This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2016 at 05:05:18 (UTC).

Rico Sun Tours, Inc. v. Capeles et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2014 Rico Sun Tours, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Capeles. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory and US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-01583

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory

Referral Judge

US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rico Sun Tours, Inc.

Defendants

United Tour Guides Coop of Puerto Rico

Edgard Capeles

Toa Baja, PR 00950-1362

Ricardo Rivas

William Torres

German Vazquez

Union de Transportistas y Ramas Anexas, Inc.

Ricardo Serra

San Juan Happy Tours, Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sarika J. Angulo-Velazquez

Attorney at Casellas, Alcover & Burgos PSC

Po Box 364924

San Juan, PR 00936-4924

Cesar T. Alcover-Acosta

Attorney at Casellas, Alcover & Burgos PSC

Po Box 364924

San Juan, PR 00936-4924

Defendant Attorneys

Rosendo E. Miranda-Lopez

Attorney at Rosendo E. Miranda Lopez Law

Po Box 192096

San Juan, PR 00919-2096

Carla Arraiza-Gonzalez

Po Box 9023525

San Juan, PR 00902

Francisco Rebollo-Casalduc

Attorney at Francisco Rebollo Casalduc Law Office

Po Box 195571

San Juan, PR 00919

Maria H. Sandoval

Attorney at Maria H. Sandoval Law Office

Po Box 9878

San Juan, PR 00908

Mariela Maestre-Cordero

Po Box 11405

San Juan, PR 00922

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-4024301.), filed by Rico Sun Tours, Inc.. Service due by 12/4/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Category Sheet, # 4 Summons As to Edgard Capeles, # 5 Summons As to German Vazquez, # 6 Summons As to Ricardo Rivas, # 7 Summons As to Ricardo Serra, # 8 Summons As to William Torres, # 9 Summons As to San Juan Happy Tours, Inc., # 10 Summons As to Union de Transportistas y Ramas Anexas, Inc., # 11 Summons As to United Tour Guides Coop of Puerto Rico)(Alcover-Acosta, Cesar) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Sarika J. Angulo-Velazquez on behalf of Rico Sun Tours, Inc. (Angulo-Velazquez, Sarika) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (jla) (Entered: 07/31/2014)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Edgard Capeles, Ricardo Rivas, San Juan Happy Tours, Corp., Ricardo Serra, William Torres, Union de Transportistas y Ramas Anexas, Inc., United Tour Guides Coop of Puerto Rico, German Vazquez (jla) (Entered: 07/31/2014)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs upon Edgard Capeles served on 8/6/2014, answer due 8/27/2014. (Angulo-Velazquez, Sarika) Modified on 8/13/2014 to edit event title(cm). (Entered: 08/12/2014)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs upon United Tour Guides Coop of Puerto Rico served on 8/9/2014, answer due 9/2/2014. (Angulo-Velazquez, Sarika) Modified on 8/13/2014 to edit event title(cm). (Entered: 08/12/2014)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs upon German Vazquez served on 8/6/2014, answer due 8/27/2014. (Angulo-Velazquez, Sarika) Modified on 8/13/2014 to edit event title (cm). (Entered: 08/12/2014)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs upon Union de Transportistas y Ramas Anexas, Inc. served on 8/6/2014, answer due 8/27/2014. (Angulo-Velazquez, Sarika) Modified on 8/13/2014 to edit event title (cm). (Entered: 08/12/2014)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs upon Ricardo Serra served on 8/9/2014, answer due 9/2/2014. (Angulo-Velazquez, Sarika) Modified on 8/13/2014 to edit event title(cm). (Entered: 08/12/2014)

#71

(#71) MOTION for Joinder DOCKET NO. 70 REQUESTING PROTECTIVE ORDER Re: 70 MOTION for Protective Order filed by San Juan Happy Tours, Corp. filed by Carla Arraiza-Gonzalez on behalf of William Torres Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/20/2015 (Related document(s) 70 ) (Arraiza-Gonzalez, Carla) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

#72

(#72) ORDER denying 33 Motion to Dismiss; denying 39 Motion to Dismiss; denying 23 Motion to Dismiss; denying 25 Motion to Dismiss. The Court finds that Plaintiff has alleged sufficient facts in the Complaint to state a claim under Sections 1 and 2 of the Sherman Antitrust Act. Arguments regarding Plaintiff's lack of standing and failure to exhaust administrative remedies are meritless and, thus, rejected. It is hereby ordered. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/9/2015. (CLM) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

#73

(#73) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Velez-Rive for an ISC. The Court hereby sets the following deadlines: Jury Trial set for 2/8/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. Pretrial/Settlement Conference set for 2/1/2016 03:00 PM before Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. JOINT Pretrial Memorandum due by 1/25/2016. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/9/2015. (CLM) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

#74

(#74) ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Velez-Rive for disposition: 70 MOTION for Protective Order; 71 MOTION for Joinder. Discovery shall continue in accordance with the deadlines established by the Magistrate Judge in the ISC. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/9/2015. (CLM) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

#75

(#75) MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Referral Order at docket entry #73, this case is hereby referred to Magistrate Camille Velez-Rive for an Initial Scheduling Conference. Signed by Clerk on 2/09/15. (li) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

#76

(#76) RESPONSE to Motion requesting Protective Order filed by Rico Sun Tours, Inc. Re: 70 MOTION for Protective Order filed by San Juan Happy Tours, Corp., 71 MOTION for Joinder DOCKET NO. 70 REQUESTING PROTECTIVE ORDER Re: 70 MOTION for Protective Order filed by San Juan Happy Tours, Corp. filed by William Torres filed by Rico Sun Tours, Inc.. (Angulo-Velazquez, Sarika) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

#77

(#77) ORDER granting 71 Motion for Joinder. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 2/10/15. (ljt) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

#78

(#78) ORDER - Denied as moot 70 Motion for Protective Order. However, Defendants will not be required to answer any of RST's written discovery until the day after the Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f) conference is held. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 2/10/15. (ljt) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

#79

(#79) ORDER, Set Hearings - The Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 3/4/2015 at 02:30 PM in CVR's Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 2/10/15.(ljt) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) ORDER, Set Hearings - The Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 3/4/2015 at 02:30 PM in CVR's Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 2/10/15.(ljt) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#78) ORDER - Denied as moot 70 Motion for Protective Order. However, Defendants will not be required to answer any of RST's written discovery until the day after the Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f) conference is held. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 2/10/15. (ljt) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#77) ORDER granting 71 Motion for Joinder. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 2/10/15. (ljt) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#76) RESPONSE to Motion requesting Protective Order filed by Rico Sun Tours, Inc. Re: 70 MOTION for Protective Order filed by San Juan Happy Tours, Corp., 71 MOTION for Joinder DOCKET NO. 70 REQUESTING PROTECTIVE ORDER Re: 70 MOTION for Protective Order filed by San Juan Happy Tours, Corp. filed by William Torres filed by Rico Sun Tours, Inc.. (Angulo-Velazquez, Sarika) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Referral Order at docket entry #73, this case is hereby referred to Magistrate Camille Velez-Rive for an Initial Scheduling Conference. Signed by Clerk on 2/09/15. (li) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Velez-Rive for disposition: 70 MOTION for Protective Order; 71 MOTION for Joinder. Discovery shall continue in accordance with the deadlines established by the Magistrate Judge in the ISC. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/9/2015. (CLM) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#73) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Velez-Rive for an ISC. The Court hereby sets the following deadlines: Jury Trial set for 2/8/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. Pretrial/Settlement Conference set for 2/1/2016 03:00 PM before Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. JOINT Pretrial Memorandum due by 1/25/2016. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/9/2015. (CLM) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) ORDER denying 33 Motion to Dismiss; denying 39 Motion to Dismiss; denying 23 Motion to Dismiss; denying 25 Motion to Dismiss. The Court finds that Plaintiff has alleged sufficient facts in the Complaint to state a claim under Sections 1 and 2 of the Sherman Antitrust Act. Arguments regarding Plaintiff's lack of standing and failure to exhaust administrative remedies are meritless and, thus, rejected. It is hereby ordered. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/9/2015. (CLM) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) MOTION for Joinder DOCKET NO. 70 REQUESTING PROTECTIVE ORDER Re: 70 MOTION for Protective Order filed by San Juan Happy Tours, Corp. filed by Carla Arraiza-Gonzalez on behalf of William Torres Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/20/2015 (Related document(s) 70 ) (Arraiza-Gonzalez, Carla) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Mariela Maestre-Cordero on behalf of San Juan Happy Tours, Corp. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/20/2015 (Maestre-Cordero, Mariela) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rico Sun Tours, Inc. upon William Torres served on 8/13/2014, answer due 9/3/2014. (Angulo-Velazquez, Sarika) (Entered: 08/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs upon Ricardo Serra served on 8/9/2014, answer due 9/2/2014. (Angulo-Velazquez, Sarika) Modified on 8/13/2014 to edit event title(cm). (Entered: 08/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs upon Union de Transportistas y Ramas Anexas, Inc. served on 8/6/2014, answer due 8/27/2014. (Angulo-Velazquez, Sarika) Modified on 8/13/2014 to edit event title (cm). (Entered: 08/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs upon German Vazquez served on 8/6/2014, answer due 8/27/2014. (Angulo-Velazquez, Sarika) Modified on 8/13/2014 to edit event title (cm). (Entered: 08/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs upon United Tour Guides Coop of Puerto Rico served on 8/9/2014, answer due 9/2/2014. (Angulo-Velazquez, Sarika) Modified on 8/13/2014 to edit event title(cm). (Entered: 08/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs upon Edgard Capeles served on 8/6/2014, answer due 8/27/2014. (Angulo-Velazquez, Sarika) Modified on 8/13/2014 to edit event title(cm). (Entered: 08/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Edgard Capeles, Ricardo Rivas, San Juan Happy Tours, Corp., Ricardo Serra, William Torres, Union de Transportistas y Ramas Anexas, Inc., United Tour Guides Coop of Puerto Rico, German Vazquez (jla) (Entered: 07/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (jla) (Entered: 07/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Sarika J. Angulo-Velazquez on behalf of Rico Sun Tours, Inc. (Angulo-Velazquez, Sarika) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-4024301.), filed by Rico Sun Tours, Inc.. Service due by 12/4/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Category Sheet, # 4 Summons As to Edgard Capeles, # 5 Summons As to German Vazquez, # 6 Summons As to Ricardo Rivas, # 7 Summons As to Ricardo Serra, # 8 Summons As to William Torres, # 9 Summons As to San Juan Happy Tours, Inc., # 10 Summons As to Union de Transportistas y Ramas Anexas, Inc., # 11 Summons As to United Tour Guides Coop of Puerto Rico)(Alcover-Acosta, Cesar) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarika J. Angulo-Velazquez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cesar T. Alcover-Acosta