This case was last updated from PACER on 08/25/2018 at 00:35:05 (UTC).

Rist v. HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/14/2014 Rist filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against HSBC Securities USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L. Carter, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-06503

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew L. Carter, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Rist

Defendant

HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.

Interested Party

Jane Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Asa F. Smith

Attorney at Liddle & Robinson, LLP

800 Third Avenue, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

James Ryan Hubbard

Attorney at Liddle & Robinson, LLP

800 Third Avenue, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Michael Evan Grenert

Attorney at Liddle & Robinson, LLP

800 Third Avenue, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Erin Elizabeth Lynch

Attorney at Liddle & Robinson, LLP

800 Third Avenue, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

LaKeisha Marie Antoinett Caton

Attorney at Liddle & Robinson, LLP

800 Third Avenue, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Robert Adler

Attorney at Liddle & Robinson, L.L.P.

800 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Marc Adam Susswein

Attorney at Liddle & Robinson, LLP

800 Third Avenue, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Ilana Rae Miller

Attorney at Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP(NYC)

575 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Camille Oberkampff

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner LLP

575 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Damien Jerome Marshall

Attorney at Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP(NYC)

575 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Randall Wade Jackson

Attorney at Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP(NYC)

575 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Gabrielle Frances Levin

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue, 48Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Eugene Scalia

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Joshua James Libling

Attorney at Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP(NYC)

575 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Interested Party Attorney

Jonathan Daniel Lupkin

Attorney at Lupkin & Associates PLLC

26 Broadway, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

62 #15

Exhibit 85-96

64 #37

Exhibit 41

64 #65

Exhibit 68

64 #81

Exhibit 82

#53

No Description Available

37 #4

Text of Proposed Order

#37

No Description Available

#52

No Description Available

37 #1

Exhibit A

#21

No Description Available

64 #19

Exhibit 19

#10

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

67 #2

Exhibit 2

62 #9

Exhibit 62-64

64 #24

Exhibit 24

#67

No Description Available

208 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2017
  • Terminate Transcript Deadlines (mro) (Entered: 04/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS: THE MATTER in dispute having been amicably resolved, it is hereby stipulated an agreed by and between the undersigned that all claims asserted in the above-captioned matter are hereby dismissed in their entirety with prejudice as against all parties and without costs against any party. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/10/2017(as per Chambers)) (mro) Modified on 4/11/2017 (mro). (Entered: 04/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) ORDER: The Court will hold a status conference in the above-captioned case on April 20, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. for the purpose of setting a trial date, at which the parties will propose a scheduling order to the parties to: exchange amended witness lists, deposition designations, and exhibit lists; file the Joint Pretrial Order; file motions in limine, voir dire questions, requests to charge, and verdict forms; and submit their respective oppositions to motions in limine, voir dire questions, requests to charge, and verdict forms. Counsel should appear in person in Courtroom 1306 at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY, on the date and time specified above. (Status Conference set for 4/20/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1306, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr..) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/16/2017) (ap) (Entered: 03/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from James R. Hubbard dated 02/21/2017 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by James Rist.(Hubbard, James) (Entered: 02/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) ORDER: As stated during the January 31, 2017 status conference in this matter, the parties shall file a joint status report by February 21, 2017 indicating whether this matter has settled. If the matter has not settled and the parties would like assistance in settling the dispute, the parties should indicate whether they would like to be referred to the assigned magistrate judge or the court-annexed mediation program. If the parties do not wish to settle, the parties should indicate how they wish to proceed with the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/6/2017) (anc) (Entered: 02/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Status Conference held on 1/31/2017. James R. Hubbard for Plaintiff(s). Randall W. Jackson and Gabrielle F. Levin for Defendant(s). Joint Status Report due by 2/21/2017. (tdh) (Entered: 02/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) ORDER, ( Status Conference set for 1/31/2017 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1306, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.) The court will hold a status conference in the above-captioned case on January 31, 2017 at 11:15 a.m. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/17/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 01/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#95) ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's letter motion dated November 29, 2016 for sanctions against Plaintiff. Plaintiff is ordered to respond by the end of the day on December 1, 2016. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 12/1/2016) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/30/2016) (ama) (Entered: 11/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#94) ORDER. The parties should be prepared to discuss the relevance and impact of Chauca v. Abraham, 2016 U.S. App. LEXIS 19597 at tomorrow's final pre-trial conference. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/28/2016) (rjm) (Entered: 11/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#93) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #92 Letter filed by HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/13/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 10/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. HSBC Securities (USA) Inc. waiver sent on 9/9/2014, answer due 11/10/2014. Document filed by James Rist. (Hubbard, James) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (pgu) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:14-cv-04463-ALC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (pgu) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • CASE REFERRED TO Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. as possibly related to 14cv4463. (laq) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14 CV 4463. Document filed by James Rist.(Kaliakina, Tatiana) (Entered: 08/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kaliakina, Tatiana) (Entered: 08/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • Case Designated ECF. (Kaliakina, Tatiana) (Entered: 08/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Kaliakina, Tatiana) (Entered: 08/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 01102395)Document filed by James Rist.(Kaliakina, Tatiana) (Entered: 08/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.