand, Mike Norsworthy, Tony Odenbaugh, Christopher Otto, Samuel Todd Parker, Christopher Pelfrey, Justino Pena, Jeremy Richardson, Jonas Robbins, Jason Roche, Carl Russell, Chris Schell, Ezell Smith, Michael Sperling, Kyle Sturgiss, Coty Sullivan, Shane Talley, James. Thompson, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) ORDER GRANTING 40 Motion to Conditional Certification Class of this case. The Court Order the Plaintiff to supply the Defendant within (14) Days a list of Current and Former Employees in the class listed. Plaintiffs shall send potential class members the Court Approved Notice, deadline for opt-in is (60) Days from the date of the mailing of the notices. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 07/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Aaron Anthony, Gary Battlefield, Sean Bice, James Boyd, George Brice, Danny Bridgewater, Brandon Burris, Mark Burton, Frank Cilluffo, Christopher Clark, Joe Conger, Jeremy Cravens, Kienen Ennis, James Estes, Josh Farley, William Featherly, Sean Follis, Emanuel Ford, Edward Franks, Theral Wesley Gandy, Kristopher Garrett, Skyler Gassner, James Glover, Kelby Gogenola, Jeff Grabner, Brandon Green, Matthew Griffin, Michael Hatala, Willie Holloway, Michael A. Horton, Ethan Jessee, Rodney Johnson, Justin Jones, Michael Josey, David Jurgens, Donnie Lang, Shawn Lars, Roy Lewis, Shannon Lewis, Shunn Lewis, Tanner Litton, Patrick Masterson, Chris Mitchell, Dustin Moore, Stephen Moore, Justin Muller, Aaron Normand, Mike Norsworthy, Tony Odenbaugh, Christopher Otto, Samuel Todd Parker, Christopher Pelfrey, Justino Pena, Jeremy Richardson, Jonas Robbins, Jason Roche, Carl Russell, Chris Schell, Ezell Smith, Michael Sperling, Kyle Sturgiss, Coty Sullivan, Shane Talley, James. Thompson, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth, John Wright, re 40 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification, for Disclosure of Contact Information, and for Court-Approved Notices filed by Plaintiff Donnie Lang, Plaintiff Brandon Burris, Plaintiff William Featherly, Plaintiff Jeff Grabner, Plaintiff James. Thompson, Plaintiff Shane Talley, Plaintiff Jonas Robbins, Plaintiff Theral Wesley Gandy, Plaintiff Jeremy Cravens, Plaintiff Justin Muller, Plaintiff Shannon Lewis, Plaintiff David Jurgens, Plaintiff Chris Schell, Plaintiff Matthew Griffin, Plaintiff Christopher Clark, Plaintiff Edward Franks, Plaintiff Dustin Moore, Plaintiff Roy Lewis, Plaintiff Sean Follis, Plaintiff Justino Pena, Plaintiff Jason Roche, Plaintiff Shunn Lewis, Plaintiff Tony Odenbaugh, Plaintiff Joe Conger, Plaintiff Michael Hatala, Plaintiff James Wedgeworth, Plaintiff Shawn Lars, Plaintiff Patrick Masterson, Plaintiff Jeremy Richardson, Plaintiff George Brice, Plaintiff Blake Vines, Plaintiff Chris Mitchell, Plaintiff Kyle Sturgiss, Plaintiff Kelby Gogenola, Plaintiff Skyler Gassner, Plaintiff Mark Burton, Plaintiff Carl Russell, Plaintiff Michael A. Horton, Plaintiff Aaron Normand, Plaintiff Mike Norsworthy, Plaintiff Rodney Johnson (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 07/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#73) NOTICE Consent to Join -- James Glover by Aaron Anthony, Gary Battlefield, Sean Bice, James Boyd, George Brice, Danny Bridgewater, Brandon Burris, Mark Burton, Frank Cilluffo, Christopher Clark, Joe Conger, Jeremy Cravens, James Estes, Josh Farley, William Featherly, Sean Follis, Emanuel Ford, Edward Franks, Theral Wesley Gandy, Kristopher Garrett, Skyler Gassner, Kelby Gogenola, Jeff Grabner, Brandon Green, Matthew Griffin, Michael Hatala, Willie Holloway, Michael A. Horton, Ethan Jessee, Rodney Johnson, Justin Jones, Michael Josey, David Jurgens, Donnie Lang, Shawn Lars, Roy Lewis, Shannon Lewis, Shunn Lewis, Tanner Litton, Patrick Masterson, Chris Mitchell, Dustin Moore, Stephen Moore, Justin Muller, Aaron Normand, Mike Norsworthy, Tony Odenbaugh, Christopher Otto, Samuel Todd Parker, Christopher Pelfrey, Justino Pena, Jeremy Richardson, Jonas Robbins, Jason Roche, Carl Russell, Chris Schell, Ezell Smith, Michael Sperling, Kyle Sturgiss, Coty Sullivan, Shane Talley, James. Thompson, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth, John Wright (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) NOTICE Consent to Join -- Keinen Ennis by Aaron Anthony, Gary Battlefield, Sean Bice, James Boyd, George Brice, Danny Bridgewater, Brandon Burris, Mark Burton, Frank Cilluffo, Christopher Clark, Joe Conger, Jeremy Cravens, James Estes, Josh Farley, William Featherly, Sean Follis, Emanuel Ford, Edward Franks, Theral Wesley Gandy, Kristopher Garrett, Skyler Gassner, Kelby Gogenola, Jeff Grabner, Brandon Green, Matthew Griffin, Michael Hatala, Willie Holloway, Michael A. Horton, Ethan Jessee, Rodney Johnson, Justin Jones, Michael Josey, David Jurgens, Donnie Lang, Shawn Lars, Roy Lewis, Shannon Lewis, Shunn Lewis, Tanner Litton, Patrick Masterson, Chris Mitchell, Dustin Moore, Stephen Moore, Justin Muller, Aaron Normand, Mike Norsworthy, Tony Odenbaugh, Christopher Otto, Samuel Todd Parker, Christopher Pelfrey, Justino Pena, Jeremy Richardson, Jonas Robbins, Jason Roche, Carl Russell, Chris Schell, Ezell Smith, Michael Sperling, Kyle Sturgiss, Coty Sullivan, Shane Talley, James. Thompson, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth, John Wright (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) Order and Advisory. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order by 8/6/2015) Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by S-3 Pump Service, Inc., re 40 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification, for Disclosure of Contact Information, and for Court-Approved Notices filed by Plaintiff Donnie Lang, Plaintiff Brandon Burris, Plaintiff William Featherly, Plaintiff Jeff Grabner, Plaintiff James. Thompson, Plaintiff Shane Talley, Plaintiff Jonas Robbins, Plaintiff Theral Wesley Gandy, Plaintiff Jeremy Cravens, Plaintiff Justin Muller, Plaintiff Shannon Lewis, Plaintiff David Jurgens, Plaintiff Chris Schell, Plaintiff Matthew Griffin, Plaintiff Christopher Clark, Plaintiff Edward Franks, Plaintiff Dustin Moore, Plaintiff Roy Lewis, Plaintiff Sean Follis, Plaintiff Justino Pena, Plaintiff Jason Roche, Plaintiff Shunn Lewis, Plaintiff Tony Odenbaugh, Plaintiff Joe Conger, Plaintiff Michael Hatala, Plaintiff James Wedgeworth, Plaintiff Shawn Lars, Plaintiff Patrick Masterson, Plaintiff Jeremy Richardson, Plaintiff George Brice, Plaintiff Blake Vines, Plaintiff Chris Mitchell, Plaintiff Kyle Sturgiss, Plaintiff Kelby Gogenola, Plaintiff Skyler Gassner, Plaintiff Mark Burton, Plaintiff Carl Russell, Plaintiff Michael A. Horton, Plaintiff Aaron Normand, Plaintiff Mike Norsworthy, Plaintiff Rodney Johnson (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hilburn, Cary) (Entered: 07/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) Original ANSWER to 25 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand by S-3 Pump Service, Inc..(Hilburn, Cary) (Entered: 07/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) NOTICE Consent to Join -- Josh Farley by Aaron Anthony, Gary Battlefield, Sean Bice, James Boyd, George Brice, Danny Bridgewater, Brandon Burris, Mark Burton, Frank Cilluffo, Christopher Clark, Joe Conger, Jeremy Cravens, James Estes, William Featherly, Sean Follis, Emanuel Ford, Edward Franks, Theral Wesley Gandy, Kristopher Garrett, Skyler Gassner, Kelby Gogenola, Jeff Grabner, Brandon Green, Matthew Griffin, Michael Hatala, Willie Holloway, Michael A. Horton, Ethan Jessee, Rodney Johnson, Justin Jones, Michael Josey, David Jurgens, Donnie Lang, Shawn Lars, Roy Lewis, Shannon Lewis, Shunn Lewis, Tanner Litton, Patrick Masterson, Chris Mitchell, Dustin Moore, Stephen Moore, Justin Muller, Aaron Normand, Mike Norsworthy, Tony Odenbaugh, Christopher Otto, Samuel Todd Parker, Christopher Pelfrey, Justino Pena, Jeremy Richardson, Jonas Robbins, Jason Roche, Carl Russell, Chris Schell, Ezell Smith, Michael Sperling, Kyle Sturgiss, Coty Sullivan, Shane Talley, James. Thompson, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth, John Wright (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) NOTICE Consent to Join -- John Wright by Aaron Anthony, Gary Battlefield, Sean Bice, James Boyd, George Brice, Danny Bridgewater, Brandon Burris, Mark Burton, Frank Cilluffo, Christopher Clark, Joe Conger, Jeremy Cravens, James Estes, William Featherly, Sean Follis, Emanuel Ford, Edward Franks, Theral Wesley Gandy, Kristopher Garrett, Skyler Gassner, Kelby Gogenola, Jeff Grabner, Brandon Green, Matthew Griffin, Michael Hatala, Willie Holloway, Michael A. Horton, Ethan Jessee, Rodney Johnson, Justin Jones, Michael Josey, David Jurgens, Donnie Lang, Shawn Lars, Roy Lewis, Shannon Lewis, Shunn Lewis, Tanner Litton, Patrick Masterson, Chris Mitchell, Dustin Moore, Stephen Moore, Justin Muller, Aaron Normand, Mike Norsworthy, Tony Odenbaugh, Christopher Otto, Samuel Todd Parker, Christopher Pelfrey, Justino Pena, Jeremy Richardson, Jonas Robbins, Jason Roche, Carl Russell, Chris Schell, Ezell Smith, Michael Sperling, Kyle Sturgiss, Coty Sullivan, Shane Talley, James. Thompson, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) NOTICE Consent to Join -- Stephen Moore by Aaron Anthony, Gary Battlefield, Sean Bice, James Boyd, George Brice, Danny Bridgewater, Brandon Burris, Mark Burton, Frank Cilluffo, Christopher Clark, Joe Conger, Jeremy Cravens, James Estes, William Featherly, Sean Follis, Emanuel Ford, Edward Franks, Theral Wesley Gandy, Kristopher Garrett, Skyler Gassner, Kelby Gogenola, Jeff Grabner, Brandon Green, Matthew Griffin, Michael Hatala, Willie Holloway, Michael A. Horton, Ethan Jessee, Rodney Johnson, Justin Jones, Michael Josey, David Jurgens, Donnie Lang, Shawn Lars, Roy Lewis, Shannon Lewis, Shunn Lewis, Tanner Litton, Patrick Masterson, Chris Mitchell, Dustin Moore, Justin Muller, Aaron Normand, Mike Norsworthy, Tony Odenbaugh, Christopher Otto, Samuel Todd Parker, Christopher Pelfrey, Justino Pena, Jeremy Richardson, Jonas Robbins, Jason Roche, Carl Russell, Chris Schell, Ezell Smith, Michael Sperling, Kyle Sturgiss, Coty Sullivan, Shane Talley, James. Thompson, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 06/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE Consent to Join -- Justin Muller by Brandon Burris, Mark Burton, Sean Follis, Skyler Gassner, Jeff Grabner, David Jurgens, Patrick Masterson, Justino Pena, Jason Roche, Chris Schell, Shane Talley, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 04/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE Consent to Join -- Justino Pena by Brandon Burris, Mark Burton, Sean Follis, Skyler Gassner, Jeff Grabner, David Jurgens, Patrick Masterson, Jason Roche, Chris Schell, Shane Talley, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 04/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE Consent to Join -- Chris Schell by Brandon Burris, Mark Burton, Sean Follis, Jeff Grabner, David Jurgens, Jason Roche, Shane Talley, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 04/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE Consent to Join -- Patrick Masterson by Brandon Burris, Mark Burton, Sean Follis, Jeff Grabner, David Jurgens, Jason Roche, Shane Talley (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE Consent to Join -- Syler Gassner by Brandon Burris, Mark Burton, Sean Follis, Jeff Grabner, David Jurgens, Jason Roche, Shane Talley (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE Consent to Join -- Jeffery Grabner by Brandon Burris, Sean Follis, David Jurgens, Jason Roche, Shane Talley, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE Consent to Join Collective Action -- Mark Burton by Brandon Burris, Sean Follis, David Jurgens, Jason Roche, Shane Talley, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to S-3 Pump Service, Inc.. (wg) (Entered: 04/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Brandon Burris, Sean Follis, David Jurgens, Jason Roche, Shane Talley, Blake Vines, James Wedgeworth. to Defendant S-3 Pump Service, Inc. (Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (Collective Action) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7351239), filed by Sean Follis, Blake Vines, David Jurgens, Shane Talley, Jason Roche, James Wedgeworth, Brandon Burris. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Consents to Join (All Plaintiffs), # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanford, Josh) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.